CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC
Debtor: CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. and CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Eastern Health, LLC, Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC and Isaac Rene HERNNDEZ-DIAZ
Not Classified By Court: Grupo de Radioterapia del Norte, PSC, Herminio Colon, Elizabeth Amaro, Jose Miguel Amaro, Ivette Delgado, and minors Y.J.A., Z.S.G.A., and Y.M.G.A., Grupo Intensivo Pediatrico, CSP, Neyza Curz Cedeno and Savier Vazquez Oyola, Angelica Perez Garcia-Barbon and Laura Davila Otero and The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 3:2023bk02513
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: EDWARD A GODOY
Referring Judge: ENRIQUE S LAMOUTTE INCLAN
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 411 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#386) Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 410 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#389) Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 409 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#385) Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 408 Objection to /Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights with Respect to Debtors' Motion to Sell Bayamon Assets (Related Document: ECF No. 235) Filed by SONIA COLON COLON on behalf of Intuitive Surgical, through its Swiss Subsidiary, Intuitive Surgical, S.a.r.l. (RE: related document(s)#345). (COLON COLON, SONIA)
October 13, 2023 Filing 407 Motion submitting document(s):ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE NOVA INFUSION ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#77, #365). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMENT) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 13, 2023 Filing 406 Motion submitting document(s):ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#77, #348). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMENT) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 13, 2023 Filing 405 Response to "Debtors' Motion to Inform the Successful Bidder for the Caguas Assets Pursuant to the Bidding Procedures Order Entered on August 23, 2023" Filed by GUSTAVO A CHICO-BARRIS on behalf of CELERES HOLDINGS, LLC (RE: related document(s)#349). (CHICO-BARRIS, GUSTAVO)
October 13, 2023 Filing 404 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 business days) TO FILE RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS FILED BY BIO NUCLEAR; BAXTER; CEFI AND LINDE. (related document(s):#189, #197, #201, #357, #396) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
October 13, 2023 Filing 403 Response to UNITED STATES TRUSTEES OBJECTION TO DEBTORS EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING (A) RETENTION OF ANKURA CONSULTING GROUP, LLC AND (B) DESIGNATION OF STEPHEN MAROTTA AS CHIEF RESTRUCTURING OFFICER, RUSSELL PERRY AS RESTRUCTURING OFFICER AND ROHID AHMED AS ASSISTANT TREASURER NUNC PRO TUNC TO THE PETITION DATE AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#126). (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 13, 2023 Filing 402 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by GUSTAVO A CHICO-BARRIS on behalf of CELERES HOLDINGS, LLC. (CHICO-BARRIS, GUSTAVO)
October 13, 2023 Filing 401 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by SONIA COLON COLON on behalf of Intuitive Surgical, through its Swiss Subsidiary, Intuitive Surgical, S.a.r.l.. (COLON COLON, SONIA)
October 13, 2023 Filing 400 Withdrawal of Claim. 40. Filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. (CABRERA BOU, CAROLINA)
October 13, 2023 Filing 399 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event was used. Party must re-file correctly. (RE: related document(s)#391) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 12, 2023 Filing 398 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#382) Notice Date 10/12/2023. (Admin.)
October 12, 2023 Filing 397 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#381) Notice Date 10/12/2023. (Admin.)
October 12, 2023 Filing 396 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) TO FILE RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS FILED BY BIO NUCLEAR; BAXTER; CEFI AND LINDE. (related document(s):#357, #359, #361, #363, #364, #372, #373, #374, #375, #376, #377, #392, #394) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
October 12, 2023 Filing 395 Motion submitting document(s):ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE CAGUAS ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#77, #349). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Asset Purchase Agreement) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 12, 2023 Filing 394 Objection to Sales with Memorandum of Law (Supplementary Motion) Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#376, #377, #392). (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER APPROVING PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENTS OF GRUPO HIMA FAJARDO HOSPITAL PURSUANT TO SECTION 363 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS INTERESTS AND ENCUMBRANCES Signed on 10/12/2023. (RE: related document(s)#390).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 12, 2023 Filing 392 Urgent motion Requesting Order for Debtors (related document(s):#374) filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. [FORTUNO FAS, JUAN]
October 12, 2023 Filing 391 Motion to withdraw Claim 40 filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. [CABRERA BOU, CAROLINA]
October 11, 2023 Filing 390 Urgent motion TO SUBMMIT REVISED FAJARDO SALE ORDER AND (related document(s):#57), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order GRANTING DOCKET NO. 65 (related document(s): #57) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER GRANTING URGENT MOTION AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO PREPETITION FIRST LIEN OBLIGATIONS, PREPETITION FIRST LIEN AGENT, AND PREPETITION FIRST LIEN LENDERS. Signed on 10/11/2023. Order due by 10/23/2023. (RE: related document(s)#388).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
October 11, 2023 Filing 388 Urgent motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Discovery with Respect to Prepetition First Lien Obligations, Prepetition First Lien Agent, and Prepetition First Lien Lenders, and Urgent Request for Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information Requests #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena #3 Exhibit C - Subpoena #4 Proposed Order) filed by FRANCISCO E COLON RAMIREZ on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors [COLON RAMIREZ, FRANCISCO]
October 11, 2023 Filing 387 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 10/11/2023. Order due by 10/17/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #61, #126, #384).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order Granting Motion to shorten time. Signed on 10/11/2023. (RE: related document(s)#374, #375).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 10, 2023 Filing 384 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEMNT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125. (related document(s):#12, #126, #347, #353) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
October 10, 2023 Filing 383 Response to / JOINT RESPONSE TO OBJECTION FILED BY CEFI AT DOCKET NO. 201 Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#77, #201, #356). (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Order Granting Motion to shorten time. Signed on 10/10/2023. (RE: related document(s)#363, #364).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Order Granting Motion to shorten time. Signed on 10/10/2023. (RE: related document(s)#359, #361).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 9, 2023 Filing 380 Motion to inform Limited Objection To Proposed Sale of The Caguas Assets and Resevation of Rights. Filed by MARY ANN GANDIA on behalf of ASOCIACION DE CONDOMINES HIMA PLAZA I (GANDIA, MARY)
October 7, 2023 Filing 379 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#356) Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 378 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#353) Notice Date 10/06/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 377 Objection to PROPOSED SALE OF THE CAGUAS ASSETS AND OBJECTION TO ABILITY OF THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF FUTURE PERFORMANCE (AMENDED) Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#373). (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
October 6, 2023 Filing 376 Objection to Proposed Sale of the Bayamon Assets and Humacao Properties and Objection to Ability of the Successful Bidder to Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Performance (AMENDED) Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#372). (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
October 6, 2023 Filing 375 Motion to shorten time to reduce objection period (related document(s): #374) filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. [FORTUNO FAS, JUAN]
October 6, 2023 Filing 374 Motion requesting entry of order for Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts with Commercial Equipment Finance Inc. (related document(s): #112, #201) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cross Collateral Cross Default Agreement #2 Exhibit Lease & Loan Account Balances) filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. [FORTUNO FAS, JUAN]
October 6, 2023 Filing 373 Objection to PROPOSED SALE OF THE CAGUAS ASSETS AND OBJECTION TO ABILITY OF THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF FUTURE PERFORMANCE Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#346). (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
October 6, 2023 Filing 372 Objection to Proposed Sale of the Bayamon Assets and Humacao Properties and Objection to Ability of the Successful Bidder to Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Performance Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#345). (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
October 5, 2023 Filing 371 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#344) Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 370 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#346) Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 369 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#345) Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 368 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Ricardo Castro-Vargas on behalf of Medika, Inc.. (Castro-Vargas, Ricardo)
October 5, 2023 Filing 367 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (AMENDED). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 5, 2023 Filing 366 Motion to inform /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO MOTION REGARDING SALE HEARING OF THE BAYAMON ASSETS/ (RE: related document(s)#231, #244, #326, #345). Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
October 5, 2023 Filing 365 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE NOVA INFUSION ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 4, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attendance List Auction) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 5, 2023 Filing 364 Motion to shorten time "Motion to Reduce Objection Period" (related document(s): #363) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
October 5, 2023 Filing 363 Motion to Compel "Renewed Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(d)(2) for an Order Compelling Debtor to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts Between Debtor and Baxter" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 - Part 1 #6 Exhibit 5 - Part 2 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
October 5, 2023 Filing 362 Objection to "Renewed and Reinstated Objection to (1) Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts; (Docket No. 112) (2) Motion for an Order (I) Approving (A) Entry into the Fajardo Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections (B) Bidding Procedures and the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (II) Scheduling the Sale Hearing, (II) Establishing Assumption and Assignment Procedures and Approving the Manner of Notice Thereof and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief (Docket No. 57); (3) Bayamon Asset Purchase Agreement (Docket No. 235); and (4) to the Sale of the Humacao and Caguas Properties and Nova Infusion Assets" Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. (RE: related document(s)#112). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 - Part 1 #6 Exhibit 5 - Part 2 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7)(RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
