TAYLOR v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: CORNELIUS TAYLOR
Defendant: DR. MOBOLOGY and BARRY SMITH
Case Number: 3:2019cv00091
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF no. #9 , the relevant part of which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/27/2019. (dlg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by CORNELIUS TAYLOR. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by CORNELIUS TAYLOR, recommending that if he does not pay the filing fee within two weeks the matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and if he does pay the filing fee it is recommended that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a federal claim wthout leave to amend; Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 6/24/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 6/6/2019. (plp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00903. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the USDC for the WD of PA; and2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case..Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 6/5/19. (ma)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 05/29/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(pjr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (pjr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION filed by Cornelius Taylor allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (pjr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Cornelius Taylor. (pjr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cornelius Taylor.(pjr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mobology, Barry Smith lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Cornelius Taylor.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORNELIUS TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MOBOLOGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?