MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC
Debtor: MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC and MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Trustee: JOSE A DIAZ CRESPO
Case Number: 3:2023bk02122
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: ENRIQUE S LAMOUTTE INCLAN
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#23) Notice Date 09/07/2023. (Admin.)
September 5, 2023 Filing 24 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [09/05/2023 10:01:56 AM]. File Size [ 5127 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:52 ]. (admin).
September 5, 2023 Filing 23 Minutes Entry Status Conference Chapter 11 Subchapter V: Proceedings and Order: Subchapter V. Nature of Business: Natural water bottling & distribution. Reasons for filing bankruptcy: Cash flow problem. Stop an eviction process; foreclosure of commercial property BPPR and SBA. Timetable to file the Subchapter V Plan: October 10, 2023. Estimated professional fees: $10,000 attorney, $5,000 Accountant. Estimated Subchapter V Trustee fees: Dkt. #5, Retainer-$2,500 Total Estimated $5,000. Anticipated significant event: agreement with BPPR. Need for future status conference: no. New 341 Meeting scheduled for: Closed. OTHER: Counsel for debtor informs accountant passed away. Debtor to move the court to retain existing bank accounts within 7 days. Debtor shall amend schedules A/B within 14 days. Debtor shall file pending MOR within 21 days. Order due by 10/10/2023. (Re: related document(s)#6, #22).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 21, 2023 Filing 22 Status Report on Chapter 11 Case . Filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC (BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN)
August 8, 2023 Filing 21 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JOSE CARLOS DIAZ-VEGA on behalf of US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 (DIAZ-VEGA, JOSE)
August 7, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by EDUARDO M VERAY on behalf of BANCO POPULAR PR - SPECIAL LOANS. (VERAY, EDUARDO)
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC (BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN)
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#16) Notice Date 08/02/2023. (Admin.)
August 2, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#15) Notice Date 08/02/2023. (Admin.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (ACCOUNTANT) Signed on 7/31/2023. (RE: related document(s)#9).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (ATTORNEY) Signed on 7/31/2023. (RE: related document(s)#7).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
July 22, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#13) Notice Date 07/22/2023. (Admin.)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Denying Motion. Although counsel for the debtor may have alleged reasonable grounds to request the rescheduling of the Initial Debtor Interview, the court declines to intervene in the discretion of the United States Trustee to schedule such hearings pursuant to its supervisory duties under 28 U.S.C. 586(7). Signed on 7/20/2023. (RE: related document(s)#10).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#6) Notice Date 07/13/2023. (Admin.)
July 13, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#4) Notice Date 07/13/2023. (Admin.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 10 Motion requesting entry of order under 105 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC [BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN]
July 12, 2023 Filing 9 Application to employ Mrs. Roshanne Pullucksingh, Accountant (with 14 day objection language) filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC [BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN]
July 11, 2023 Filing 8 Motion in Compliance WITH 11 USC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 2022 FINANCIAL STATEMENT #2 Appendix 2022 TAX RETURN) Filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC (BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 Application to employ Juan C. Bigas, Attorney (with 14 day objection language) filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC [BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE SUBCHAPTER V CHAPTER 11 CASE: Signed on 7/11/2023. Hearing scheduled 9/5/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. Pre-Status Report Due By 8/22/2023. (RE: related document(s)#1).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Jose A. Diaz Crespo (RE: related document(s) #1, #4). filed by US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
July 11, 2023 Filing 4 First Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Sub-Chapter V Trustee: JOSE A DIAZ CRESPO is appointed trustee to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/6/2023. Proof of Claims due by 9/19/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/8/2024. filed by US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02122-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16337878, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE RESOLUTION. Filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC (BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Subchapter V Non-Individual With Schedules, With Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $4,000 Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/10/2023.. Filed by JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC (BIGAS VALEDON, JUAN)

Search for this case: MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL, LLC
Represented By: JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: MANANTIAL ROCA CRISTAL LLC
Represented By: JUAN CARLOS BIGAS VALEDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Represented By: JOSE CARLOS DIAZ-VEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: JOSE A DIAZ CRESPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?