CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC
Debtor: CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC. and CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC
Trustee: DIANA TORRES CANCEL
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
Case Number: 3:2023bk01917
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: EDWARD A GODOY
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 64 Motion requesting extension of time( 2 days) to file the monthly operating report for the month of July. (related document(s):#61) filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM]
August 21, 2023 Filing 63 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2023. Filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM)
August 20, 2023 Filing 62 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#61) Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.)
August 16, 2023 Filing 61 Minutes of STATUS CONFERENCE CH 11 SUB V: Small Business: Yes. Chapter 11 Sub V case Nature of Business: Cutting different types of metals down to size based on the needs of the clients. Reasons filing bankruptcy: Decrease in business due to the pandemic, to stop pre-petition collection actions, renegotiating with BPPR the value of the collateral, and renegotiating with IRS and Hacienda.Time table to file the Plan: September 21, 2023. Once the plan is filed, a separate order scheduling the confirmation hearing for November 15, 2023, at 1:30pm, via Microsoft Teams will be entered. Application for employment of professional: No application to employ an accountant will be filed. In-house accountant to be used. The month operating report for June 2023 is due by August 18, 2023, and the one for July 2023 is due by August 21, 2023. By August 30, 2023, the debtor is to file the required report for affiliates as to SN Transport Inc., if applicable. As requested by the Sub V trustee, the debtor is to include her in any communication related to this case. Order due by 9/21/2023 & 8/30/2023. (FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 60 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/16/2023 01:30:48 PM]. File Size [ 6028 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:25:40 ]. (admin).
August 11, 2023 Filing 59 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by JOSE L BARRIOS RAMOS on behalf of UNITED INSURANCE FINANCE CO., INC.. (BARRIOS RAMOS, JOSE)
August 5, 2023 Filing 58 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#57) Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION (RE: related document(s)#51). Signed on 8/3/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
August 2, 2023 Filing 56 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#53) Notice Date 08/02/2023. (Admin.)
August 2, 2023 Filing 55 Status Report on Chapter 11 Case (RE: related document(s)#7). Filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM)
August 1, 2023 Filing 54 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The request to shorten the objection notice in the stipulation at docket number 51 is granted. Parties in interest are granted until August 1, 2023, to file objections, if any, to the stipulation filed by the debtor and Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. If no objection is filed, the court may approve the stipulation without further notice or hearing. Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for August 2, 2023, at 1:30pm, is vacated and set aside. (Due by 8/1/2023). (RE: related document(s)#30, #51). Signed on 7/31/2023.(FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
July 29, 2023 Filing 52 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#50) Notice Date 07/29/2023. (Admin.)
July 28, 2023 Filing 51 Stipulation for the Use of Cash Collateral, Adequate Protection, and Reservation of Rights with Shortened Objection Period of four (4) Days (21 Day(s) Objection language due by 08/18/2023) (related document(s):#15, #26, #30, #38) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Budget) filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA] Modified on 7/31/2023 (FIGUEROA, CARMEN).
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME (14 days) to file Monthly Operating Reports for the months of May and June. Order due by 8/9/2023. (RE: related document(s)#49). Signed on 7/27/2023.(FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
July 26, 2023 Filing 49 Motion requesting extension of time( 14 days) to file Monthly Operating Reports for the months of May and June. filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM]
July 23, 2023 Filing 48 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#44) Notice Date 07/23/2023. (Admin.)
July 23, 2023 Filing 47 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#45) Notice Date 07/23/2023. (Admin.)
July 21, 2023 Filing 46 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#39) Notice Date 07/21/2023. (Admin.)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The debtor's urgent motion to reschedule the hearing on cash collateral (docket #41) is moot. (RE: related document(s)#41). Signed on 7/21/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Interim use of cash collateral requested at docket number 26 is hereby denied for failure to comply with Fed. R. Bank. P. 4001(b) by failing to file a motion in accordance with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9014 and accompanied by a proposed form of order. Also, LBR 4001-2(c) requires that a request for urgent interim use of cash collateral be presented by an affidavit. The debtor must file a motion in compliance with national and local bankruptcy rules on or before July 26, 2023, to be considered by the court during the August 2, 2023, hearing. Order due by 7/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#26). Signed on 7/21/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 21, 2023 Filing 43 Minutes of 341 meeting continued: 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2023 at 10:00 AM via 341 MEETING ROOM, OCHOA BUILDING, 500 TANCA STREET, FIRST FLOOR, SAN JUAN. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
July 20, 2023 Filing 42 Opposition to Urgent Motion to Re-Schedule Hearing on Cash Collateral Filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico (RE: related document(s)#41). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Email Exchange)(MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
July 20, 2023 Filing 41 Urgent motion to Reschedule August 2, 2023 "Cash Collateral Hearing" To Any Available Prior Thereto (related document(s):#30) filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS]
July 20, 2023 Filing 40 Motion to withdraw as Co-Counsel filed by Paula De Felice on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [De Felice, Paula]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (ATTORNEY) (RE: related document(s)#8). Signed on 7/19/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 17, 2023 Filing 38 Reply to Amended Opposition to Motion for Entry of Order Prohibiting the Use of BPPR's Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection Filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico (RE: related document(s)#26, #32, #36). (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
July 15, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#36) Notice Date 07/15/2023. (Admin.)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The motion filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico requesting extension of time to file reply to the debtor's opposition to motion for entry of order prohibiting the use of BPPR's cash collateral and adequate protection (docket #32) is hereby granted. Order due by 7/17/2023. (RE: related document(s)#15, #22, #29, #32). Signed on 7/13/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 12, 2023 Filing 35 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#30) Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 34 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#29) Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 33 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#31) Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 32 Motion requesting extension of time( 5 days) TO FILE REPLY TO DEBTORS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER PROHIBITING THE USE OF BPPRS CASH COLLATERAL AND ADEQUATE PROTECTION. (related document(s):#22, #29) filed by Paula De Felice on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [De Felice, Paula]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The motion filed by the debtor requesting authorization to pay certain pre-pretition employee obligations and maintain and continue to pay the employee compensation obligations (docket #27) is hereby denied for failure to comply with PR LBR 9013-1 and with 4001-2. (RE: related document(s)#27). Signed on 7/10/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico's motion to prohibit use of cash collateral and for adequate protection (docket #15); Debtor's opposition (docket #26). Hearing scheduled 8/2/2023 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (RE: related document(s)#15, #26). Signed on 7/10/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The motion filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico requesting leave to file a reply to debtor's opposition to motion for entry of order prohibiting the use of cash collateral and adequate protection (docket #25) is hereby granted. (RE: related document(s)#25). Signed on 7/10/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 8, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#24) Notice Date 07/08/2023. (Admin.)
