MCGUIRE v. NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ERIC MCGUIRE, JR.
Defendant: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2023cv01347
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Rende, Bruce)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #20 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2023. (rtm)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Rende, Bruce)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, requiring expedited and limited discovery as to the stacking issue. The parties shall complete all discovery limited to the stacking issue by 10/16/2023 and file a status report on 10/17/2023 as to the discovery taken, whether the parties are prepared to proceed to summary judgment, and whether any or all aspects of the case have been resolved. Given the expedited deadline, the parties shall: (1) exchange initial disclosures, including producing all policy documents and Defendant's policy/claim file by 9/7/2023 (i.e., complete versions of the original policy, any renewals, and the policy at issue and any applications and other correspondence related to the procurement of coverage); (2) serve any written discovery requests and deposition notices by 9/13/2023; (3) respond to all written discovery requests by 9/27/2023; and (4) complete all depositions by 10/16/2023. The parties, per side, shall serve no more than 5 requests for production and 5 interrogatories and shall take no more than 1 deposition. The parties may not serve any requests for admission. That said, the parties are strongly encouraged to confer and exchange discovery informally, without the need for written requests. No discovery on the bad-faith claim is authorized. The Court will set a briefing schedule as to summary judgment upon receipt of the status report. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss, for the reasons stated on the record at 8/30/2023 Oral Argument. This is without prejudice to Defendant raising its same argument on a more developed record at summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Oral Argument held on 8/30/2023. (Court Reporter: B. Loch) (pak)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William C Robinson, III on behalf of NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Robinson, William)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Rende, Bruce)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rende, Bruce)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Rende, Bruce)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ERIC MCGUIRE, JR. (Giannetti, Anthony)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ERIC MCGUIRE, JR. (Giannetti, Anthony)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Stipulation Correcting/Amending Defendant's Name. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/15/2023. (pak)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. In light of Defendant's pending #5 motion to dismiss, the Court's prior #3 Case Management Order and #4 Order Establishing Presumptive Trial Date are hereby VACATED, all deadlines set therein VOIDED, and trial currently set for 3/11/2024 CANCELED. These orders will be reissued after resolution of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/4/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his brief in response to the #5 motion on or before 8/18/2023; Defendant's reply brief due by 8/25/2023. Brief in response shall not exceed 20 pages in length; reply brief shall not exceed 10 pages in length. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2023 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan is hereby converted to an oral argument on the pending #5 motion, to be held at the same date and time. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/4/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Rende, Bruce)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Rule 12 Certification, #2 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PRESUMPTIVE TRIAL DATE. Trial in this matter is set for 3/11/2024. The parties are directed to prepare their Rule 26 report to conform with this trial date. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 7/31/2023. (pak)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/20/2023. An Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/30/2023 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 7/31/2023. (pak)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (kss)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-23-007582 Copies attached: Complaint, Praecipe for Appearance, Exhibit (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7806920), filed by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Appearance, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service) (kss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGUIRE v. NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC MCGUIRE, JR.
Represented By: Adam D Shorr
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: William C Robinson, III
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?