JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC
Debtor: JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. and JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC
Not Classified By Court: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 3:2023bk02521
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: EDWARD A GODOY
Referring Judge: ENRIQUE S LAMOUTTE INCLAN
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 266 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#258) Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 265 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#256) Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 264 Motion submitting document(s): ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE NOVA INFUSION ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#67, #246). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Asset Purchase Agreement) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 13, 2023 Filing 263 Motion submitting document(s): ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#67, #238). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Asset Purchase Agreement) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 13, 2023 Filing 262 Response to UNITED STATES TRUSTEES OBJECTION TO DEBTORS EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING (A) RETENTION OF ANKURA CONSULTING GROUP, LLC AND (B) DESIGNATION OF STEPHEN MAROTTA AS CHIEF RESTRUCTURING OFFICER, RUSSELL PERRY AS RESTRUCTURING OFFICER AND ROHID AHMED AS ASSISTANT TREASURER NUNC PRO TUNC TO THE PETITION DATE AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (RE: related document(s)#105). (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 12, 2023 Filing 261 Motion submitting document(s): ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMET FOR SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE CAGUAS ASSETS (RE: related document(s)#67, #239). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Asset Purchase Agreement) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER APPROVING PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENTS OF GRUPO HIMA FAJARDO HOSPITAL PURSUANT TO SECTION 363 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS INTERESTS AND ENCUMBRANCES Signed on 10/12/2023. (RE: related document(s)#259).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 11, 2023 Filing 259 Urgent motion TO SUBMMIT REVISED FAJARDO SALE ORDER AND (related document(s):#54, #244), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order GRANTING DOCKET NO. 65 (related document(s): #54, #244) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING URGENT MOTION AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO PREPETITION FIRST LIEN OBLIGATIONS, PREPETITION FIRST LIEN AGENT, AND PREPETITION FIRST LIEN LENDERS. Signed on 10/11/2023. Order due by 10/23/2023. (RE: related document(s)#257).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
October 11, 2023 Filing 257 Urgent motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Discovery with Respect to Prepetition First Lien Obligations, Prepetition First Lien Agent, and Prepetition First Lien Lenders, and Urgent Request for Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information Requests #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena #3 Exhibit C - Subpoena #4 Proposed Order) filed by FRANCISCO E COLON RAMIREZ on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors [COLON RAMIREZ, FRANCISCO]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 10/11/2023. Order due by 10/17/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #62, #105, #254).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 10, 2023 Filing 255 Minutes of 341 meeting continued: Hybrid (in person/telephone) 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/27/2023 at 01:00 PM via 341 MEETING ROOM, OCHOA BUILDING, 500 TANCA STREET, FIRST FLOOR, SAN JUAN. filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
October 10, 2023 Filing 254 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYMENT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125. (related document(s):#12, #105, #237, #242) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
October 10, 2023 Filing 253 Motion to inform Notice of CONTINUANCE OF HYBRID 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS (INPERSON/PHONE) OCTOBER 27TH, 2023 AT 1:00PM. Filed by US TRUSTEE (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
October 9, 2023 Filing 252 Motion to inform Limited Objection To Proposed Sale of The Caguas Assets and Resevation of Rights. Filed by MARY ANN GANDIA on behalf of ASOCIACION DE CONDOMINES HIMA PLAZA I (GANDIA, MARY)
October 7, 2023 Filing 251 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#244) Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 250 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#242) Notice Date 10/06/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 249 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#236) Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 248 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#235) Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 247 Motion to inform /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO MOTION REGARDING SALE HEARING OF THE BAYAMON ASSETS/ (RE: related document(s)#166, #176, #226, #235). Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
October 5, 2023 Filing 246 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE NOVA INFUSION ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 4, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attendance List Auction) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 5, 2023 Filing 245 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by MARY ANN GANDIA on behalf of ASOCIACION DE CONDOMINES HIMA PLAZA I. (GANDIA, MARY)
October 4, 2023 Filing 243 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Balance Sheet #2 Exhibit B Income Statement #3 Exhibit C Bank Reconciliations & Bank Statements) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 10/4/2023. Order due by 10/10/2023. (RE: related document(s) #12, #62, #105, #237).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 4, 2023 Filing 241 Motion to withdraw / NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION AT DOCKET NO. 303 (related document(s): #238) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
October 4, 2023 Filing 240 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 2, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67, #238). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Attendance List Auction Humacao) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