October 5, 2023 Filing 361 Motion to shorten time "Motion to Reduce Objection Period" (related document(s): #359) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
October 5, 2023 Filing 360 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by MARY ANN GANDIA on behalf of ASOCIACION DE CONDOMINES HIMA PLAZA I. (GANDIA, MARY)
October 5, 2023 Filing 359 Objection to "Renewed and Supplemented Objection to (1) Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts (Docket No. 112), (2) the Motion to Sell Property (Docket No. 57), (3) the Bayamon Asset Purchase Agreement (Docket No. 235) and to the Sale of the Humacao and Caguas Assets / Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(d)(2) for an Order Compelling Debtor to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts Between Debtor and Bio-Nuclear" Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#112). (RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
October 5, 2023 Filing 358 Motion to inform identity and details of creditor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Account Statement) Filed by ANGEL SOSA BAEZ on behalf of Linde Puerto Rico, B.V. (SOSA BAEZ, ANGEL)
October 5, 2023 Filing 357 Objection to APA Filed by ANGEL SOSA BAEZ on behalf of Linde Puerto Rico, B.V. (RE: related document(s)#77). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Product Supply Agreement Linde CMT #2 Exhibit Rider Caguas #3 Exhibit Rider Humacao #4 Exhibit Rider Fajardo #5 Exhibit Rider Bayamon #6 Exhibit Rider Cylinders #7 Exhibit Tanks and Equipment List by Location #8 Exhibit Cylinders List by Location)(SOSA BAEZ, ANGEL)
October 4, 2023 Filing 355 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by ANGEL SOSA BAEZ on behalf of Linde Puerto Rico, B.V.. (SOSA BAEZ, ANGEL)
October 4, 2023 Filing 354 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Balance Sheet #2 Exhibit B Income Statement #3 Exhibit C Bank Reconciliations & Bank Statements) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 10/4/2023. Order due by 10/10/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #56, #126, #347).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 4, 2023 Filing 352 Motion to withdraw / NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION AT DOCKET NO. 303 (related document(s): #348) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
October 4, 2023 Filing 351 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 2, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77, #348). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Attendance List Auction Humacao) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 3, 2023 Filing 350 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [10/03/2023 09:14:18 AM]. File Size [ 13322 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:28:14 ]. (admin).
October 3, 2023 Filing 349 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE CAGUAS ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 3, 2023 Filing 348 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 2, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attendance List Auction Humacao) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 3, 2023 Filing 347 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEMNT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125.. (related document(s):#126, #240, #243) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The sales of the HIMA San Pablo Caguas property, and Nova Infusion licenses and personal property. Signed on 10/3/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#327).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The sales of the Bayamn Assets, and the Humacao Properties. Signed on 10/3/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#326, #327).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 3, 2023 Filing 344 Minutes of Hearing on Motion to Lift the Stay held on 10/3/2023: ORDER: Case filed in state court in 2011. Judgment pending to be entered. Moving creditors request relief from stay to engage in discovery regarding the existence of insurance. ORDER: Movants shall file a certificate of having given notice of the motion for relief from stay to the 20 largest creditors and the unsecured creditors committee within 14 days. Parties have 14 days to file a response. If due notice is given and no opposition is filed, the court may grant the motion to modify the stay. Creditors shall proceed up to judgment and channel same through bankruptcy case. Creditors will be allowed to conduct discovery re insurance coverage. Order due by 10/17/2023. (Re: related document(s)#151, #236).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
October 1, 2023 Filing 343 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#324) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 342 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#323) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 341 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#321) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 340 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#318) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 339 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#317) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 338 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#322) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 337 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#316) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 336 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#325) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 30, 2023 Filing 335 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#307) Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
September 30, 2023 Filing 334 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#306) Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
September 30, 2023 Filing 333 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#299) Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
September 30, 2023 Filing 332 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#305) Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 331 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#286) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 330 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#283) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 329 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#282) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 328 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#281) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 327 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION FOR THE HIMA SAN PABLO CAGUAS PROPERTY AND NOVA INFUSION LICENSES AND PERSONAL PROPERTY (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 29, 2023 Filing 326 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE BAYAMON ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Granting Movant's Motion Requesting Copy of Debtor's Disclosure Statement and Plan Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#304).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The Joint motion filed between Debtor(s) and movant(s) requesting continuance of Motions for Relief From Automatic Stay filed at Docket Numbers 191, 193 and 195 in the above case (Docket Entry #320) is hereby granted. The Final hearings are continued for November 7, 2023 at 9:00 AM via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. The parties must familiarize themselves with the Microsoft Teams and follow the Procedure for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\prb.uscourts.gov. The hearing scheduled for October 3, 2023 are hereby vacated and set aside. Signed on 9/29/2023. Hearing scheduled 11/7/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (RE: related document(s)#195, #320).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The Joint motion filed between Debtor(s) and movant(s) requesting continuance of Motions for Relief From Automatic Stay filed at Docket Numbers 191, 193 and 195 in the above case (Docket Entry #320) is hereby granted. The Final hearings are continued for November 7, 2023 at 9:00 AM via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. The parties must familiarize themselves with the Microsoft Teams and follow the Procedure for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\prb.uscourts.gov. The hearing scheduled for October 3, 2023 are hereby vacated and set aside. Signed on 9/29/2023. Hearing scheduled 11/7/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (RE: related document(s)#193, #320).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. Signed on 9/29/2023. Order due by 10/5/2023. (RE: related document(s)#311).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The Joint motion filed between Debtor(s) and movant(s) requesting continuance of Motions for Relief From Automatic Stay filed at Docket Numbers 191, 193 and 195 in the above case (Docket Entry #320) is hereby granted. The Final hearings are continued for November 7, 2023 at 9:00 AM via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. The parties must familiarize themselves with the Microsoft Teams and follow the Procedure for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\prb.uscourts.gov. The hearing scheduled for October 3, 2023 are hereby vacated and set aside. Signed on 9/29/2023. Hearing scheduled 11/7/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (RE: related document(s)#191, #193, #195, #320).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 29, 2023 Filing 320 Motion requesting hearing -JOINT MOTION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF FINAL HEARINGS OF MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM STAY UNDER 362 SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 3, 2023 (DOCKET NO. 191, 193 & 195) (related document(s): #191, #193, #195) filed by Jose F Velazquez, AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus, Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez, Milagros Gomez-Collazo [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 29, 2023 Filing 319 Motion requesting hearing -JOINT MOTION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF FINAL HEARINGS OF MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM STAY UNDER 362 SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 3, 2023 (DOCKET NO. 191, 193 & 195) (related document(s): #191, #193, #195) filed by Jose F Velazquez, AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus, Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez, Milagros Gomez-Collazo [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING, (II) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO USE CASH COLLATERAL, (III) GRANTING LIENS AND PROVIDING SUPERPRIORITY ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIMS, (IV) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION TO PREPETITION SECURED PARTIES , (V) MODIFYING AUTOMATIC STAY, AND (VI) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#260, #310, #315).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Order Granting Motion. The preliminary agreements are hereby approved. Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#310).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#188, #271, #308).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Filing 315 Urgent motion (related document(s):#260, #310), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order URGENT JOINT MOTION TO SUBMMIT REVISED DIP ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DOCKET NO. 240 (related document(s): #260, #310) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Revised DIP Order) filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ, NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, Island Healthcare, LLC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 28, 2023 Filing 356 MINUTES OF HEARING HELD ON SEPTEMBER 28, 2023 (PLEASE REFER TO MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#57, #77, #112, #188, #189, #197, #199, #200, #201).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 28, 2023 Filing 314 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#277) Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
September 28, 2023 Filing 313 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#276) Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
September 28, 2023 Filing 312 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [09/28/2023 10:29:25 AM]. File Size [ 23404 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:40:16 ]. (admin).
