GARRETT v. WEXFORD HEALTH et al
Plaintiff: KAREEM GARRETT
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH, DR. NAJI, DEBRA J. YOUNKIN, JANET PEARSON, DEB CUTSHALL, KATHRI and STEVEN GLUNT
Case Number: 3:2014cv00031
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Objections filed by Defendant Barnes (ECF No. 308 ) are OVERRULED as they are without merit; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of the Chief Magistrate Judge, dated 8/31/2020, (E CF No. 307 ) is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court; AND IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within 14 days after notice of the Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4) (A). This matter is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/23/2020. (dlg)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 225 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 227 Motion to Dismiss; granting 229 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 243 Report and Recommendation dated 6/12/2017 is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. And it is further Ordered that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/18/2017. (dlg)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 183 ), which has been converted into a Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Khatri is GRANTED and judgment will be entered in favor of Dr. Khatri. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 185 ), which has be en converted into a Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by the Medical Defendants is GRANTED and judgment will be entered in favor of the Medical Defendants. The Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for More Definite Statement (ECF No. 181 ) filed by the DOC Defendants is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall be given one final opportunity to amend his complaint and claims against the DOC. He should file a single operative complaint consisting of a short and plain statement of his claims as required by Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Fourth Amended Complaint no later than 9/30/2016. Plaintiff is advised that this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution if the Fourth Amended Complaint is not timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 209 ) dated July 14, 2016, is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/9/2016. (dlg)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is hereby Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 21 ) is DENIED. It is further Ordered that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 26 ) is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court. It is further Ordered that this matter is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/21/2014. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT v. WEXFORD HEALTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREEM GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. NAJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA J. YOUNKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB CUTSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN GLUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?