MCCLATCHEY v. ASSOCIATED PRESS Featured Case

Plaintiff Valencia McClatchey alleged that defendant the Associated Press (AP) over the AP\'s unauthorized use of her copyright End of Serenity photograph.

Plaintiff: VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY
Defendant: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Case Number: 3:2005cv00145
Filed: February 24, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Terrence F. McVerry
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 76 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 11/13/2007. Text only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text only entry constitutes the Court's order on the matter.(kll)
November 12, 2007 76 STIPULATION of Dismissal by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas)
October 24, 2007 75 Featured Case THIRD AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs witness list due by 11/26/2007; Defendants Witness list due by 11/26/2007; Proposed Voir Dire by 11/26/2007; Proposed Jury Instructions due by 11/26/2007; Proposed Verdict Slips due by 11/26/2007; Stipulation due by 11/26/2007; Jury Selection set for 12/6/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry; Jury Trial set for 12/10/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry; Exhibit List due by 11/26/2007. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 10/24/2007. (kll) Modified on 10/25/2007 (cen ).
July 31, 2007 74 Featured Case ORDER OF USCA denying Petition for Leave to Appeal (sc3, )
June 8, 2007 73 TRANSCRIPT of Pre-trial Conference held on 4/20/07 before Judge Terrence F. McVerry. Court Reporter: Richard T. Ford. The parties have five (5) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court or the court reporter/transcriber. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/22/2007. (cen )
June 8, 2007 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Reconsideration, as follows: motion for reconsideration DENIED, motion to certify for interlocutory appeal per 28 USC 1292 GRANTED. All proceedings stayed pending resolution of interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 6/8/07. (mh) Modified on 6/14/2007 (cen).
June 7, 2007 71 MOTION for Reconsideration re 69 Order on Motion in Limine, Or In The Alternative, Motion For Certification Of Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b) by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/28/2007 (cen).
June 5, 2007 70 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: (All due dates are 7/9/2007) Plaintiffs witness list due by 7/9/2007. Plaintiff Exhibit List due by 7/9/2007. Defendants Witness list due by 7/9/2007. Defendant Exhibit List due by 7/9/2007. Designation of discovery due by 7/9/2007 Proposed Voir Dire by 7/9/2007. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 7/9/2007. Proposed Verdict Slips due by 7/9/2007. Stipulation due by 7/9/2007. Jury Selection set for 7/23/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 6/5/2007. (kll)
June 4, 2007 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 45 Motion in Limine, granting 47 Motion in Limine, granting 49 Motion in Limine, denying 51 Motion in Limine, denying 52 Motion in Limine, granting 54 Motion in Limine. To the extent that AP is making an additional motion in limine regarding Newsday in its reply brief, it is denied. . Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 6/4/07. (mh, )
June 4, 2007 Exhibit List due by 7/16/2007. Plaintiffs witness list due by 7/9/2007. Defendants Witness list due by 7/16/2007. (kll)
June 4, 2007 68 Featured Case AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting 67 Motion to Continue. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 7/16/2007. Proposed Voir Dire by 7/16/2007. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/16/2007. Jury Selection set for 7/23/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 6/4/2007. (kll)
May 30, 2007 67 Unopposed MOTION to Continue trial date by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Berry, Michael) # 1proposed order; added on 6/1/2007 (cen ). Modified on 6/1/2007 (cen ).
May 21, 2007 66 SURREPLY In Opposition To 63 Reply Brief to Defendant's 54 Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Documents And Testimony Regarding Alleged Third Party Infringements filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cen).
May 17, 2007 65 RESPONSE to 62 Reply Brief, 63 Reply Brief and 64 Reply Brief, filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas) Modified on 5/18/2007 (cen).
May 16, 2007 64 REPLY BRIEF by ASSOCIATED PRESS re 48 motion in limine to limit plaintiff to one statutory damage award under the Copyright Act filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Berry, Michael) Modified on 5/18/2007 (cen ).