September 28, 2023 Filing 311 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. (related document(s):#249, #257) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 28, 2023 Filing 310 Motion requesting entry of order -JOINT MOTION TO RESOLVE OBJECTIONS FILED BY CONSEJO DE TITULARES AT DOCKETS NO. 267 AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE OBJECTIONS AT DOCKET NOS. 209 AND 223 (related document(s): #231, #244, #287) filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 28, 2023 Filing 309 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 195 as Supplemented at Docket No. 216 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#195, #216, #300). (BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 28, 2023 Filing 308 Joint motionJoint Informative Motion to Clarify CRIM Stipulation filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, CRIM, Island Healthcare, LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Order Granting Motion. The preliminary agreements between the parties are approved. Signed on 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#189, #298).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order Granting Motion. The preliminary agreements between the parties are approved. Signed on 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#197, #199, #290).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/28/2023. Order due by 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#195, #216, #293).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 28, 2023 Filing 304 Motion pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3017(a) requesting copy of debtor's disclosure statement and plan filed by RAFAEL FERREIRA CINTRON on behalf of HL Hernandez LLC [FERREIRA CINTRON, RAFAEL]
September 28, 2023 Filing 303 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by RAFAEL FERREIRA CINTRON on behalf of HL Hernandez LLC. (FERREIRA CINTRON, RAFAEL)
September 28, 2023 Filing 302 Motion in Compliance with L.Cv.R. 5(c) (RE: related document(s)#191). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificated complaint) Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez (Velazquez, Jose)
September 28, 2023 Filing 301 Motion in Compliance with L.Cv.R. 5(c) (RE: related document(s)#193). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificated complaint) Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Milagros Gomez-Collazo (Velazquez, Jose)
September 28, 2023 Filing 300 Motion in Compliance with L.Cv.R. 5(c) (RE: related document(s)#195). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificated complaint) Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus (Velazquez, Jose)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#113, #288).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 28, 2023 Filing 298 Response to / Joint Repsonse to Objection Filed by Bio Nuclear at Docket No. 189 Filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU, JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#189). (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 297 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#268) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 296 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#267) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 295 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#269) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 294 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#270) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 293 Motion requesting extension of time( 2 days) to File Reply to Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay at Docket No. 195 as Supplemented at Docket No. 216. (related document(s):#195, #216) filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 27, 2023 Filing 292 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 191 as Supplemented at Docket No. 214 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#191, #214). (BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 291 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 193 as Supplemented at Docket No. 215 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#193, #215). (BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 290 Response to JOINT MOTION IN CONNECTION WITH OBJECTION AND MOTION FILED BY BAXTER AT DOCKET NOS. 197 AND 199 Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp., CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#197, #199). (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 289 Motion requesting entry of order NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #77) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 27, 2023 Filing 288 Motion requesting extension of time( 2 days) FILE POSITION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AT DOCKET NO. 113. (related document(s):#113, #129, #260) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 27, 2023 Filing 287 Objection to /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO LIMITED OBJECTION TO POST PETITION FINANCING AT DOCKET NO 240 AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#260, #268). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN OBJECTION PERIOD Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#271, #272, 275 ).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 285 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Order is without PDF document. (RE: related document(s) 275 ) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 284 Acknowledgment of Certification for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal by District Court. District Court Case No: 23-01433 (RE: related document(s)#270) (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE. Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#200, #280).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#189, #197, #201, #279).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#278).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 26, 2023 Filing 280 Motion to withdraw AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE: (I) IN SUPPORT OF SALE OF THE DEBTORS OPERATIONS AS A GOING CONCERN; AND (II) OBJECTING SOLELY TO THE PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SALE PROCEEDS OUTSIDE OF A PLAN AND WITHOUT A BENEFIT TO OTHER CREDITORS AND THE ESTATE (related document(s): #200) filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY [MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS]
September 26, 2023 Filing 279 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) DEBTORS CONSENSUAL SHORT EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS FILED BY BIO NUCLEAR; BAXTER AND CEFI. (related document(s):#189, #197, #201, #232, #273, #277) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 26, 2023 Filing 278 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY AFFAF AND UNITED STATES AT DOCKET NO. 185 AND 186. (related document(s):#200, #274, #276) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#189, #197, #201, #273).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#200, #274).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN OBJECTION PERIOD Signed on 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#271, #272).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 274 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY AFFAF AND UNITED STATES AT DOCKET NO. 185 AND 186. (related document(s):#200) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 25, 2023 Filing 273 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) DEBTORS CONSENSUAL SHORT EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS FILED BY BIO NUCLEAR; BAXTER AND CEFI. (related document(s):#189, #197, #201, #232) filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 25, 2023 Filing 272 Urgent motion TO SHORTEN OBJECTION PERIOD AND NOTICE (related document(s):#271) filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 25, 2023 Filing 271 Joint motion (related document(s):#86, #188), in addition to Stipulation JOINT MOTION FOR THE APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CRIMS SECURED CLAIMS AND WITHDRAWAL OF CRIMS OBJECTIONS TO DEBTORS POST PETITION FINANCING AND SALE OF ASSETS (21 Day(s) Objection language due by 10/16/2023) (related document(s):#86, #188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CRIM Executed Settlement #2 Exhibit 1 - CRIM Principal Tax Debt Itemization) filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ, FERNANDO VAN DERDYS, NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC, CRIM, Island Healthcare, LLC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 25, 2023 Filing 270 Clerk's Certification for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal to District Court (RE: related document(s)#93, #117, #176) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 269 MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT (RE: related document(s)#109, #118). Signed on 9/25/2023.(Colon, Tatiana)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARING TO CONSIDER DIP AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION Signed on 9/25/2023. Hearing scheduled 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#260, #266).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 267 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Requesting Relief from Stay and to Set Aside of Hearing. Signed on 9/25/2023. (RE: related document(s)#104, #258).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 266 Urgent motion Requesting Scheduling Order with Expedite Deadlines Related to DIP and Cash Collateral Motion (related document(s):#9, #17, #86, #87, #247, #260) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 24, 2023 Filing 265 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#257) Notice Date 09/24/2023. (Admin.)
