LANE v. ROZUM et al
Plaintiff: JOHN L. LANE
Defendant: GERALD ROZUM, DANIEL GEHLMAN, JOHN DOE, SERGEANT STAYER, C.O. KEYSER, LIEUTENANT RYBA, SERGEANT BROTHERS, C.O. WALTERS, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., DENISE THOMAS, DR. RASHIDA MAHMUD, MICHELE SWANHART, JANE DOE, COUNSELOR RENEE SNYDER, UNIT MANAGER EDWARD MULLIGAN, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and SCI SOMERSET
Case Number: 3:2013cv00268
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Presiding Judge: Keith A. Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that summary judgment is granted in part to Defendant Dr. Mahmud as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF no. 175 , which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The matter remains with the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, and the Magistrate Judge shall set a date for the filing of pretrial statements and (if the parties desire it) shall hold a pretrial mediation conference, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/3/2019. (dlg)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment at ECF no. 125 is granted. Judgment is entered for the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. The motion for summary judgment at ECF no. 121 is denied without prejudice: I wil l consider the entire motion for summary judgment by Dr. Rashida Mahmud when the discovery ordered by the Magistrate Judge has been completed, together with any supplemental materials filed by the parties in support of their positions on summary jud gment and any supplemental Report and Recommendation by the Magistrate Judge; 142 Report and Recommendation, as relevant, is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The matter remains before the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/29/2017. (dlg)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is ORDERED that the motions for summary judgment at ECF no. 74 and ECF no. 78 and the motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim at ECF no. 38 and ECF no. 40 are granted in part and denied in part as set out in [101 ] Report and Recommendation, which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The remaining claims are against Dr. Mahmud for deliberate indifference and negligence, and against the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections for a defective condition of rea l estate. The Clerk can terminate the following as defendants: Gerald Rozum, Daniel Gehlman, Sergeant Stayer, C.O. Keyser, Lieutenant Ryba, Sergeant Brothers, C.O. Walters, Denise Thomas, Renee Snyder, Edward Mulligan, Joseph Bianconi, John LaFrambo ise, the S.C.I. Somerset, Corizon Health, Inc., and R.N. Michele Swanhart. The matter remains before the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/28/2016. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANE v. ROZUM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L. LANE
Represented By: Bonnie L. Kift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD ROZUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL GEHLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT STAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. KEYSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT RYBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT BROTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. RASHIDA MAHMUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE SWANHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR RENEE SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER EDWARD MULLIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI SOMERSET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?