ROSARIO v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: DAVID ROSARIO
Defendant: FORMER SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL, SECRETARY, DR. LAUREL HARRY, DEPUTY SECRETARY TAMMY FERGUSON, DEPUTY SECRETARY TABB BICKLE, DR. ANDREW NEWTON, BRIAN SCHNEIDER, DIRECTOR - BUREAU OF HEALTHCARE and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2023cv00966
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lawsuit, Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver, #9 Order, #5 Complaint by DAVID ROSARIO mailed to JOHN WETZEL, BRIAN SCHNEIDER, ANDREW NEWTON, TABB BICKEL, TAMMY FERGUSON, LAUREL HARRY, DIRECTOR BUREAU OF HEALTHCARE JOHN DOE, re #9 Order Directing Service, #5 Complaint (ctb)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/12/2023. (mqe)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/12/2023. (mqe)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by DAVID ROSARIO. Fee $5.00, receipt number 200004731. (sms)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by DAVID ROSARIO. (ctb)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against TABB BICKLE, DIRECTOR - BUREAU OF HEALTHCARE, TAMMY FERGUSON, LAUREL HARRY, ANDREW NEWTON, BRIAN SCHNEIDER, JOHN WETZEL, filed by DAVID ROSARIO. (ctb)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID ROSARIO. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint and its attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 6/16/2023. (mqe)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DAVID ROSARIO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ctb)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DAVID ROSARIO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ctb)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID ROSARIO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Prisoner Authorization Form, #3 Envelope) (ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSARIO v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY, DR. LAUREL HARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY SECRETARY TAMMY FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY SECRETARY TABB BICKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ANDREW NEWTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR - BUREAU OF HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?