September 23, 2023 Filing 264 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#251) Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
September 23, 2023 Filing 263 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#250) Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 262 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#243) Notice Date 09/22/2023. (Admin.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 261 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#242) Notice Date 09/22/2023. (Admin.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 260 Urgent motion OF DEBTORS FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (related document(s):#9), in addition to Motion for Post Petition Credit AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING, in addition to Motion to Use Cash Collateral AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO USE CASH COLLATERAL, (III) GRANTING LIENS AND PROVIDING SUPERPRIORITY ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIMS, (IV) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION TO PREPETITION SECURED PARTIES, (V) MODIFYING AUTOMATIC STAY, AND (VI) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DIP Credit Agreement #2 Exhibit B - DIP Order Redline #3 Exhibit C - DIP Credit Agreement Redline #4 Exhibit D Marotta Declaration #5 Schedule 2 Budget) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 22, 2023 Filing 259 Motion requesting entry of order -NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #77) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 22, 2023 Filing 258 Motion to withdraw Temporarily (related document(s): #104) filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of Lyan Marie Santiago, Isaac Rene HERNNDEZ-DIAZ [Guzman, Humberto]
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/22/2023. Order due by 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#249).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 256 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#241) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 255 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#237) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 254 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#238) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 253 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#239) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 252 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Ileana M. Oliver on behalf of AM Acquisition I, LLC. (Oliver, Ileana)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension and/or modification of certain sale-related deadlines, and auction date / location filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#246).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF THE INTERIM USE OF CASH COLLATERAL (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAIL). Signed on 9/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#87, #247).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 249 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 20, 2023 Filing 248 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#230) Notice Date 09/20/2023. (Admin.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 247 Motion requesting entry of order MOTION FOR SHORT EXTENSION OF (1) THE INTERIM USE OF CASH COLLATERAL ORDER AT DOCKET NO. 92 WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PREPETITION FIRST LIEN SECURED PARTIES (related document(s): #87) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CASH COLLATERAL BUDGET #2 Exhibit B PROPOSED ORDER #3 Exhibit C- DECLARATION OF RESTRUCTURING OFFICER IN SUPPORT OF URGENT MOTION FOR CASH COLLATERAL) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 20, 2023 Filing 246 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 20, 2023 Filing 245 Motion requesting entry of order "Motion to Deem Submitted the Urgent Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(D)(2) for an Order Compelling Debtor to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts Between the Debtor and Baxter as Unnopposed" (related document(s): #199, #202, #206) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
September 20, 2023 Filing 244 Objection to /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO LIMITED OBJECTION TO SALE OF BAYAMON REAL ESTATE PROPERTY AND JOINDER OF AAFAFS, CRIMS AND UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#188, #189, #231, #241). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/20/2023. Order due by 10/3/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #56, #126, #240).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/20/2023. Order due by 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#189, #197, #201, #232).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS) Modified on 9/20/2023 (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER APPROVING ENTRY INTO THE BAYAMON STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS SUBJECT TO BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER Signed on 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#77, #235).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Filing 240 Motion requesting extension of time( 14 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEMNT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125. (related document(s):#126) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER AND NOTICE: The Motion to Reschedule the September 20th 2023 Sale Hearing the Fajardo Assets for September 28th 2023 (the Motion, dkt. #211) filed on September 18, 2023, by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc. and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as Grupo HIMA or Debtors)1 is hereby granted. The sale hearing scheduled for September 20, 2023, at 4:00 PM (see dkt. #83), is hereby continued for September 28, 2023, at 10:00 AM at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. Further, all matters already scheduled in these cases for September 28, 2023, at 3:00 PM (dkt. #170), are hereby rescheduled and will be jointly heard on September 28, 2023, at 10:00 AM. (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS). (RE: related document(s)#77, #175, #234).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/19/2023. Order due by 9/25/2023. (RE: related document(s)#188, #200, #233).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension of certain sale-related deadlines on properties (other than Fajardo Properties) filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#225).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Filing 236 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 151 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#151). (BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 19, 2023 Filing 235 Motion requesting entry of order / Debtors' Supplemental Motion for Approving the Bayamon Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections as Ordered in the Bidding Procedures Order Entered on August 23, 2023 (related document(s): #77) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Bayamon Hospital - Asset Purchase Agreement #2 Exhibit B Proposed Order for Designation of Bayamon Stalking Horse Bid) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 18, 2023 Filing 234 Motion requesting continuance of hearing THE SEPTEMBER 20TH 2023 SALE HEARING THE FAJARDO ASSETS FOR SEPTEMBER 28TH 2023 (related document(s):#77) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 18, 2023 Filing 233 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY CRIM; AFFAF AND UNITED STATES. (related document(s):#188, #200) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 18, 2023 Filing 232 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY BIO NUCLEAR; BAXTER AND CEFI AT DOCKET NO. 189; 197 AND 201. (related document(s):#189, #197, #201) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 18, 2023 Filing 231 Objection to /LIMITED OBJECTION TO POTENTIAL SALE OF BAYAMON REAL PROPERTY AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#77). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (INVESTMENT CONSULTANT). Signed on 9/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#119).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 17, 2023 Filing 229 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#223) Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
September 17, 2023 Filing 228 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#222) Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
September 15, 2023 Filing 227 Motion submitting document(s):DEBTORS MOTION SUBMITING (1) REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#87). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 15, 2023 Filing 226 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE FAJARDO ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 15, 2023 Filing 225 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES ON PROPERTIES (OTHER THAN FAJARDO PROPERTIES) (RE: related document(s)#57, #77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 15, 2023 Filing 224 Motion submitting document(s):"Motion Submitting Certified Translation" (RE: related document(s)#189, #190, #205). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of the Objection (Docket 189)) Filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. (CABRERA BOU, CAROLINA)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for entry of order (I) authorizing the debtors to (a) pay their obligations under insurance policies even for retroactive prepetition coverage, (b) renew, supplement, modify, or purchase insurance coverage, and (II) granting related relief. Signed on 9/15/2023. (RE: related document(s)#106, #116).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The Joint motion filed between Debtor and movant Linnoska Correa Carrillo requesting continuance of hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay scheduled for September 19, 2023 (Docket #220) is hereby granted. The hearing is hereby continued for October 24, 2023 at 10:00 AM at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. Signed on 9/15/2023. (RE: related document(s)#68, #207, #220).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 15, 2023 Filing 221 Certificate of service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC (RE: related document(s)#160).(Garabato, Sid)
September 15, 2023 Filing 220 Joint motion (related document(s):#68, #207), in addition to Motion requesting continuance of hearing of Motion for Relief from Stay Under 362 by Linnoska Correa Carrillo Scheduled for September 19,2023 (related document(s):#68, #207) filed by CHARLES ALFRED CUPRILL, AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 15, 2023 Filing 219 Certificate of service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC (RE: related document(s)#130).(Garabato, Sid)
September 14, 2023 Filing 218 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#206) Notice Date 09/14/2023. (Admin.)
September 14, 2023 Filing 217 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#205) Notice Date 09/14/2023. (Admin.)
September 14, 2023 Filing 216 Motion to inform and to supplement DE 195 (RE: related document(s)#195). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus (Velazquez, Jose)
September 14, 2023 Filing 215 Motion to inform and supplement DE 193 (RE: related document(s)#193). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Milagros Gomez-Collazo (Velazquez, Jose)
September 14, 2023 Filing 214 Motion to inform and supplement DE 191 (RE: related document(s)#191). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez (Velazquez, Jose)
September 13, 2023 Filing 213 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#198) Notice Date 09/13/2023. (Admin.)
