GLC ON-THE-GO, INC. v. BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GLC ON-THE-GO, INC.
Defendant: BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC doing business as BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC doing business as LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE & REHABILITATION CENTER and MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC doing business as MULBERRY HEALTHCARE & REHABILITATION CENTER,
Case Number: 2:2023cv02031
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC, LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC. (Boland, Ryan)
December 15, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/22/2023. (keh)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLC ON-THE-GO, INC.. MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Guthrie, Gregg)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLC ON-THE-GO, INC.. LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Guthrie, Gregg)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLC ON-THE-GO, INC.. BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Guthrie, Gregg)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan N. Boland on behalf of BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC, LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC. (Boland, Ryan)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maggie DiCostanzo on behalf of BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC, LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC. (DiCostanzo, Maggie)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/29/23. (ms)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by GLC ON-THE-GO, INC. (keh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC, LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7997484), filed by GLC ON-THE-GO, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (keh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLC ON-THE-GO, INC. v. BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLC ON-THE-GO, INC.
Represented By: Gregg A. Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP, LLC doing business as BONAMOUR HEALTH GROUP
Represented By: Maggie DiCostanzo
Represented By: Ryan N. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC doing business as LAKEVIEW HEALTHCARE & REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: Maggie DiCostanzo
Represented By: Ryan N. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULBERRY HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC doing business as MULBERRY HEALTHCARE & REHABILITATION CENTER,
Represented By: Maggie DiCostanzo
Represented By: Ryan N. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?