October 3, 2023 Filing 239 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE CAGUAS ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 3, 2023 Filing 238 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE HUMACAO ASSETS THIS PURSUANT TO THE AUCTION HELD ON OCTOBER 2, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Attendance List Auction Humacao) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
October 3, 2023 Filing 237 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEMNT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125. (related document(s):#173, #175) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The sales of the HIMA San Pablo Caguas property, and Nova Infusion licenses and personal property. Signed on 10/3/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#227).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER AND NOTICE TO CONSIDER: The sales of the Bayamn Assets, and the Humacao Properties. Signed on 10/3/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#226, #227).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
October 1, 2023 Filing 234 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#224) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 233 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#223) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 232 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#225) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
October 1, 2023 Filing 231 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#222) Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 30, 2023 Filing 230 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#213) Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 229 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#206) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 228 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#205) Notice Date 09/29/2023. (Admin.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 227 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION FOR THE HIMA SAN PABLO CAGUAS PROPERTY AND NOVA INFUSION LICENSES AND PERSONAL PROPERTY (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 29, 2023 Filing 226 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE BAYAMON ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. Signed on 9/29/2023. Order due by 10/5/2023. (RE: related document(s)#216).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order Granting Motion. The preliminary agreements are hereby approved. Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#215).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING, (II) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO USE CASH COLLATERAL, (III) GRANTING LIENS AND PROVIDING SUPERPRIORITY ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIMS, (IV) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION TO PREPETITION SECURED PARTIES , (V) MODIFYING AUTOMATIC STAY,AND (VI) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#189, #215, #221).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION Signed on 9/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#154, #198, #214).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 29, 2023 Filing 221 Urgent motion (related document(s):#189, #215), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order URGENT JOINT MOTION TO SUBMMIT REVISED DIP ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DOCKET NO. 240 (related document(s): #189, #215) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Revised DIP Order) filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ, NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, Island Healthcare, LLC, JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 28, 2023 Filing 244 MINUTES OF HEARING HELD ON SEPTEMBER 28, 2023 (PLEASE REFER TO MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#54, #67, #92, #154, #156, #162, #166, #208).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 28, 2023 Filing 220 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#201) Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
September 28, 2023 Filing 219 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#202) Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
September 28, 2023 Filing 218 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#197) Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
September 28, 2023 Filing 217 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [09/28/2023 10:29:25 AM]. File Size [ 23404 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:40:16 ]. (admin).
September 28, 2023 Filing 216 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. (related document(s):#180, #187) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 28, 2023 Filing 215 Motion requesting entry of order -JOINT MOTION TO RESOLVE OBJECTIONS FILED BY CONSEJO DE TITULARES AT DOCKETS NO. 267 AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE OBJECTIONS AT DOCKET NOS. 209 AND 223 (related document(s): #166, #176, #208) filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 28, 2023 Filing 214 Joint motionJoint Informative Motion to Clarify CRIM Stipulation filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, CRIM, Island Healthcare, LLC, JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#93, #209).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 212 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#195) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 211 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#196) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 210 Motion requesting entry of order NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #67) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 27, 2023 Filing 209 Motion requesting extension of time( 2 days) TO FILE POSITION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AT DOCKET NO. 113. (related document(s):#107, #189) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 27, 2023 Filing 208 Objection to /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO LIMITED OBJECTION TO POST PETITION FINANCING AT DOCKET NO 240 AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#189, #195). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 27, 2023 Filing 207 Acknowledgment of Certification for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal by District Court. District Court Case No: 23-01439 (RE: related document(s)#197) (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE. Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#156, #204).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/27/2023. (RE: related document(s)#203).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 26, 2023 Filing 204 Motion to withdraw AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE: (I) IN SUPPORT OF SALE OF THE DEBTORS OPERATIONS AS A GOING CONCERN; AND (II) OBJECTING SOLELY TO THE PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SALE PROCEEDS OUTSIDE OF A PLAN AND WITHOUT A BENEFIT TO OTHER CREDITORS AND THE ESTATE (related document(s): #156) filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY [MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS]