May 15, 2007 63 REPLY BRIEF by ASSOCIATED PRESS re 54 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding Alleged Third Party Infringements filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Berry, Michael)
May 15, 2007 62 REPLY BRIEF by ASSOCIATED PRESS to 61 Response to 49 Motion to Limit Plaintiff to Two Awards Under the Digital Millennium Copyright Act filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Berry, Michael) Modified on 5/16/2007 (cen).
May 11, 2007 61 RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to Two Statutory Damage Awards under the Digital Millennium Copyright Act filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cen).
May 11, 2007 60 RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding iPhotoArt filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cen ).
May 11, 2007 59 RESPONSE to Motion re 54 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding Alleged Third-Party Infringements filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hall, Douglas)
May 11, 2007 58 RESPONSE to Motion re 47 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to One Statutory Damage Award under the Copyright Act filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hall, Douglas)
May 11, 2007 57 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding AOL filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hall, Douglas)
May 11, 2007 56 BRIEF in Opposition re 52 First MOTION in Limine To Preclude Eric N. Lieberman From Testifying At Trial filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B# 3 Appendix C)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 55 BRIEF in Support re 54 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding Alleged Third-Party Infringements filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B# 3 Appendix C# 4 Appendix D)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 54 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding Alleged Third-Party Infringements by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 53 BRIEF in Support re 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding iPhotoArt filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Part 1# 2 Appendix A - Part 2# 3 Appendix A - Part 3# 4 Appendix A - Part 4# 5 Appendix A - Part 5# 6 Appendix A - Part 6# 7 Appendix A - Part 7# 8 Appendix A - Part 8# 9 Appendix A - Part 9# 10 Appendix B)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 52 First MOTION in Limine To Preclude Eric N. Lieberman From Testifying At Trial by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cen).
May 4, 2007 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding iPhotoArt by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 50 BRIEF in Support re 49 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to Two Statutory Damage Awards under the Digital Millennium Copyright Act filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 49 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to Two Statutory Damage Awards under the Digital Millennium Copyright Act by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 48 BRIEF in Support re 47 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to One Statutory Damage Award under the Copyright Act filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 47 MOTION in Limine to Limit Plaintiff to One Statutory Damage Award under the Copyright Act by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 46 BRIEF in Support re 45 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding AOL filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Berry, Michael)
May 4, 2007 45 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Testimony Regarding AOL by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Michael)
April 23, 2007 44 Featured Case TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs witness list due by 6/11/2007. Defendants Witness list due by 6/18/2007. Motions in Limine due by 5/4/2007. Response to Motions in Limine due by 5/11/2007. Proposed Voir Dire by 6/18/2007. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 6/18/2007. Proposed Verdict Slips due by 6/18/2007. Stipulation due by 6/18/2007. Jury Selection set for 6/25/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry. Exhibit List due by 6/18/2007. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 4/23/2007. (kll)
April 20, 2007 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Terrence F. McVerry : Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/20/2007. Settlement negitiations are ongoing. Trial estimated to take 3 days. Motions in limine due 5/4/2007. Responses due 5/11/2007. Trial will be scheduled for 6/25/2007. Trial Scheduling Order will be issued. (Court Reporter Richard Ford.) Text only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text only entry constitutes the Court's notice on the matter. (kll)
April 18, 2007 43 PRETRIAL STATEMENT filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Berry, Michael)
April 16, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 4/16/2007. Text only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text only entry constitutes the Court's order on the matter. (kll)
April 13, 2007 42 Pro Hac Vice Fees received in the amount $ 40; receipt # 07000264 re 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (cen)
April 13, 2007 41 MOTION for attorney Paul K. Vickrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Envelope A)(Hall, John)
April 5, 2007 40 NOTICE by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY of Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 4/12/2007 (cen).
