EVANS v. CERNICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GARY EVANS, JR.
Defendant: CERNICS, INC., JEFFREY CERNIC and EDWARD CERNIC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00125
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Blair
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - upon consideration of the motions for attorney's fees filed by Plaintiff Gary Evans (ECF No. 92 ) and Defendant Jeffrey Cernic (ECF No. 101 ), and in accordance with the accompanying memorandum opinion, IT IS HER EBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees (ECF No. 92 ) is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff's hourly rate and hour total are reasonable, thus yielding a total lodestar amount of $72,100. However, the Court finds that a 30% reduction is warranted given Plaintiff's limited success at trial. Accordingly, the Court awards Plaintiff's counsel $50,470 in attorney's fees. 2. Defendant Jeffrey Cernic's motion for attorney's fees (ECF No. 101 ) is denied. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case as closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/5/2018. (dlg)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion in Limine; granting 61 Motion in Limine; granting 62 Motion in Limine, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/26/2017. (krh)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER - upon consideration of the motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff Gary Evans, Jr. (ECF No. 38 ), and in accordance with the accompanying memorandum opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/16/2016. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. CERNICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY EVANS, JR.
Represented By: Jeremy M. Cerutti
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERNICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY CERNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD CERNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?