REED et al v. SOSSONG et al
Plaintiff: AMBER REED and DANIEL A. REED
Defendant: ALEX MARK SOSSONG, M.D., CIERRA D. TURNER, P.A. and DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 3:2020cv00035
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL A. REED. CIERRA D. TURNER, PA waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Perry, Jon)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL A. REED. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Perry, Jon)
March 28, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at #here . Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL A. REED. ALEX MARK SOSSONG, MD waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Perry, Jon)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Pipa on behalf of ALEX MARK SOSSONG, MD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Pipa, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dlg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALEX MARK SOSSONG, MD, CIERRA D. TURNER, PA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5485318), filed by DANIEL A. REED, AMBER REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) Modified text on 2/27/2020. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REED et al v. SOSSONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX MARK SOSSONG, M.D.
Represented By: Michael D. Pipa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIERRA D. TURNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER REED
Represented By: Jon R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. REED
Represented By: Jon R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?