March 29, 2007 39 PRETRIAL STATEMENT filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Douglas)
March 9, 2007 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Plaintiff's pretrial statement due March 29, 2007. Defendant's pretrial statement due April 18, 2007. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Terrence F. McVerry. (mh, )
March 9, 2007 38 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 3/9/07. Plaintiff to file pretrial statement by March 29, 2007. Defendant to file pretrial statement by April 18, 2007. A pretrial conference will be held on April 20, 2007 at 2:00 pm. (mh, )
February 22, 2007 37 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Kim R. Gibson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Terrence F. McVerry for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/21/2007. (dlg)
January 25, 2007 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael L. Berry (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Berry, Michael)
August 7, 2006 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (cen )
August 7, 2006 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum; the Reply Memorandum attached as an Exhibit to the Motion shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/2/2006. (dlg)
June 29, 2006 33 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A)(Berry, Michael)
June 29, 2006 32 Appendix to 31 Response To by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Appendix (Penchina Supplemental Declaration)# 2 Exhibit A to I to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 3 Exhibit J to K to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 4 Exhibit L to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 5 Exhibit M to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 6 Exhibit N to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 7 Exhibit N (continued) to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 8 Exhibit O to P to Penchina Supplemental Declaration# 9 Exhibit 2 to 5 to Appendix# 10 Exhibit 6 and 7 to Appendix)(Berry, Michael)
June 29, 2006 31 RESPONSE to 28 Statement of Facts filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Berry, Michael)
June 20, 2006 30 Continued DECLARATION of Douglas M. Hall re: 26 Response to Motion by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 21(A)# 3 Exhibit 21(B)# 4 Exhibit 21(C)# 5 Exhibit 21(D)# 6 Exhibit (E)# 7 Exhibit 22)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/20/2006 (cen).
June 19, 2006 29 DECLARATION of Douglas M. Hall re: 26 Response to Motion by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/20/2006 (cen).
June 19, 2006 28 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 26 Response to Motion by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/20/2006 (cen ).
June 19, 2006 27 RESPONSE to 20 Defendant's Statement of Material Facts filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/20/2006 (cen ).
June 19, 2006 26 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Hall, Douglas) Modified on 6/20/2006 (cen ).
June 1, 2006 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Modify the Case Management Order; the dates for the filing of Plaintiff's Pretrial Narrative Statement, Defendant's Pretrial Narrative Statement, and the Joint Statement Regarding Magistrate Judge are hereby postponed. If the Court denies the Motion of The Associated Press for Summary Judgment, in whole or in part, the parties must file their statements within the following number of days after the Court enters its order ruling on that Motion: Plaintiff's Pretrial Narrative Statement -30 days; Defendant's Pretrial Narrative Statement -54 days; Joint Statement Regarding Magistrate Judge -70 days. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/1/2006. (dlg)
May 30, 2006 24 MOTION to Modify the Case Management Order by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Gayle)
May 30, 2006 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statements by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hall, John)
May 16, 2006 22 ERROR: THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN ERROR: THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW. (Sproul, Gayle) Modified on 5/16/2006 (cen ).
May 15, 2006 21 Appendix to 18 Motion for Summary Judgment, 20 Statement of Facts by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Tab 1 - Complaint for Copyright Infringement# 2 Appendix Tab 2 - Declaration of Robert Penchina# 3 Appendix Tab 2 - Declaration of Robert Penchina (Continued)# 4 Appendix Tab 3 - Declaration of J. David Ake# 5 Appendix Tab 4 - Declaration of James R. Gerberich# 6 Appendix Tab 5 - Deposition of J. David Ake# 7 Appendix Tab 6 - Deposition of George Galt# 8 Appendix Tab 7 - Deposition of James R. Gerberich# 9 Appendix Tab 8 - Deposition of Valencia M. McClatchey# 10 Appendix Tab 9 - Exhibits from Deposition of Valencia M. McClatchey# 11 Appendix Tab 10 - Deposition of Gene J. Puskar# 12 Appendix Tab 11 - Deposition of Charles Sheehan# 13 Appendix Tab 12 - Plaintiff?s Response to Defendants Requests for Admissions# 14 Appendix Tab 13 - Responses and Objections of Defendant The Associated Press to the First Set of Requests for Admission by Plaintiff Valencia McClatchey# 15 Appendix Tab 14 - Responses and Objections of Defendant The Associated Press to Plaintiff?s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-16) to Defendant)(Sproul, Gayle)
May 15, 2006 20 STATEMENT OF FACTS Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 re 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. by ASSOCIATED PRESS.. (Sproul, Gayle) Modified on 5/31/2006 (jjg).
