SCOTT v. DEPUTY CLOSE et al
Plaintiff: EARNEST SCOTT, JR.
Defendant: C/O 1 GONDEK, NURSE MICHAEL P RADAKER, DEPUTY CLOSE, CAPTAIN JONES, L.T. BUTERBAUGH, SGT. JONES and UNIT MANAGER KELLY
Case Number: 3:2021cv00046
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Re-Amend Complaint and #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, and denying #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/7/2021. (bgs)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Envelope) (lar)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 Remark: Correspondence received from Plaintiff to the Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #6 Report and Recommendation by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Re-Amend Complaint as to Nurse Radaker by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections and Amend Complaint. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2021. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2021.) This order does not give the plaintiff leave to amend his complaint as to any defendant other than Radaker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 4/1/2021. (bgs)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint, MOTION to Re-Amend Complaint filed by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint filed by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. Recommendation: The complaint, except for one claim identified in this report and recommendation, should be dismissed for failure to state a claim without leave to amend. Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2021. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 3/24/2021. (bgs)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against C/O 1 GONDEK, CAPTAIN JONES, DEPUTY CLOSE, L.T. BUTERBAUGH, MICHAEL P RADAKER, filed by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons) (bgs)
March 23, 2021 Judge Stephanie L. Haines presiding and Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto referred. (bgs)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 3/23/2021. (bgs)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EARNEST SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Summons, #5 Envelope) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. DEPUTY CLOSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O 1 GONDEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE MICHAEL P RADAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY CLOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. BUTERBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARNEST SCOTT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?