MARSH v. SOMERSET COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY ROBERT MARSH
Case Number: 3:2024cv00111
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-01672. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE, INCLUDING THE PENDING MOTION (ECF NO. #4 ) TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, AND CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/22/24. 5/22/24 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
May 22, 2024 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (ert)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by TIMOTHY ROBERT MARSH.(va)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TIMOTHY ROBERT MARSH..(va)
April 25, 2024 DOC 3 & IFP FORM MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
April 24, 2024 MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES TO PLAINTIFF ON 4/24/24. (jaa, )
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF MR. MARSH SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, NO LATER THAN MAY 23, 2024, EITHER: PAY $405 (COMPRISING THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT; OR, FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM JUNE 1, 2023 TO PRESENT REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD; IF MR. MARSH IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED. HE WILL NOT BE ENTITLED TO THE RETURN OF ANY PAYMENTS MADE TOWARD THE FEE; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MR. MARSH WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/23/24. 4/24/24 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by TIMOTHY ROBERT MARSH. FEE NOT PAID. NO IFP. (va)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSH v. SOMERSET COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY ROBERT MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?