VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. v. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Plaintiff: VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.
Defendant: DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00185
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support of #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled for 1/10/2020, at 10:00 am. before Judge Gibson. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/12/2019. (dlg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Continue January 3, 2020 Hearing Related to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Presta, Lisa)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie R. Schumacher on behalf of DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Schumacher, Jamie)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Smith Presta on behalf of DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for 1/3/2020, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter (dlg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cech, Alan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Order) (Cech, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Hobaugh, Adam)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Hobaugh on behalf of VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Hobaugh, Adam)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Cech, Alan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (jm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5343638), filed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. v. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: Alan E. Cech
Represented By: Adam K. Hobaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Lisa Smith Presta
Represented By: Jamie R. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?