PONCE BAKERY, INC
Debtor: PONCE BAKERY, INC
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
Case Number: 2:2023bk01719
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: MARIA DE LOS ANGELES GONZALEZ
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#14) Notice Date 08/02/2023. (Admin.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Debtor is ordered to supplement within 14 days the application to employ an accountant to include the accountant's curriculum vitae as required by PR LBR 2014-1(a). Order due by 8/14/2023. (RE: related document(s)#11). Signed on 7/31/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by EDUARDO M VERAY on behalf of BANCO POPULAR PR - SPECIAL LOANS. (VERAY, EDUARDO)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
July 11, 2023 Filing 11 Application to employ Accountant Cynthia I. Garcia Fraticelli (with 14 day objection language) filed by MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ on behalf of PONCE BAKERY, INC [BIGAS MENDEZ, MODESTO]
June 23, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Voluntary Petition To include Related Case 18-04923 (RE: related document(s)#1). Filed by MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ on behalf of PONCE BAKERY, INC (BIGAS MENDEZ, MODESTO)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed by MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ on behalf of PONCE BAKERY, INC (BIGAS MENDEZ, MODESTO)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CARMEN PRISCILLA FIGUEROA on behalf of CRIM. (FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#5) Notice Date 06/08/2023. (Admin.)
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#4) Notice Date 06/08/2023. (Admin.)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled 8/18/2023 at 09:30 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Signed on 6/6/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/11/2023 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/11/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 10/10/2023. Government Proofs of Claim due by 12/4/2023. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-01719-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16286863, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE RESOLUTION. Filed by MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ on behalf of PONCE BAKERY, INC (BIGAS MENDEZ, MODESTO)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $250.00 HR Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 plan due by 10/3/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 10/3/2023.. Filed by MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ on behalf of PONCE BAKERY, INC (BIGAS MENDEZ, MODESTO)

Search for this case: PONCE BAKERY, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PONCE BAKERY, INC
Represented By: MODESTO BIGAS MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?