BITER v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: RONALD P. BITER
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv00262
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RONALD P. BITER. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (sdp)
January 16, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Return of Service executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Proof of Service by RONALD P. BITER (Marcel, Henri)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (cel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RONALD P. BITER (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Marcel, Henri)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4976237), filed by RONALD P. BITER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BITER v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD P. BITER
Represented By: Henri Marcel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?