DEAN v. TICE et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY DEAN and JEFFERY DEAN
Defendant: CO REDMOND, M. HOUSER, ERIC TICE, DORINA VARNER, OFFICE OF POLICY, GRANTS & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, DAVE ONSTEAD, KERI MOORE and UNKNOWN
Case Number: 3:2019cv00113
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, and this order to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/13/2019. (sms)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by JEFFERY DEAN. Fee $15.34, receipt number 34668005012. (plp)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JEFFERY DEAN. (jv)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against M. HOUSER, KERI MOORE, DAVE ONSTEAD, REDMOND, ERIC TICE, UNKNOWN, DORINA VARNER, filed by JEFFERY DEAN. (jv)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Plaintiff shall pay $15.34 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A); however, Plaintiff is assessed the total $350.00 filing fee in this case. Plaintiff is advised that no further action will be taken in this case until the initial partial fee of $15.34 is paid in full. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/20/2019. (sms)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JEFFERY DEAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ept)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Should Plaintiff wish to proceed with this action, he must authorize payments from his inmate account by returning a signed copy of the attached Authorization on or before August 16, 2019 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/30/2019. (sms)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEFFREY DEAN. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Envelope, #5 Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEAN v. TICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO REDMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. HOUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC TICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORINA VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF POLICY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANTS & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE ONSTEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERI MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?