MARIN v. ODDO
Petitioner: VICTOR BRANDON MARIN
Respondent: L. J. ODDO
Case Number: 3:2020cv00129
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF COURT. Respondent shall file a response to #1 the petition for writ of habeas corpus on or before 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 07/14/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ard)
July 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto added. (plp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-00659. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER hispetition to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania and CLOSE this file.Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/10/2020. (ve)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred electronically in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:20-cv-00344 containing electronic documents.
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case; the Clerk Transfer this case to the USDC for the Middle District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/17/2020. (c/m 4/17/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case by L. J. Oddo (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of L. J. Oddo (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that withing Forty (40) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a response. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/19/2020. (c/m 2/19/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14637121330 (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Victor Brandon Marin. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARIN v. ODDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. J. ODDO
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICTOR BRANDON MARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?