July 6, 2023 Filing 27 Motion requesting entry of order authorizing the debtor to pay certain prepetition employee obligations and maintain and continue to pay the employee compensation obligations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM]
July 6, 2023 Filing 26 Opposition to Motion for Entry of Order Prohibiting the Use of Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection (Amended) Filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RE: related document(s)#22). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM)
July 6, 2023 Filing 25 Motion for Leave to File REPLY TO DEBTORS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER PROHIBITING THE USE OF BPPRS CASH COLLATERAL AND ADEQUATE PROTECTION filed by Paula De Felice on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [De Felice, Paula]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The motion filed by the debtor requesting extension of time (docket #23) is hereby granted. Order due by 7/7/2023. (RE: related document(s)#23). Signed on 7/6/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
July 5, 2023 Filing 23 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) to supplement Debtor's Opposition. (related document(s):#22) Filed by Debtor CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM)
July 5, 2023 Filing 22 Opposition to Motion for Entry of Order Prohibiting the Use of Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection Filed by WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RE: related document(s)#15). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RIVERA VELEZ, WILLIAM)
July 5, 2023 Filing 21 Notice to Creditors: filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (RE: related document(s)#19). (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)
July 5, 2023 Filing 20 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#1, #19). Filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)
July 5, 2023 Filing 19 Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)
July 2, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#17) Notice Date 07/02/2023. (Admin.)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The debtor's motion to inform intent to state position to Banco Popular's motion (docket #16) is hereby granted. Order due by 7/5/2023. (RE: related document(s)#15, #16). Signed on 6/30/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 Motion to inform Intent to State Position within One Business Day (by July 3, 2023) and Request For Leave to File Response to Docket #15 by July 3, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#15). Filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to prohibit use of cash collateral and for adequate protection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Credit Agreement #2 Exhibit B - First Note #3 Exhibit C - Second Note #4 Exhibit F - Forbearance Agreement #5 Exhibit G - Letter dated May 4, 2023 #6 Exhibit H - Consent Judgment #7 Exhibit I - Loan Balance #8 Exhibit J - First Security Agreement #9 Exhibit K - UCC Search Report #10 Exhibit L - Second Security Agreement #11 Exhibit M -Letter dated June 28, 2023) filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico [MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS]
June 28, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#7) Notice Date 06/28/2023. (Admin.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#5) Notice Date 06/28/2023. (Admin.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#2) Notice Date 06/28/2023. (Admin.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Paula De Felice on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (De Felice, Paula)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
June 28, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
June 27, 2023 Filing 8 Application to employ attorney, Jesus E. Batista Sanchez (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Resume) filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC [BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS]
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Hearing scheduled 8/16/2023 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Pre-Status Report Due By 8/2/2023. Signed on 6/26/2023.(BORREGO, MARTA)
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE RESOLUTION. Filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)
June 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING AND NOTICE OF POSSIBLE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENT(S):Corporate Resolution or Corporate Ownership Statement (RE: related document(s)#1) (ROMO, JOSE)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-01917-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16315452, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Diana M. Torres Cancel filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 First Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Sub-Chapter V Trustee: DIANA TORRES CANCEL is appointed trustee to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/21/2023 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/19/2023. Proof of Claims due by 9/1/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/20/2023. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Subchapter V Non-Individual With Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $0.00 Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/21/2023.. Filed by JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ on behalf of CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC. (BATISTA SANCHEZ, JESUS)

Search for this case: CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC.
Represented By: JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CHALLENGER BRASS & COPPER CO INC
Represented By: WILLIAM RIVERA VELEZ
Represented By: JESUS ENRIQUE BATISTA SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: DIANA TORRES CANCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?