September 13, 2023 Filing 212 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 104 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#104). (BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 13, 2023 Filing 211 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#195). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus (Velazquez, Jose)
September 13, 2023 Filing 210 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#193). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Milagros Gomez-Collazo (Velazquez, Jose)
September 13, 2023 Filing 209 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#191). Filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez (Velazquez, Jose)
September 13, 2023 Filing 208 Notice Appointing Creditors Committee (Amended) filed by US TRUSTEE (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
September 12, 2023 Filing 207 Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay at Docket No. 68 Filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (RE: related document(s)#68). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Final Judgment #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal #3 Exhibit Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as per FRCP 50(B) #4 Exhibit Opinion and Order #5 Exhibit CMT's Notice of Appeal)(BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Order Granting Motion to shorten time. Signed on 9/12/2023. (RE: related document(s)#199, #202).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Order Granting Motion for leave to file documents in Spanish Language, and extension of time to file certified translations. Signed on 9/12/2023. (Due by 10/2/2023). (RE: related document(s)#190).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 12, 2023 Filing 204 362 Summons Issued. Respondent must file an answer to the motion within 14 days from service of this notice. (RE: related document(s)#191, #193, #195) (ROMO, JOSE)
September 11, 2023 Filing 203 Motion submitting document(s): (RE: related document(s)#197, #199). Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. (RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
September 11, 2023 Filing 202 Motion to shorten time "Consented Motion to Reduce Objection Period" (related document(s): #199) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
September 11, 2023 Filing 201 Objection to NOTICE OF (I) POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES AND (II) CURE AMOUNTS Filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#112). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
September 11, 2023 Filing 200 Response to (AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE): (I) IN SUPPORT OF THE SALE OF THE DEBTORS OPERATIONS AS A GOING CONCERN; AND (II) OBJECTING SOLELY TO THE PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SALE PROCEEDS OUTSIDE OF A PLAN AND WITHOUT A BENEFIT TO OTHER CREDITORS AND THE ESTATE Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#77). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
September 11, 2023 Filing 199 Motion to Compel "Urgent Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365(D)(2) for an Order Compelling Debtor to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts Between Debtor and Baxter" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 - A - Part 1 #6 Exhibit 5 - B - Part 2 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7) filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. [RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE]
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: This case is before the court upon the Opposition to Debtor(s) Asset Purchase Agreement to Sell Properties Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. 363(f) (Docket Entry #183) filed by Municipal Revenue Collection Center (CRIM). The Debtor(s) shall file a reply to the Opposition to Debtor(s) Asset Purchase Agreement within seven (7) days. Signed on 9/11/2023. Order due by 9/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#188).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 11, 2023 Filing 197 Objection to (1) NOTICE OF (I) POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES AND (II) CURE AMOUNTS; (2) MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) APPROVING (A) ENTRY INTO THE FAJARDO STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS AND (B) BIDDING PROCEDURES AND THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF, (II) SCHEDULING THE SALE HEARING, (III) ESTABLISHING ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT PROCEDURES AND APPROVING THE MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF AND (IV) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF" Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp. (RE: related document(s)#112). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 - A - Part 1 #6 Exhibit 5 - B - Part 2 #7 Exhibit 6 #8 Exhibit 7)(RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
September 11, 2023 Filing 196 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16431831, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #195) (U.S. Treasury)
September 11, 2023 Filing 195 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Collateral: None. Post Petition Arrears: None. Hearing scheduled 10/3/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil complaint) filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Jose M. Diaz-De Jesus [Velazquez, Jose]
September 11, 2023 Filing 194 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16431756, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #193) (U.S. Treasury)
September 11, 2023 Filing 193 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Collateral: None. Post Petition Arrears: None. Hearing scheduled 10/3/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil complaint) filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Milagros Gomez-Collazo [Velazquez, Jose]
September 11, 2023 Filing 192 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16431702, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #191) (U.S. Treasury)
September 11, 2023 Filing 191 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Collateral: None. Post Petition Arrears: None. Hearing scheduled 10/3/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil complaint) filed by Jose F Velazquez on behalf of Zaida Diaz-Gonzalez [Velazquez, Jose]
September 11, 2023 Filing 190 Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents and Extension of Time to File Certified Translations filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. [CABRERA BOU, CAROLINA]
September 11, 2023 Filing 189 Objection to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts and Reservation of Rights as to the Motion to Sell Property (Docket No. 57) Filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Bio-Nuclear of Puerto Rico, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#112). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5)(RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
September 11, 2023 Filing 188 Opposition to Asset Purchase Agreement Filed by FERNANDO VAN DERDYS on behalf of CRIM (RE: related document(s)#77). (VAN DERDYS, FERNANDO)
September 11, 2023 Filing 187 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by JOSE LUIS RAMIREZ COLL on behalf of Baxter Sales and Distribution PR, Corp.. (RAMIREZ COLL, JOSE)
September 10, 2023 Filing 186 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#174) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 185 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#173) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 184 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#177) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 183 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#175) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 9, 2023 Filing 182 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#164) Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
September 9, 2023 Filing 181 Motion submitting document(s):(1) REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#87). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 8, 2023 Filing 180 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#163) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Filing 179 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#162) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Filing 178 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#161) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER AUTHORIZING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (REAL ESTATE BROKER) Signed on 9/8/2023. (RE: related document(s)#155).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 8, 2023 Filing 176 Appellant Designation and Statement of Issues on Appeal. BK Appeal No: 23-01433 filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC. (objection language due by 09/22/2023). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The motion requesting entry of Order filed Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, (Docket #166) is hereby granted. A hearing on the sale of properties (except for Fajardo Properties) is hereby scheduled for 9/28/2023 at 03:00 PM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#171).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension of certain sale-related deadlines filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, (docket #153) is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/8/2023. (RE: related document(s)#158).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/8/2023. Order due by 9/12/2023. (RE: related document(s)#170).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 8, 2023 Filing 172 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by BEATRIZ HERNANDEZ TORO on behalf of UNIVERSAL CARE CORPORATION. (HERNANDEZ TORO, BEATRIZ)
September 8, 2023 Filing 171 Motion requesting entry of order -NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #77) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 8, 2023 Filing 170 Motion requesting extension of time( 2 working days) TO FILE REPLY TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY AT DOCKET NO. 68. (related document(s):#68) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 8, 2023 Filing 169 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by ALEXANDRA BIGAS VALEDON on behalf of NATASHIA L VELEZ QUINONES. (BIGAS VALEDON, ALEXANDRA)
September 7, 2023 Filing 168 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#154) Notice Date 09/07/2023. (Admin.)
