OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC. v. BOREN et al

Plaintiff: OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC.
Defendant: GURMIT SINGH, MARK BOREN and DEV TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00241
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC.. GURMIT SINGH waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Parrish, Michael)
January 8, 2019 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC.. DEV TRANSPORTATION, LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Parrish, Michael)
December 19, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Ramaley on behalf of DEV TRANSPORTATION, LLC, GURMIT SINGH. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2018 5 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
November 30, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to GURMIT SINGH (jjg)
November 30, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to MARK BOREN (jjg)
November 30, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to DEV TRANSPORTATION, LLC (jjg)
November 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4949245), filed by OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC. v. BOREN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURMIT SINGH
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BOREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEV TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OZARK MOTOR LINES, INC.
Represented By: Toby D. McIlwain
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?