September 26, 2023 Filing 203 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY AFFAF AND UNITED STATES AT DOCKET NO. 185 AND 186. (related document(s):#156, #200, #202) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#156, #200).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN OBJECTION PERIOD Signed on 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#198, #199).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 200 Motion requesting extension of time( 1 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY AFFAF AND UNITED STATES AT DOCKET NO. 185 AND 186. (related document(s):#156) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 25, 2023 Filing 199 Urgent motion TO SHORTEN OBJECTION PERIOD AND NOTICE (related document(s):#198) filed by AMARYS VELLISE BOLORIN-SOLIVAN on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BOLORIN-SOLIVAN, AMARYS]
September 25, 2023 Filing 198 Joint motion (related document(s):#75, #154), in addition to Stipulation JOINT MOTION FOR THE APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CRIMS SECURED CLAIMS AND WITHDRAWAL OF CRIMS OBJECTIONS TO DEBTORS POST PETITION FINANCING AND SALE OF ASSETS (21 Day(s) Objection language due by 10/16/2023) (related document(s):#75, #154) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CRIM Executed Settlement #2 Exhibit 1 - CRIM Principal Tax Debt Itemization) filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ, FERNANDO VAN DERDYS, NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC, CRIM, Island Healthcare, LLC, JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 25, 2023 Filing 197 Clerk's Certification for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal to District Court DC #23-01439 (RE: related document(s)#79, #141) (HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
September 25, 2023 Filing 196 MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT (RE: related document(s)#90, #97). Signed on 9/25/2023.(Colon, Tatiana)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARING TO CONSIDER DIP AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION Signed on 9/25/2023. Hearing scheduled 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#189, #194).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 25, 2023 Filing 194 Urgent motion REQUESTING SCHEDULING ORDER WITH EXPEDITE DEADLINES RELATED TO DIP AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION (related document(s):#75, #76, #178, #189) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 24, 2023 Filing 193 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#187) Notice Date 09/24/2023. (Admin.)
September 23, 2023 Filing 192 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#182) Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
September 23, 2023 Filing 191 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#181) Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 190 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#175) Notice Date 09/22/2023. (Admin.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 189 Urgent motion OF DEBTORS FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (related document(s):#9), in addition to Motion for Post Petition Credit (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING,, in addition to Motion to Use Cash Collateral (II) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO USE CASH COLLATERAL, (III) GRANTING LIENS AND PROVIDING SUPERPRIORITY ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIMS, (IV) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION TO PREPETITION SECURED PARTIES, (V) MODIFYING AUTOMATIC STAY, AND (VI) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DIP Credit Agreement #2 Exhibit B - DIP Order Redline #3 Exhibit C - DIP Credit Agreement Redline #4 Exhibit D Marotta Declaration #5 Schedule 2 Budget) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 22, 2023 Filing 188 Motion requesting entry of order -NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #67) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/22/2023. Order due by 9/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#180).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 186 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#170) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 185 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#171) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 184 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#174) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 183 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#172) Notice Date 09/21/2023. (Admin.)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension and/or modification of certain sale-related deadlines, and auction date / location filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#177).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF THE INTERIM USE OF CASH COLLATERAL (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS). Signed on 9/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#76, #178).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 180 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE MONTHLY OPERATING REPORTS FOR AUGUST 2023. filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 20, 2023 Filing 179 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#165) Notice Date 09/20/2023. (Admin.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 178 Motion requesting entry of order MOTION FOR SHORT EXTENSION OF (1) THE INTERIM USE OF CASH COLLATERAL ORDER AT DOCKET NO. 92 WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PREPETITION FIRST LIEN SECURED PARTIES (related document(s): #76) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CASH COLLATERAL BUDGET #2 Exhibit B PROPOSED ORDER #3 Exhibit C DECLARATION OF RESTRUCTURING OFFICER IN SUPPORT OF URGENT MOTION FOR CASH COLLATERAL) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 20, 2023 Filing 177 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION / MODIFICATION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES AND AUCTION DATE / LOCATION (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 20, 2023 Filing 176 Objection to /CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO LIMITED OBJECTION TO SALE OF BAYAMON REAL ESTATE PROPERTY AND JOINDER OF AAFAFS, CRIMS AND UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#154, #156, #166, #174). