MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC et al v. SYNERGISTIKS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAIMLER TRUST and MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC
Defendant: SYNERGISTIKS, INC., ROBERT WILLIAMSON and HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON
Case Number: 3:2018cv00184
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SYNERGISTIKS, INC. (jv)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST by MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, DAIMLER TRUST for entry of DEFAULT against SYNERGISTIKS, INC. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Readshaw, Harry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, DAIMLER TRUST. HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Boucek, Carolyn)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Quinn on behalf of HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON. (Quinn, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, DAIMLER TRUST. SYNERGISTIKS, INC. served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Readshaw, Harry)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Daimler Investments US Corporation, Daimler North America Corporation, Daimler AG as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DAIMLER TRUST, MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC. (Readshaw, Harry)
September 19, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2018. (jv)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to SYNERGISTIKS, INC., HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON, ROBERT WILLIAMSON (jv)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SYNERGISTIKS, INC., HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON, ROBERT WILLIAMSON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4865555), filed by MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC, DAIMLER TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Summons as to Robert Williamson, #16 Summons as to Harold G. Williamson, #17 Summons as to Synergistiks, Inc.) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC et al v. SYNERGISTIKS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAIMLER TRUST
Represented By: Harry A. Readshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC
Represented By: Harry A. Readshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNERGISTIKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD G. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: John E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?