FOOR v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: LLOYD B. FOOR
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv00229
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/3/2019. (dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Rolfes by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Rolfes, Andrew)
January 2, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4978813) by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rolfes, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit "A" Stipulation, (2) Exhibit "B" Report, (3) Exhibit "C" Order). (krh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Hawkins, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (with Certificate of Service) by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Hawkins, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of LLOYD B. FOOR. (Rihn, D.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
November 9, 2018 Judge Kim R. Gibson added. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. (cel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4929157), filed by LLOYD B. FOOR. SUMMONS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOOR v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew J. Rolfes
Represented By: Robert S. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD B. FOOR
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?