CLOUSER v. GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SYLVIA A. CLOUSER
Defendant: GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GGNSC ALTOONA HILLVIEW GP LLC and GGNSC ALTOONA HILLVIEW LP
Case Number: 3:2015cv00033
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Blair
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 86 Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, Plaintiff's wrongful death claim before this Court is hereby STAYED pending the arbitration of her survival claim, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/10/2017. (dlg)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 Motion to Stay the Trial of Plaintiff's Wrongful Death Claim. It is further Ordered that the parties shall continue to comply with the deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order entered on 6/9/2016 (ECF No. 60 ), and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/9/2016. (dlg)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - upon consideration of Defendants' amended motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Defendants' motion to compel arbitration (ECF No. 40 ), and upon consideration of the parties' briefing of Def endants' motions (ECF Nos. 42 , 43 , 48 ), and for the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum, it is hereby Ordered that Defendants' motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: Defendants' motion to compel the arbitration of the wrongful death claim (Count I) is DENIED. Defendants' motion to compel the arbitration of the survival action claim (Count II) is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages as to the wrongful death claim (Count I) is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages as to the survival action claim (Count II) is DENIED. It is further Ordered that a post-discovery status conference as to Plaintiff's wrongful death claim (Count I) is scheduled for 4/7/2016, at 10:00 a.m., and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/23/2016. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLOUSER v. GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA A. CLOUSER
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Sorisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC ALTOONA HILLVIEW GP LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Sorisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC ALTOONA HILLVIEW LP
Represented By: Benjamin Sorisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?