FIGUEROA v. PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PAROLE AND PROBATION et al
Petitioner: REYNALDO FIGUEROA
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PAROLE AND PROBATION and BARRY SMITH
Case Number: 3:2022cv00036
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Returned Executed by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PAROLE AND PROBATION served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022; BARRY SMITH served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (lar)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (lar)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Remark: Service copies fwd to USMS this date. Order at ECF No. 10 mailed to petitioner this date. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, return receipt requested. Costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/14/2022. (et)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REOPENING CASE: In light of payment of the filing fee, the Clerk's Office is directed to REOPEN this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/30/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dad)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (lar)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 24668074178 (lar)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner is to pay the $5.00 filing fee on or before April 15, 2022, or this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until the filing fee is paid. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/15/2022. (dad)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar) Modified text on 3/14/2022 to remove from view. Pages were missing. Statement refiled at #5 . (lar)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by REYNALDO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIGUEROA v. PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PAROLE AND PROBATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REYNALDO FIGUEROA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PAROLE AND PROBATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?