DAVID et al v. AMAZON.COM INC. et al
Plaintiff: CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID and CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC. and AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00087
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 18 Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID. (Shiner, Michael)
June 18, 2024 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shiner, Michael)
June 18, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID. (Shiner, Michael)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF COURT granting #14 Motion for George D. Pilja to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and, IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that George D. Pilja, Esq., hereby is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Carol David, Harold David and Centre County Mutual Fire Insurance Company, P of H, before this Court in this action only. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 6/6/2024. (dlg)
June 5, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney George D. Pilja to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8297626) by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice) (Pilja, George)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held on Tuesday, June 25, 2024, at 2:00 P.M. The Court will conduct the case management conference via a TEAMS audio conference number, which requires participants to dial in and provide an identification number. The Court will provide the conference phone number and conference ID number via an email to all counsel in advance of the conference, and as more fully stated in said Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 5/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, #2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report, #3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order) (dlg)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 05/28/2024. (dag)
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag)
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grewe, Erin)
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMAZON.COM INC.. (Grewe, Erin)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying Subsidiary as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC. (Grewe, Erin)
May 15, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID, CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Shiner, Michael)
May 15, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID, CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H. AMAZON.COM INC. served on 5/2/2024, answer due 5/23/2024. (Shiner, Michael)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rtm)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Shiner, Michael)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Shiner, Michael)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H, CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID. (Shiner, Michael)
April 29, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Case previously opened in incorrect division. CORRECTION: Case 2:24-cv-633 has been deleted and all future filings are to be submitted at 3:24-cv-087. This message is for informational purposes only. (cww)
April 29, 2024 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan no longer assigned to case. Case initially assigned in error. (cww)
April 29, 2024 Judge Stephanie L. Haines presiding. (cww)
April 29, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2024. (rtm)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8237693), filed by CAROL DAVID, HAROLD DAVID, CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shiner, Michael)
April 26, 2024 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (bjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVID et al v. AMAZON.COM INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL DAVID
Represented By: Michael A. Shiner
Represented By: George D Pilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD DAVID
Represented By: Michael A. Shiner
Represented By: George D Pilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRE COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, P OF H
Represented By: Michael A. Shiner
Represented By: George D Pilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC.
Represented By: Erin W Grewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Erin W Grewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?