COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. v. SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.

Plaintiff: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.
Defendant: 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00105
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Oral Argument and Evidentiary Hearing before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Court Reporter Shirley Hall, e-mail: shirleyhall_uscra@yahoo.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/6/2019. Redaction Request due 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2019. (sah)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim. The time for Plaintiff to file a response to the Counterclaim is extended to 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/29/2019. (dlg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Burne, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hopkins, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Issuance of Order of Seizure filed by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Hopkins, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Hopkins, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Maurice Auer by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (Hopkins, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. (cel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC. (Hopkins, David)
August 11, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. re #14 Order,, (Manne, Beverly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBITS A, B and C in Support of #16 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C) (Hopkins, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Counterclaim and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC., COUNTERCLAIM against COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Hopkins, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Order of Possession, Scheduling Order, and Memorandum of Law served on Michel Imhof, CEO, Superior Machining, Inc. on 07/26/2019, filed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Manne, Beverly)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on Motion for Issuance of Order of Seizure is set for 8/20/2019, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson. (dlg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - upon consideration of Defendant's Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Order of Seizure (ECF No. #11 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion on Tuesday, August 20, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A of the Federal Courthouse located at 319 Washington Street, Johnstown, PA 15901. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a notice of hearing at least twenty-four hours beforehand in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Pa. R.C.P. 1071-75. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/30/2019. (dlg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -Objection to #11 Motion to Continue, #12 Motion to Continue, filed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manne, Beverly)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hopkins, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue August 1, 2019 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Order of Seizure by SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hopkins, David)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Seizure (ECF No. #7 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion on Thursday, August 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A of the Federal Courthouse located at 319 Washington Street, Johnstown, PA 15901. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a notice of hearing at least twenty-four hours beforehand in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Pa. R.C.P. 1071-75. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/24/2019. (dlg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Manne, Beverly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief for Issuance of Order of Seizure filed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Manne, Beverly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Order of Seizure by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (Manne, Beverly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Koop Irwin on behalf of COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Koop Irwin, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Burne on behalf of COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Burne, Matthew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. (Manne, Beverly)
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 7/16/2019. (jv)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC. (cel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5198428), filed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. v. SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SUPERIOR MACHINING, INC.
Represented By: David J. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.
Represented By: Beverly Weiss Manne
Represented By: Katherine E. Koop Irwin
Represented By: Matthew J. Burne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?