APONICK et al v. OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC

Plaintiff: CHARMAINE APONICK and JOHN APONICK
Defendant: OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00150
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Bedford
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Errata re: #8 Motion for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/21/2018. (dlg)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Errata re: #7 Motion for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/21/2018. (dlg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 Errata re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, C. Stephen Setliff by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. Reason for Correction: signature on document and filer do not match and proposed order was not attached. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Setliff, Charles)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 Errata re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Eli Jason S. Mackey by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. Reason for Correction: Signature on document and filer do not match and proposed order not attached. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Mackey, Eli )
September 19, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR #1: Signature on document and filer do not match. ERROR #2: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised of signature requirements. The attorney wishing to be admitted should resubmit the document using the ERRATA event and utilizing their own user name and password. The attorney should also attach a proposed order to the ERRATA. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cianflone, Matthew) Modified on 9/19/2018. (cel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 ERROR: SIGNATURE AND FILER DO NOT MATCH; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4867611) by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Setliff, #2 Exhibit A - Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Cianflone, Matthew) Modified on 9/19/2018. (cel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 ERROR: SIGNATURE AND FILER DO NOT MATCH; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4867596) by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mackey, #2 Exhibit A Mackey Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Cianflone, Matthew) Modified on 9/19/2018. (cel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Mundy on behalf of CHARMAINE APONICK, JOHN APONICK. (Mundy, James)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Kim R. Gibson, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/27/2018. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit "A" Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, (2) Exhibit "B" Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) Report, (3) Exhibit "C" Initial Scheudling Order). (krh)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC re #2 Answer to Complaint (Cianflone, Matthew)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. (Cianflone, Matthew)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Bedford County, case number 697-2018 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4810820) filed by OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APONICK et al v. OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE APONICK
Represented By: James F. Mundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN APONICK
Represented By: James F. Mundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMNI BEDFORD SPRINGS RESORT, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Cianflone
Represented By: Charles S. Setliff
Represented By: Eli J. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?