GRIMES v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GRIMES
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2025cv00100
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher B Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act 1993 (FMLA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2025 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (bjr)
March 18, 2025 Filing 12 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by WILLIAM GRIMES (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Bahorich, Justin)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher B. Brown on 3/10/2025. (cmc)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, Judge Nora Barry Fischer recuses from this matter; the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Judge on this Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/6/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
March 6, 2025 Magistrate Judge Christopher B. Brown added. (rjr)
March 5, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi M. Grogan on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Grogan, Heidi)
February 24, 2025 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE on 4/14/2025. (ept)
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WILLIAM GRIMES. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 2/13/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Bahorich, Justin) Modified text on 2/24/2025 to correct served and answer due dates. (ept)
February 12, 2025 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (ept)
February 12, 2025 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by WILLIAM GRIMES (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Bahorich, Justin)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/31/2025. (lyk)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Motions Practice. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/31/2025. (lyk)
January 31, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lyk)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (jkn)
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8660334), filed by WILLIAM GRIMES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Bahorich, Justin)
January 22, 2025 Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (jkn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIMES v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GRIMES
Represented By: Justin Michael Bahorich, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Heidi M. Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?