GGG INVESTMENTS, INC.
Debtor: GGG INVESTMENTS, INC.
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
Case Number: 2:2023bk02407
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: MARIA DE LOS ANGELES GONZALEZ
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Filing 37 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2023. Filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. (FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS)
September 12, 2023 Filing 36 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
August 24, 2023 Filing 35 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#31) Notice Date 08/24/2023. (Admin.)
August 24, 2023 Filing 34 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#30) Notice Date 08/24/2023. (Admin.)
August 24, 2023 Filing 33 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#32) Notice Date 08/24/2023. (Admin.)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF ATTORNEY. (RE: related document(s)#4). Signed on 8/22/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Upon the approval of the stipulation filed by the debtor and Banco Popular de Puerto Rico at docket #30, the debtor's emergency motion to use cash collateral is denied as moot. (RE: related document(s)#3, #23, #30). Signed on 8/22/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION (RE: related document(s)#22, #23). Signed on 8/22/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
August 18, 2023 Filing 29 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#21) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#23) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 27 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#23) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 26 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#19) Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#19) Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 24 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#18) Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The hearing set for tomorrow August 17, 2023 to consider Debtor's emergency motion for the use of cash collateral (Dkt. #3) is VACATED and SET ASIDE. Moreover, the request to shorten the objection period of the stipulation filed at Dkt. #22 to three (3) days is granted. Parties in interest are granted until Monday, August 21, 2023 at 5:00 p.m, to file oppositions. If an opposition is timely filed, the court will promptly set a hearing to consider the same. If no objections are filed by the established deadline, the stipulation will be granted (Dkt. #22) and the emergency motion for the use of cash collateral (Dkt. #3) will be denied as moot. The court's order allowing interim use of cash collateral (Dkt. # 10) is hereby extended until Tuesday, August 22, 2023. Order due by 8/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#22). Signed on 8/16/2023.(MUNIZ, GRACIELA) Modified on 8/16/2023 (MUNIZ, GRACIELA).
August 16, 2023 Filing 22 Stipulation for the Use of Cash Collateral, Adequate Protection and Reservation of Rights with Shortened Objection Period of three (3) days (21 Day(s) Objection language due by 09/6/2023) (related document(s):#3, #10, #21) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Budget) filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. [VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Motion: The motion filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico requesting an extension of time until today at noon (12:00 p.m.) (docket entry #20) is hereby granted. ORDER DUE 8/16/2023 AT 12:00 P.M. (RE: related document(s)#20). Signed on 8/16/2023.(MUNIZ, GRACIELA)
August 15, 2023 Filing 20 Motion requesting extension of time( tomorrow noon days) (consented) for brief extension of time to state position as to Debtor's Urgent Motion for Entry of an Interim Order: (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (II) Granting the Secured Creditor Adequate Protection; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief. (related document(s):#17) filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled for October 20, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for October 27, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (RE: related document(s)#13, #15). Signed on 8/15/2023.(MUNIZ, GRACIELA)
August 15, 2023 Filing 18 BNC Notice (RE: related document(s)#17) (MUNIZ, GRACIELA)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting Motion: The motion filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico on August 14, 2023, requesting a one (1) day extension of time (docket entry #16) is hereby granted. ORDER DUE by 8/15/2023 (RE: related document(s)#16). Signed on 8/15/2023.(MUNIZ, GRACIELA) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2023 (MUNIZ, GRACIELA).
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) to State Position as to Urgent Motion for Entry of an Interim Order: (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (II)Granting the Secured Creditor Adequate Protection; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief. (related document(s):#10) filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA]
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 Motion requesting continuance of hearing (related document(s):#13) filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. [FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS]
August 12, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#13) Notice Date 08/12/2023. (Admin.)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled 10/20/2023 at 09:30 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Signed on 8/10/2023.(Diaz, Yolanda)
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#10) Notice Date 08/09/2023. (Admin.)
August 9, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#9) Notice Date 08/09/2023. (Admin.)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Upon consideration of the Emergency Motion, the court finds that the interim authorization to use cash collateral is appropriate under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001(b)(2) to avoid immediate and irreparable harm to the estate. Therefore, the request for interim use of cash collateral is hereby granted until August 17, 2023 under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001(b)(2) and PR LBR 4001-2(d) pursuant to the terms stated in the Emergency Motion and the budget included therein. Parties in interest are granted until August 14, 2023 to state their position as to the Emergency Motion. A hearing to consider the Emergency Motion and any oppositions thereto is scheduled for August 17, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. at the United States Bankruptcy Court, Southwestern Divisional Office, MCS Building, Second Floor, 880 Tito Castro Avenue, Ponce, Puerto Rico. (RE: related document(s)#3). Signed on 8/7/2023.(MUNIZ, GRACIELA)
August 7, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2023 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/13/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 12/11/2023. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/5/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 7, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to inform Intent to Respond to Urgent Motion for Entry of an Interim Order: (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (II)Granting the Secured Creditor Adequate Protection; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (RE: related document(s)#3). Filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
August 7, 2023 Motion to Inform filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico is NOTED. (RE: related document(s)#8) (MUNIZ, GRACIELA)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#3). Filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. (FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS)
August 4, 2023 Filing 4 Application to employ Attorney, Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez, Esq. (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney #2 Resume) filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. [FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS]
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. [FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS]
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02407-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16372946, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual With Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $250/hr Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 plan due by 12/4/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Resolution). Filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of GGG INVESTMENTS, INC. (FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS)

Search for this case: GGG INVESTMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: GGG INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?