DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS v. WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Defendant: WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 3:2021cv00108
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, APPROVED AND SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 6/24/2021. (dlg)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - Upon consideration of the stipulation for entry of judgment executed by the parties, the stipulation is hereby approved and JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE on plaintiff's complaint in this action is ENTERED in favor of plaintiff and against defendant and the subject property in the amount of $11,534,355.56, plus interest (including default interest) and additional attorney's fees and other costs accruing from 6/6/2021, pursuant to the subject loan documents. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 6/24/2021. (dlg)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION (Stipulated) Order for Appointment of Receiver by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Quaglia, Raymond)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Quaglia, Raymond)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying DB USA CORPORATION as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Quaglia, Raymond)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Adam Quaglia on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Quaglia, Raymond)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber L. Reiner Skovdal on behalf of WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Reiner Skovdal, Amber)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 06/16/2021. (dag)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (sas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6564351), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A, #2Exhibit B, #3Exhibit C, #4Exhibit D, #5Exhibit E, #6Exhibit F, #7Exhibit G, #8Exhibit H, #9Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (ijh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS v. WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTWOOD ZAMIAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Amber L. Reiner Skovdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Represented By: Justin E. Kerner
Represented By: Raymond Adam Quaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?