RILEY v. LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CONTESSA A. RILEY
Defendant: LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. and RENEE LUCIANO
Case Number: 3:2019cv00155
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie L. Haines for all further proceedings. Judge Kim R. Gibson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RENEE LUCIANO, LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC.. (Passarelli, Mariah)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CONTESSA A. RILEY. RENEE LUCIANO waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Bracken, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CONTESSA A. RILEY. LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Bracken, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant A. Andrews on behalf of RENEE LUCIANO. (Andrews, Bryant)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of RENEE LUCIANO. (Passarelli, Mariah)
October 10, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorneys advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/17/2019. (jm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant A. Andrews on behalf of LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. (Andrews, Bryant)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. (Passarelli, Mariah)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RENEE LUCIANO, LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5299547), filed by CONTESSA A. RILEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RILEY v. LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTESSA A. RILEY
Represented By: Robert A. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIANO'S AUTO BODY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE LUCIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?