WARNER v. G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: JESSICA WARNER
Defendant: G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED. (Mahler, Emily)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mahler, Emily)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Mahler on behalf of G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED. (Mahler, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSICA WARNER. G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Gunther, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5174639), filed by JESSICA WARNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARNER v. G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA WARNER
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.T. SLOAN, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?