September 7, 2023 Filing 167 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of ERO NEUROLOGY HEALTH SERVICES PSC. (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
September 7, 2023 Filing 166 Notice Appointing Creditors Committee filed by JOSE CARLOS DIAZ-VEGA on behalf of US TRUSTEE (DIAZ-VEGA, JOSE)
September 7, 2023 Filing 165 Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman, Edna Diaz De Jesus filed by JOSE CARLOS DIAZ-VEGA on behalf of MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS (DIAZ-VEGA, JOSE)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/7/2023. Order due by 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #126, #159).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (SPECIAL COUNSEL) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#14).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (FINANCIAL CONSULTANT) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#13).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (DEBTOR'S ATTORNEY) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#3).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Filing 160 Motion to inform Notice of Hybrid 341 Meeting of Creditors (In person/Phone). Filed by US TRUSTEE (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
September 5, 2023 Filing 159 Motion for Leave to File , in addition to Motion requesting extension of time( 14 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYMENT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (related document(s):#126) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 5, 2023 Filing 158 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES (RE: related document(s)#77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 5, 2023 Filing 157 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#151). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) Filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of ANGELICA PEREZ GARCIA-BARBON and LAURA DAVILA OTERO, as MEMBERS AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE of ANGEL PEREZ NOVO (Guzman, Humberto)
September 5, 2023 Filing 156 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#104). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) Filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of Lyan Marie Santiago-Rodriguez, et.al. (Guzman, Humberto)
September 5, 2023 Filing 155 Application to employ REAL ESTATE BROKER, HILCO REAL ESTATE, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A Services Agreement #3 Exhibit B Certificate of proposed #4 Exhibit C Curriculum vitae) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 5, 2023 Filing 154 MINUTES OF HEARING HELD ON AUGUST 23, 2023. (PLEASE REFER TO MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#9, #17, #30, #36, #48, #52, #56, #62, #63).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 5, 2023 Filing 153 362 Summons Issued. Respondent must file an answer to the motion within 14 days from service of this notice. (RE: related document(s)#151) (ROMO, JOSE)
September 4, 2023 Filing 152 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16419824, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #151) (U.S. Treasury)
September 4, 2023 Filing 151 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Collateral: None. Post Petition Arrears: Not Applicable. Hearing scheduled 10/3/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of ANGELICA PEREZ GARCIA-BARBON and LAURA DAVILA OTERO, as MEMBERS AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE of ANGEL PEREZ NOVO, Laura Davila Otero, ANGELICA PREZ GARCA-BARBN [Guzman, Humberto]
September 2, 2023 Filing 150 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#139) Notice Date 09/02/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 149 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#127) Notice Date 09/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 148 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#129) Notice Date 09/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 147 Motion submitting document(s):DEBTORS MOTION SUBMITING (1)REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#87). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
September 1, 2023 Filing 146 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#57, #77). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Publication 08-31-2023) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 31, 2023 Filing 145 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#123) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 144 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#122) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 143 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#118) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 142 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#116) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 141 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#111) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 140 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by HECTOR E. PEDROSA on behalf of Eastern Health, LLC. (PEDROSA, HECTOR)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order Granting Motion Signed on 8/31/2023. (RE: related document(s)#113, #134).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 30, 2023 Filing 138 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#108) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 137 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#108) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 136 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#109) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 135 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#100) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 134 Motion requesting extension of time( No Less Than Two (2) Business days) After the Mediation Report is Filed/ Debtors Motion to Inform Intent to Oppose Request for Stay Pending Appeal at Docket No. 113 and. (related document(s):#113) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 30, 2023 Filing 133 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#68). Filed by CHARLES ALFRED CUPRILL on behalf of Linnoska Correa Carrillo (CUPRILL, CHARLES)
August 30, 2023 Filing 132 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual with Schedules and, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 30, 2023 Filing 131 Motion to inform . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Filed by CHARLES ALFRED CUPRILL on behalf of Puerto Rico Hospital Supply, Inc (CUPRILL, CHARLES)
August 30, 2023 Filing 130 Amended Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/6/2023 at 09:30 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 12/5/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 1/4/2024. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/26/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: The court will hold in abeyance ruling on the urgent motion for stay pending appeal, and the motion for reconsideration, until a mediation report is filed. (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS). Signed on 8/30/2023. (RE: related document(s)#113, #114, #120, #124).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 30, 2023 Filing 128 Motion requesting entry of order for the appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Under 11 USC 333 (related document(s): #32) filed by WILLIAM M VIDAL on behalf of Triple-S Advantage, Inc., Triple S Salud Inc. [VIDAL, WILLIAM]
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 8/30/2023. (RE: related document(s)#121).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 126 Trustee's Objection to Debtors Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Retention Of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and (B) Designation of Stephen Marotta as Chief Restructuring Officer, Russell Perry as Restructuring Officer and Robert Weigel as Assistant Treasurer Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date; and (II) Granting Related Relief (RE: related document(s) #12). filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
August 29, 2023 Filing 125 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#112). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 124 Response to (AAFAFS RESPONSE) TO DEBTORS URGENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING DEBTORS DIP FINANCING AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#114). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 123 INTERIM ORDER (I) APPROVING THE DEBTORS PROPOSED ADEQUATE ASSURANCE DEPOSIT, FOR FUTURE UTILITY SERVICES, (II) PROHIBITING UTILITY PROVIDERS FROM ALTERING, REFUSING, OR DISCONTINUING, (III) APPROVING THE DEBTORS PROPOSED PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING ADEQUATE ASSURANCE REQUESTS, AND (IV) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 8/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#8, #29).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING URGENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (A) PAY PREPETITION EMPLOYEE WAGES, SALARIES, OTHER COMPENSATION, AND REIMBURSABLE EXPENSES AND (B) CONTINUE EMPLOYEE BENEFITS PROGRAMS AND (II) AUTHORIZING BANKS AND FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO PAY ALL CHECKS AND ELECTRONIC PAYMENT REQUESTS RELATING TO THE FOREGOING, (III) SCHEDULE A HEARING AND (IV) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 8/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#7, #29).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 121 Motion requesting time ( 1 days) to file schedules and statement of affairs. filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 29, 2023 Filing 120 Opposition to Debtors Motion for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Filed by FERNANDO VAN DERDYS on behalf of CRIM (RE: related document(s)#114). (VAN DERDYS, FERNANDO)
August 29, 2023 Filing 119 Application to employ Investment Consultant, IEC Consulting, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A lEC_Engagement_Letter #2 Exhibit B Certified Proposed IEC #3 Exhibit C CurriculumVitae) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 29, 2023 Filing 118 AMENDED STANDING MEDIATION ORDER: The mediation will take place on Thursday, August 31, 2023 at 3:00 P.M. at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jose V. Toledo Courthouse, Courtroom 3, 300 Recinto Sur Street, San Juan, Puerto Rico. Signed on 8/29/2023.(Colon, Tatiana)
August 29, 2023 Filing 117 Acknowledgment of Appeal by District Court. . District Court Case No: 23-01433 (RE: related document(s)#108) (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: Parties in interest to state their position within 11 days as to Debtor(s) urgent motion for entry of order (I) authorizing the debtors to (a) pay their obligations under insurance policies even for retroactive prepetition coverage, (b) renew, supplement, modify, or purchase insurance coverage, and (II) granting related relief filed on August 28, 2023. Signed on 8/29/2023. Order due by 9/11/2023. (RE: related document(s)#106).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 115 362 Summons Issued. Respondent must file an answer to the motion within 14 days from service of this notice. (RE: related document(s)#104) (ROMO, JOSE)
August 28, 2023 Filing 114 Urgent motion (related document(s):#86), in addition to Motion for Reconsideration DEBTORS URGENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER AT DOCKET NO. 91 DENYING DEBTORS DIP AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION (DKT. 9, 21 & 66) AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING (related document(s):#86) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CFO Sworn Declaration #2 Exhibit B ASES Preliminary Report #3 Exhibit C Audited Consolidated Financial Statements 2021 #4 Exhibit D Consolidated Financial Statements December 2022 #5 Exhibit E Consolidated Financial Statements June 2023 #6 Exhibit F - Amended Credit Agreement #7 Exhibit G AR Aging July 2023 #8 Exhibit H Real Property) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 28, 2023 Filing 113 Urgent motion for Stay Pending Appeal (related document(s):#87) filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 28, 2023 Filing 112 Motion to inform NOTICE OF (I) POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES AND (II) CURE AMOUNTS (RE: related document(s)#57, #77). Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 28, 2023 Filing 111 STANDING MEDIATION ORDER. The mediation will take place on Wednesday, August 30, 2023 at 9:00 A.M. at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jose V. Toledo Courthouse, Courtroom 3, 300 Recinto Sur Street, San Juan, Puerto Rico. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#98).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 110 Notice of appearance and request for notice. Filed by MIGDA L RODRIGUEZ COLLAZO on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO (RODRIGUEZ COLLAZO, MIGDA)
August 28, 2023 Filing 109 MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#98).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA) Modified on 8/29/2023 (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS).
August 28, 2023 Filing 108 Transmittal Form to District Court (RE: related document(s)#87, #93) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 107 Notice of appearance and request for notice. Filed by LUIS R LUGO EMANUELLI on behalf of Leydalix Morales Martnez (LUGO EMANUELLI, LUIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 106 Urgent motion of the Debtors for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Their Obligations Under Insurance Policies Even for Retroactive Prepetition Coverage, (B) Renew, Supplement, Modify, or Purchase Insurance Coverage, and (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s):#87) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 28, 2023 Filing 105 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16407063, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #104) (U.S. Treasury)
August 28, 2023 Filing 104 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Without Declaration under servicemember civil relief act of 2003. Collateral: None. Post Petition Arrears: Not Applicable. Hearing scheduled 9/26/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of Lyan Marie Santiago-Rodriguez, et.al. [Guzman, Humberto]
August 28, 2023 Filing 103 Motion to inform REGARDING FILING FOR RELIEF FROM STAY UNDER 11 USC 362 Filed by Humberto Guzman on behalf of Lyan Marie Santiago-Rodriguez, et.al.. (RE: related document(s)#84)(Guzman, Humberto)
August 28, 2023 Filing 102 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event was used. Party must re-file correctly. (RE: related document(s)#84) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 101 BNC Notice (RE: related document(s)#93) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting Motion to allow Atara Miller to appear pro hac vice. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#85).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 27, 2023 Filing 99 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#87) Notice Date 08/27/2023. (Admin.)
