HADEED et al v. ADVANCED VASCULAR RESOURCES OF JOHNSTOWN, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SAMIR HADEED, MD and JOHNSTOWN HEART AND VASCULAR CENTER, INC.
Defendant: ADVANCED VASCULAR RESOURCES OF JOHNSTOWN, LLC, AVR MANAGEMENT, LLC, WASHINGTON VASCULAR INSTITUTE, LLC and MUBASHAR CHOUDRY, MD
Case Number: 3:2015cv00022
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Cambria
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 119 Motion in Limine, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/6/2019. (dlg)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER - upon consideration of Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Johnstown Heart and Vascular Center, Inc. and Counter-Defendant Samir Hadeed, MD's Motions in Limine (ECF No. 119 ) and Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs AVR Management, LLC and Washington Vascular Institute, LLC's responses thereto, and for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion accompanying this Order, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude/Limit the Introduction of Evidence and/or Testimony Relating to Monetary Damages is DENIED; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence and/or Testimony of Plaintiffs' Alleged Breaches of the Sublease and Amendment to Master Lease is DENIED; and 3. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence and/or Testimony of Plaintiffs' Alleged Breaches of the Washington Vascular Institute Group Physician Agreement is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, up on consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude the Report and Testimony of John W. (Jack) Teitz, the Court finds it necessary to hold a Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993), hearing on whether the report and prop osed testimony of Mr. Teitz meet the requirements of the Federal Rules of Evidence. A Daubert hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion is scheduled for Monday, June 10, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom A, 319 Washington Street, Johnstown, PA 15901, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/24/2019. (dlg)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 96 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court Vacates its Order dismissing this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (ECF No. 95 ) and Dismisses Advanced Vascular Resources of Johnstown, LLC from this lawsuit without prejudice to asserting its claims in state court, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/13/2018. (dlg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 84 Motion to Refer Case to Bankruptcy Court, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/1/2017. (dlg)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in party and denying in part 44 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion for Summary Judgment, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/30/2017. (dlg)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Leave to Amend, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/26/2017. (dlg)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/8/2016. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HADEED et al v. ADVANCED VASCULAR RESOURCES OF JOHNSTOWN, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMIR HADEED, MD
Represented By: Ronald P. Carnevali, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSTOWN HEART AND VASCULAR CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Ronald P. Carnevali, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED VASCULAR RESOURCES OF JOHNSTOWN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVR MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON VASCULAR INSTITUTE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUBASHAR CHOUDRY, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?