FENNELL v. PIROZZOLA et al

Plaintiff: ROBERT FENNELL
Defendant: DAVID CLOSE, KENNETH HOLLIBAUGH, LONNIE OLIVER, GARY BLAKELY, ROBERT REED, PENNIE BURKEY, BYRON BRUMBAUGH, STEPHEN JOHNSON, DONNY HAGENS, FRANCIS PIROZZOLA, DAVID KESSLING and RUSSELL BOLLINGER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT FENNELL. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #2 Authorization, #3 Envelope) (nll)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendation filed by ROBERT FENNELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (nll)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Envelope containing #2 Memorandum Order and Conditional Report and Recommendation returned marked "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward". (plp)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING; the Clerk shall mark this matter administratively closed until plaintiff submits the filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with an inmate account statement; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 proposed complaint recommending that if plaintiff does not take steps to pay the filing fee or submit a valid in forma pauperis motion within two weeks, the matter should be dismissed for failure to prosecute; if plaintiff does pay the filing fee the complaint should be dismissed and as more fully stated. (Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019, Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 7/11/2019) Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 6/24/2019. (plp) Modified text on 6/27/2019. (ksa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged, no filing fee paid, no Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit of Dominic Page, #3 Envelope Complaint mailed in) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FENNELL v. PIROZZOLA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FENNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CLOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH HOLLIBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONNIE OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY BLAKELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNIE BURKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRON BRUMBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNY HAGENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS PIROZZOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KESSLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL BOLLINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?