FLICK v. MASON et al
Petitioner: THOMAS EDWARD FLICK
Respondent: WILLIAM SHAW, ATTORNEY GENERAL JOSH SHAPIRO and BERNADETTE MASON
Case Number: 3:2020cv00252
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - It is Ordered that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. No certificate of appealability is issued. The Report and Recommendation is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall again mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/12/2021. (dlg)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #4 Report and Recommendation by THOMAS EDWARD FLICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - It is Ordered that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. No certificate of appealability is issued. The Report and Recommendation is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/6/2021. (dlg)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS EDWARD FLICK. It is recommended that the petition be dismissed without need of service or response and that no certificate of appealability be issued. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/18/2020. (bgs)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by THOMAS EDWARD FLICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (bgs)
December 18, 2020 Judge Kim R. Gibson presiding and Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto referred. (bgs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/18/2020. (bgs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THOMAS EDWARD FLICK. (Attachments: #1 statement, #2 Petition for writ of habeas corpus, #3 Envelope, #4 Exhibit) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLICK v. MASON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BERNADETTE MASON
Represented By: Ryan P. Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS EDWARD FLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?