August 27, 2023 Filing 98 Urgent motion FOR MEDIATION ORDER AS TO DEBTORS REQUEST FOR POST-PETITION FINANCING (related document(s):#9) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 26, 2023 Filing 97 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#77) Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
August 26, 2023 Filing 96 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#86) Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
August 26, 2023 Filing 95 Addendum to Record on Appeal Supplemental Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC (RE: related document(s)#93). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 26, 2023 Filing 94 Receipt of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election(# 23-02513-ESL11) [appeal,ntcaplel] ( 298.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16405636, amount $ 298.00. (RE: related document(s) #93) (U.S. Treasury)
August 26, 2023 Filing 93 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court. Fee Amount $298. Due by 09/11/2023. filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC (RE: related document(s)#87). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 25, 2023 Filing 92 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#75) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 91 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#65) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 90 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#70) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 89 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by MYRNA L RUIZ OLMO on behalf of Caribbean Med, Inc.. (RUIZ OLMO, MYRNA)
August 25, 2023 Filing 88 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CAROLINA V CABRERA BOU on behalf of GEA Caribbean Exports, LLC. (CABRERA BOU, CAROLINA)
August 24, 2023 Filing 87 CASH COLLATERAL ORDER Signed on 8/24/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 24, 2023 Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons stated herein, the Debtors DIP and Cash Collateral Motion (dkt. #21), as supplemented and amended (dkt. #66) is hereby denied.Signed on 8/24/2023. Order due by 9/7/2023. (RE: related document(s)#17, #58).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 24, 2023 Filing 85 Motion to allow Atara Miller to appear pro hac vice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 24, 2023 Filing 84 Motion requesting entry of order to lift Automatic Stay Filed by Creditor Lyan Marie Santiago-Rodriguez, et.al. ( objection language due by 09/7/2023). (Guzman, Humberto)
August 23, 2023 Filing 83 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#55) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 82 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#54) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 81 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#53) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 80 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#51) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 79 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#52) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 78 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/23/2023 02:31:53 PM]. File Size [ 41755 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:59:01 ]. (admin).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER (I) APPROVING (A) ENTRY INTO THE FAJARDO STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS AND (B) BIDDING PROCEDURES AND THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF, (II) SCHEDULING THE SALE HEARING, (III) ESTABLISHING ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT PROCEDURES AND APPROVING THE MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF AND (IV) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF Signed on 8/23/2023. (RE: related document(s)#57).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 76 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16401812, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #68) (U.S. Treasury)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Signed on 8/23/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#1).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 74 Notice of appearance and request for notice. Filed by Angel Eduardo Portilla on behalf of GRUPO DE RADIOTERAPIA DEL TURABO, PSC, GRUPO DE RADIOTERAPIA DEL NORTE, PSC (Portilla, Angel)
August 23, 2023 Filing 73 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#48, #52). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 72 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#51, #53, #55, #56). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 71 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#3, #4, #5, #6, #7, #8, #9, #11, #12, #13, #14, #17, #33, #35, #38, #40). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting Movant's Motion Requesting Copy of Debtor's Disclosure Statement and Plan Signed on 8/23/2023. (RE: related document(s)#67).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 69 362 Summons Issued. Respondent must file an answer to the motion within 14 days from service of this notice. (RE: related document(s)#68) (ROMO, JOSE)
August 22, 2023 Filing 68 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Hearing scheduled 9/19/2023 at 09:00 AM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) filed by CHARLES ALFRED CUPRILL on behalf of Linnoska Correa Carrillo [CUPRILL, CHARLES]
August 22, 2023 Filing 67 Motion pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3017(a) requesting copy of debtor's disclosure statement and plan filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc. [FORTUNO FAS, JUAN]
August 22, 2023 Filing 66 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by JUAN C FORTUNO FAS on behalf of Commercial Equipment Finance, Inc.. (FORTUNO FAS, JUAN)
August 22, 2023 Filing 65 MINUTES AND ORDER OF HEARING HELD ON AUGUST 18, 2023. (PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#4, #5, #6, #11).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 64 Notice of appearance and request for notice. Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
August 22, 2023 Filing 63 Trustee's Objection to Debtors Urgent Motion Requesting an Interim and Final Order: (a) Granting Authorization to Obtain Postpetition Financing; (b) Authorization to Use Cash Collateral; (c) Granting Liens and Providing Super Priority Administrative Expense Claims; (d) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties; (e) Modifying the Automatic Stay; and (f) Scheduling a Final Hearing and Granting Related Relief (RE: related document(s) #9, #17). filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
August 22, 2023 Filing 62 Motion to inform Reiterating Position of the Government Entities as to Urgent Motion for Entry of Interim Order to Approve Pospetition Debtor in Possession Financing and Related Relief, As Supplemented (RE: related document(s)#30, #52). Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 22, 2023 Filing 61 Motion submitting document(s):Debtors' Supplement to Retention of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12, #56, 60 ). (Attachments: #1 Annex 1) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 22, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF does not include motion. Party must re-file correctly. (RE: related document(s)#56) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Filing 59 Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens(# 23-02513-ESL11) [motion,msell] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16398588, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #57) (U.S. Treasury)
August 21, 2023 Filing 58 Motion submitting document(s):SUPPLEMENT / AMENDMENT TO DIP FINANCING AND CONSENTED USE OF CASH COLLATERAL AT DOCKET NO. 9 & 17 (RE: related document(s)#9, #17). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Interim DIP Order #2 Exhibit B Redlined Proposed Order #3 Exhibit C Real Property and Crim Debt Detail #4 Exhibit D - Accounts Receivable and Aging Report #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Armando Rodrguez) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 21, 2023 Filing 57 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) DEBTORS MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) APPROVING (A) ENTRY INTO THE FAJARDO STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS. Fee Amount $188, in addition to Motion requesting entry of order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Bidding_Procedures_Order #2 Exhibit 1 Bidding Procedures #3 Exhibit 2 Sale Notice #4 Exhibit 3 Fajardo Stalking Horse APA #5 Exhibit 4 Assumption and Assignment Notice #6 Exhibit Assets Purchase Agreement #7 Exhibit Proposed Order Approving Purchase and Sale Agreements) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 21, 2023 Filing 56 Motion submitting document(s):Debtors' Supplement to Retention of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12). (Attachments: #1 Annex 1) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Authorizing employment and payment of EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC, as notice and claims agent, nunc pro tunc to the petition date. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#11).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Interim Order (I) authorizing the debtors to continue use of its existing bank accounts; (II) waiving compliance with investment guidelines under 11 U.S.C. 345(b); (III) authorizing the use of cash management system; (IV) honor certain prepetition obligations related thereto; (V) maintain existing business forms; (VI) continue performing and granting administrative priority for intercompany transactions, and (VII) granting related relief. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Interim Order Authorizing Debtors to file Consolidated List of Creditors. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Hearing scheduled 8/23/2023 at 02:30 PM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice 22-29. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#4).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 20, 2023 Filing 50 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#40) Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.)
August 20, 2023 Filing 49 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#37) Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.)
