DICKANT et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Plaintiff: JOSEPH DICKANT and CRYSTAL M. DICKANT
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00248
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 1/18/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 2/11/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (dlg)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit "A" Stipulation, (2) Exhibit "B" Report, (3) Exhibit "C" Order). (krh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying WALMART, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (ksa)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clearfield County, case number 2018-1850-CD Copies attached: Complaint and Proof of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4956989), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Proof of Service) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DICKANT et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: Rebecca Sember Izsak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DICKANT
Represented By: Emerald N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL M. DICKANT
Represented By: Emerald N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?