BLAZEVICH v. STAR HOTELS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: REAGAN BLAZEVICH
Defendant: GARY SHILLING, STAR HOTELS,INC., ANDY MODI and KIM HEMPHILL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00198
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by REAGAN BLAZEVICH. KIM HEMPHILL served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Davis, Lee)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by REAGAN BLAZEVICH. GARY SHILLING served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Davis, Lee)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF COURT granting Defendant Star Hotels, Inc.'s #15 Motion to Extend Time to file appropriate response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 9, 2020, and as more fully stated in said Order of Court. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 01/10/2020. (dag)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time to File an Appropriate Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by STAR HOTELS,INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McGrath, Estelle)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 Errata re #13 Disclosure Statement by STAR HOTELS,INC. Reason for Correction: document had incorrect title. (McGrath, Estelle)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STAR HOTELS,INC. (McGrath, Estelle)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Estelle K. McGrath on behalf of STAR HOTELS,INC. (McGrath, Estelle)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by STAR HOTELS,INC. Defendant has thirty (30) additional days to respond to the Complaint. A response is due on or before January 10, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 12/11/2019. (dag)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by STAR HOTELS,INC. Answer due from STAR HOTELS,INC. on 1/10/2020. (Butcher, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Scheuring on behalf of STAR HOTELS,INC. (Scheuring, Gregory)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STAR HOTELS,INC. (Butcher, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Butcher on behalf of STAR HOTELS,INC. (Butcher, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of STAR HOTELS,INC. (Mangino, Joni)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dlg)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by REAGAN BLAZEVICH (Davis, Lee)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by REAGAN BLAZEVICH (Davis, Lee)
November 20, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re Remark. ERROR: Entry filed in wrong case. CORRECTION: Removed from public view since this was filed by Court on incorrect case. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) Modified text on 11/22/2019. (tt)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KIM HEMPHILL, ANDY MODI, GARY SHILLING, STAR HOTELS,INC. (jv)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIM HEMPHILL, ANDY MODI, GARY SHILLING, STAR HOTELS,INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5363144), filed by REAGAN BLAZEVICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to the right to sue, #3 Summons as to Star Hotels Inc., Gary Shilling, Andy Modi and Kim Hemphill) (jv) Modified text on 11/20/2019. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAZEVICH v. STAR HOTELS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY SHILLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR HOTELS,INC.
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher
Represented By: Estelle K. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDY MODI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM HEMPHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAGAN BLAZEVICH
Represented By: Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?