August 20, 2023 Filing 48 Urgent motion (related document(s):#9, #17, #29), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order URGENT MOTION REQUESTING SCHEDULING ORDER FOR AUGUST 23, 2023 WITH EXPEDITED DEADLINES RELATED TO DIP FINANCING AND USE OF CASH COLLATERAL (related document(s): #9, #17, #29) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 19, 2023 Filing 47 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#32) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 19, 2023 Filing 46 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#31) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 19, 2023 Filing 45 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#29) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 19, 2023 Filing 44 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#25) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 43 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#18) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 42 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#15) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 41 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/18/2023 09:50:09 AM]. File Size [ 67147 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:23:28 ]. (admin).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Granting Motion for Interim Use of Cash Collateral. Signed on 8/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#38).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 39 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#10, #25, #29). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 38 Motion submitting document(s):Supplement to Motion for Interim Use of Cash Collateral Unit August 23, 2023, with Reduced Budget for Immediate Necessary Expenses with Attached Proposed Consent Order Agreed with First Lien Secured Lender with Proposal of Adequate Protection (RE: related document(s)#33, #35). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order Cash Collateral #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Budget) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Granting Motion to allow Matthew Brod to appear pro hac vice. Signed on 8/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#34).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 36 Objection to Debtors' Request for the Use of Cash Collateral and Demand for Adequate Protection Filed by GABRIEL MIRANDA RIVERA, HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC (RE: related document(s)#33, #35). (BAUER ALVAREZ, HERMANN)
August 17, 2023 Filing 35 Motion submitting document(s):MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENT TO CASH COLLATERAL MOTION WITH DECLARATION AND BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#33). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DECLARATION OF FINANCIAL CONSULTANT IN SUPPORT OF URGENT MOTION FOR EMERGENCY USE OF CASH COLLATERAL #2 Exhibit C- PROPOSED BUDGET) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 17, 2023 Filing 34 Motion to allow Matthew Brod to appear pro hac vice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 17, 2023 Filing 33 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (1) ON AN INTERIM BASIS AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN (2) ENTRY OF AN EMERGENCY SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING FOR THE RELATED RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The petition filed on August 15, 2023 reflects that this is a health care business case. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States Trustee shall appoint an ombudsman, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 333(a)(2) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2007.2(c), unless the U.S. Trustee and/or the debtor in possession inform the court in writing, within twenty-one (21) days, why the appointment of an ombudsman is not necessary for the protection of the patients. Order due by: 09/07/2023 Signed on 8/17/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: If any of the entities listed below should file a notice of appearance, I disqualify myself from presiding in any contested matter wherein the above referenced entities are a party pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5004(a). Should any contested matter relating to any of these entities become relevant to the outcome of the case, I will disqualify myself from presiding over the case. At this time, there are no pending contested matters concerning the entities referenced herein. Referenced entities: Abbott Laboratories PR Inc, Abbott Medical PR LLC, Abbott Optical, American Paper, Costco Wholesale, Home Depot,Microsoft Licensing GP, United Surety & Indemnity Co.,Chase Visa,Walmart.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 8/17/2023. (RE: related document(s)#1).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 17, 2023 Filing 30 Response to and Preliminary Objection to Urgent Motion for Entry of Interim Order to Approve Postpetition Debtor in Possession Financing and Related Relief Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#9, #17). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 29 SECOND ORDER AND NOTICE ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Objections, if any, to the First Day Motions listed above shall be filed on or before August 28, 2023 (the Objection Deadline). A hearing on the approval of the First Day Motions listed above and any timely objections filed thereto is scheduled for September 1, 2023, at 10:00 AM (the First Day Motions Hearing) at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice22-29. (Order due by 8/28/2023). (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (LABARCA MORALES, IGNACIO)
August 17, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
August 17, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Objections, if any, to the First Day Motions listed above shall be filed on or before TODAY, August 17, 2023, at 5:00 PM (the Objection deadline). A hearing on the approval of the First Day Motions listed above and any timely objections filed thereto is scheduled for tomorrow, August 18, 2023, at 9:30 AM (the First Day Motions Hearing) at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice 22-29. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by BRIAN K TESTER on behalf of Fajardo Integrated Medical Center, L.L.C.. (TESTER, BRIAN)
August 17, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by ALEXIS FUENTES HERNANDEZ on behalf of Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc.. (FUENTES HERNANDEZ, ALEXIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC. (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 17, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by GABRIEL MIRANDA RIVERA on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC. (MIRANDA RIVERA, GABRIEL)
August 17, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC. (BAUER ALVAREZ, HERMANN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by FRANCISCO J RAMOS MARTINEZ on behalf of Municipio de Fajardo. (RAMOS MARTINEZ, FRANCISCO)
August 16, 2023 Filing 18 Notice Reassigning Case to Judge Enrique S. Lamoutte (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Amended), Motion for Post Petition Credit To Obtain Postpetition Financing Authorizing the Debtors, Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Other Remedies Related Docket No. 9 filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: I hereby disqualify myself from this case. The Clerk shall reassign this case to another judge. Signed on 8/16/2023.(FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/22/2023 at 09:30 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/21/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 12/21/2023. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/12/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 Application to employ Special Counsel, Pietrantoni Mndez & Alvarez LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Statement Special Counsel #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae #3 Exhibit C - PMA Bankruptcy Engagement) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 Application to employ Financial Consultant, CPA Luis R. Carrasquillo & Co., P.S.C. (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Financial Consultant #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 Application to employ Chief Restructuring Officer and Others, Ankura Consulting Group, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Engagement #2 Exhibit B - Marotta Declaration #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Retention_Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 Application to employ Notice Agent, EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Epiq Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Epiq Engagement Service #3 Exhibit C - Services and Declaration) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 Urgent motion Requesting Scheduling Order with Expedite Deadlines Related to First Day Motions (related document(s):#1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion for Post Petition Credit To Obtain Postpetition Financing Authorizing the Debtors, Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Other Remedies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Interim DIP Order #2 Schedule 1 - DIP Credit Agreement #3 Schedule 1.2 - Annex 1-2 #4 Schedule 1.3 - Schedules 6.2 -6.17- #5 Schedule 1.4 - DIP Credit Agreement - Exhibits #6 Schedule 2 Initial DIP Budget #7 Exhibit B - Intercreditor_Agreement #8 Exhibit C - Adequate Protection Analysis for DIP #9 Exhibit D First Day Declaration Armando Rodriguez #10 Exhibit E Marotta Declaration FINAL WITH MMM Funding) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Prohibiting Discontinuing Utilities, Deeming Utilities to Have Adequate Assurance and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Utilities_Interim_Order #2 Exhibit B -Utility_Avareage) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 7 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interim Order Prepetition Wages #2 Exhibit B Final Order Prepetition Wages #3 Exhibit C - Salaries Adjusted - Total) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 6 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Continue Using Existing Bank Accounts, Cash Management System and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Interim Order on Cash management- Interim #2 Exhibit I -Cash Accounts #3 Exhibit II Cash Accounts) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Authorizing the Debtors to File Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order Consolidated Matrix) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting administrative consolidation with case no as detailed in motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order Joint Administration) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 Application to employ Attorney for Debtor, Lugo Mender Group, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Verified_Statement_of_Proposed_Attorney_LMG #2 Exhibit B CV Wigberto Lugo Mender #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order for App Employment LMG) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02513-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16389386, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 plan due by 12/13/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2023. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/14/2023.. Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC. (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)

Search for this case: CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO, INC.
Represented By: WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CENTRO MEDICO DEL TURABO INC
Represented By: ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY
Represented By: AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN
Represented By: WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Eastern Health, LLC
Represented By: HECTOR E. PEDROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Isaac Rene HERNNDEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Humberto Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Grupo de Radioterapia del Norte, PSC
Represented By: Angel Eduardo Portilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Herminio Colon, Elizabeth Amaro, Jose Miguel Amaro, Ivette Delgado, and minors Y.J.A., Z.S.G.A., and Y.M.G.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Grupo Intensivo Pediatrico, CSP
Represented By: Juan M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Neyza Curz Cedeno and Savier Vazquez Oyola
Represented By: Juan M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Angelica Perez Garcia-Barbon and Laura Davila Otero
Represented By: Humberto Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: FRANCISCO E COLON RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?