UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JEROME
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TERESA B. JEROME
Case Number: 3:2022cv00050
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 USA Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ADR Notice and Order at Document No. 4 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Claypool, Mark)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TERESA B. JEROME served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Claypool, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 04/14/2022. (dag)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TERESA B. JEROME (lyk)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TERESA B. JEROME, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (lyk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JEROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mark G. Claypool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA B. JEROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?