LOPEZ v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LOPEZ
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00257
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Cambria
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 122 Motion to Remove Plaintiff's Guardian Ad Litem, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/20/2020. (dlg)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/7/2017. (dlg)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 55 Motion to Strike, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/13/2017. (dlg)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Plaintiff's Medical Records; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) Deposition; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Protective Order, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/13/2015. (dlg)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Compel; granting 18 Motion for Protective Order, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/16/2015. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPEZ v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LOPEZ
Represented By: Nicholas I. Timko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Kendra L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?