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/20/2023. Order due by 10/3/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #53, #62, #105, #173).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER APPROVING ENTRY INTO THE BAYAMON STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS SUBJECT TO BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed on 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#169).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 173 Motion requesting extension of time( 14 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEMNT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE AT DOCKET NO. 125. (related document(s):#105) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER AND NOTICE: The Motion to Reschedule the September 20th 2023 Sale Hearing the Fajardo Assets for September 28th 2023 (the Motion, dkt. #211) filed on September 18, 2023, by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc. and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as Grupo HIMA or Debtors)1 is hereby granted. The sale hearing scheduled for September 20, 2023, at 4:00 PM (see dkt. #83), is hereby continued for September 28, 2023, at 10:00 AM at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. Further, all matters already scheduled in these cases for September 28, 2023, at 3:00 PM (dkt. #170), are hereby rescheduled and will be jointly heard on September 28, 2023, at 10:00AM. (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS). Signed on 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#167).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/19/2023. Order due by 9/25/2023. (RE: related document(s)#154, #156, #168).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension of certain sale-related deadlines on properties (other than Fajardo Properties) filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#161).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 19, 2023 Filing 169 Motion requesting entry of order -Debtors' Supplemental Motion for Approving the Bayamon Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections as Ordered in the Bidding Procedures Order Entered on August 23, 2023 (related document(s): #67) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Bayamon Hospital - Asset Purchase Agreement #2 Exhibit B Proposed Order for Designation of Bayamon Stalking Horse Bid) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 18, 2023 Filing 168 Motion requesting extension of time( 7 days) TO FILE POSITION TO THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY CRIM; AFFAF AND UNITED STATES. (related document(s):#154, #156) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
September 18, 2023 Filing 167 Motion requesting continuance of hearing THE SEPTEMBER 20TH 2023 SALE HEARING THE FAJARDO ASSETS FOR SEPTEMBER 28TH 2023 (related document(s):#67) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 18, 2023 Filing 166 Objection to /LIMITED OBJECTION TO POTENTIAL SALE OF BAYAMON REAL PROPERTY AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS/ Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (RE: related document(s)#67). (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (INVESTMENT CONSULTANT). Signed on 9/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#98).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 17, 2023 Filing 164 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#160) Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
September 15, 2023 Filing 163 Motion submitting document(s): DEBTORS MOTION SUBMITING (1) REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#76). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 15, 2023 Filing 162 Motion to inform THE SUCCESSFUL BIDDER FOR THE FAJARDO ASSETS PURSUANT THE BIDDING PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED ON AUGUST 23, 2023 (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 15, 2023 Filing 161 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES ON PROPERTIES (OTHER THAN FAJARDO PROPERTIES) (RE: related document(s)#54, #67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for entry of order (I) authorizing the debtors to (a) pay their obligations under insurance policies even for retroactive prepetition coverage, (b) renew, supplement, modify, or purchase insurance coverage, and (II) granting related relief. Signed on 9/15/2023. (RE: related document(s)#88, #95).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 15, 2023 Filing 159 Certificate of service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC (RE: related document(s)#134).(Garabato, Sid)
September 15, 2023 Filing 158 Certificate of service filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC (RE: related document(s)#108).(Garabato, Sid)
September 13, 2023 Filing 157 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#155) Notice Date 09/13/2023. (Admin.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 156 Response to (AAFAFS LIMITED RESPONSE): (I) IN SUPPORT OF THE SALE OF THE DEBTORS OPERATIONS AS A GOING CONCERN; AND (II) OBJECTING SOLELY TO THE PROPOSED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SALE PROCEEDS OUTSIDE OF A PLAN AND WITHOUT A BENEFIT TO OTHER CREDITORS AND THE ESTATE Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#67). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: This case is before the court upon the Opposition to Debtor(s) Asset Purchase Agreement to Sell Properties Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. 363(f) (Docket Entry #183) filed by Municipal Revenue Collection Center (CRIM). The Debtor(s) shall file a reply to the Opposition to Debtor(s) Asset Purchase Agreement within seven (7) days. Signed on 9/11/2023. Order due by 9/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#154).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 11, 2023 Filing 154 Opposition to Asset Purchase Agreement at ECF 52 Filed by FERNANDO VAN DERDYS on behalf of CRIM (RE: related document(s)#54). (VAN DERDYS, FERNANDO)
September 10, 2023 Filing 153 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#142) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 152 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#144) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 151 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#143) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 10, 2023 Filing 150 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#143) Notice Date 09/10/2023. (Admin.)