May 15, 2006 19 BRIEF in Support re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Sproul, Gayle)
May 15, 2006 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Sproul, Gayle) Additional attachment # 1 Proposed order; added on 5/16/2006 (cen ).
March 8, 2006 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Berry. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/8/2006. (dlg)
March 7, 2006 16 Pro Hac Vice Fees received in the amount $ 40 receipt # 06000223 re 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (cen )
March 7, 2006 15 MOTION for attorney Michael Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Gayle C. Sproul# 2 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Gayle)
January 27, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery due by 3/15/2006; Expert Reports due by 3/29/2006; Responses to Expert Reports due by 4/24/2006; Expert Depositions due by 5/12/2006; Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement due by 6/2/2006; Defendant's Pretrial Statement due by 6/26/2006; Summary Judgment due by 5/15/2006; Joint Statement Regarding Magistrate Judge due by 7/12/2006. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/27/2006. (dlg)
January 26, 2006 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Scheduling Motion Certificate# 2 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Gayle)
December 6, 2005 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion to Extend Time; Discovery due by 2/1/2006; Expert Reports due by 2/15/2006; Responses to Expert Reports due by 3/13/2006; Expert Depositions due by 3/31/2006; Plaintiff 's Pretrial Statement due by 4/21/2006; Defendant's Pretrial Statement due by 5/15/2006; Summary Judgment due by 4/3/2006; Joint Statement re: magistrate judge due by 5/31/2006. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/5/2005. (dlg)
December 2, 2005 11 Joint MOTION to Extend Time forDiscovery by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, John)
August 1, 2005 10 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2005; Joinder of Parties due by 11/3/2005; Discovery due by 12/2/2005; Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 2/21/2006; Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 3/14/2006; Plaintiffs Expert Reports due by 12/15/2005; Defendants Expert Reports due by 12/15/2005; Expert Depositions to be completed by 1/31/2006; Summary Judgment due by 2/3/2006; Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 3/28/2006. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/1/2005. (dlg)
August 1, 2005 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kim R. Gibson : Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/1/2005 (via telephone) (no Court Reporter) (dlg)
July 26, 2005 8 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY, ASSOCIATED PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Case Management Order)(jjg)
June 20, 2005 Featured Case ORDER upon motion granting [7-1] motion for Douglas M. Hall, Esq. and Kara L. Szpondowski, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filing Fee $80.00; Receipt # 4143 (signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 06/20/05) CM all parties of record. (cen)
June 17, 2005 7 MOTION by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY for Douglas M. Hall, Esq. and Kara L. Szpondowski, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filing Fee $80.00; Receipt # 4143 with Proposed Order. (cen) (slv, ).
June 14, 2005 Featured Case ORDER upon motion granting [5-1] motion for Robert Penchina, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filing Fee $40.00; Receipt #4011 (signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 06/14/05) CM all parties of record. (cen)
June 14, 2005 6 Case Management Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on 8/1/05 in Room 104, Penn Traffic Building, 319 Washington St., Johnstown, PA 15901 (cen) (slv, ).
June 9, 2005 5 MOTION by ASSOCIATED PRESS for Robert Penchina, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filing Fee $40.00; Receipt #4011 with Proposed Order. (cen) (slv, ).
June 2, 2005 4 DISCLOSURE statement by ASSOCIATED PRESS (cen) (slv, ).
June 2, 2005 3 ANSWER to Complaint by ASSOCIATED PRESS (Attorney Gayle C. Sproul) (cen) (slv, ).
February 24, 2005 2 DISCLOSURE statement by VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY (cen) (slv, ).
February 24, 2005 1 COMPLAINT with summons issued; jury demand; Filing Fee $250.00; Receipt #05000159 (cen) (slv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLATCHEY v. ASSOCIATED PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALENCIA M. MCCLATCHEY
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Represented By: Gayle C. Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?