September 9, 2023 Filing 149 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#137) Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
September 9, 2023 Filing 148 Motion submitting document(s): DEBTORS MOTION SUBMITING (1) REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#76). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 8, 2023 Filing 147 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#136) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Filing 146 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#135) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Filing 145 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#133) Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (REAL ESTATE BROKER). Signed on 9/8/2023. (RE: related document(s)#129).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER AND NOTICE: The motion requesting entry of Order filed Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors), (Docket #139) is hereby granted. A hearing on the sale of properties (except for Fajardo Properties) is hereby scheduled for 9/28/2023 at 03:00 PM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#139).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: The motion to inform notice of extension of certain sale-related deadlines filed by Grupo HIMA San Pablo, Inc., and its affiliated entities in the above captioned cases (collectively referred to as HIMA San Pablo Cases or Debtors)1, (docket #130) is hereby granted. The information is noted. Signed on 9/8/2023. (RE: related document(s)#130).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
September 8, 2023 Filing 141 Appellant Designation and Statement of Issues on Appeal. BK Appeal No: 23-01439 filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC. (objection language due by 09/22/2023). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
September 8, 2023 Filing 140 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by BEATRIZ HERNANDEZ TORO on behalf of UNIVERSAL CARE CORPORATION. (HERNANDEZ TORO, BEATRIZ)
September 8, 2023 Filing 139 Motion requesting entry of order -NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES EXCEPT FOR THE FAJARDO PROPERTIES AND REQUEST FOR ORDER ON SALE HEARING IN NON-FAJARDO ASSETS (related document(s): #67) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 7, 2023 Filing 138 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#128) Notice Date 09/07/2023. (Admin.)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 9/7/2023. Order due by 9/19/2023. (RE: related document(s)#12, #105, #131).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (SPECIAL COUNSEL) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#14).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (FINANCIAL CONSULTANT) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#13).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Filing 134 Motion to inform Notice of Hybrid 341 Meeting of Creditors (In person/Phone). Filed by US TRUSTEE (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL (DEBTOR'S ATTORNEY) Signed on 9/6/2023. (RE: related document(s)#3).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
September 6, 2023 Filing 132 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by FRANCISCO J RAMOS MARTINEZ on behalf of Municipio de Fajardo. (RAMOS MARTINEZ, FRANCISCO)
September 5, 2023 Filing 131 Motion for Leave to File , in addition to Motion requesting extension of time( 14 days) TO REPLY OR SUPPLEMENT ANKURA APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYMENT PER THE OBJECTION OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (related document(s):#105) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 5, 2023 Filing 130 Motion to inform NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SALE-RELATED DEADLINES (RE: related document(s)#67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 5, 2023 Filing 129 Application to employ REAL ESTATE BROKER, HILCO REAL ESTATE, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A Services Agreement #3 Exhibit B Certificate of proposed #4 Exhibit C Curriculum vitae) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
September 5, 2023 Filing 128 MINUTES OF HEARING HELD ON AUGUST 23, 2023. (PLEASE READ FULL MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#9, #19, #24, #29, #45, #49, #56, #59).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
September 2, 2023 Filing 127 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#115) Notice Date 09/02/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 126 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#106) Notice Date 09/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 125 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#107) Notice Date 09/01/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 124 Motion submitting document(s): DEBTORS MOTION SUBMITING (1) REPORT OF EXPENSES AND (2) WEEKLY BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#76). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
September 1, 2023 Filing 123 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#54, #67). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Publication 8-31-2023) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 31, 2023 Filing 122 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#102) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 121 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#101) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 120 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#91) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 119 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#97) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 118 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#95) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 117 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#91) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 116 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by HECTOR E. PEDROSA on behalf of Eastern Health, LLC. (PEDROSA, HECTOR)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order Granting Motion Signed on 8/31/2023. (RE: related document(s)#93, #110).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 30, 2023 Filing 114 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#89) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 113 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#90) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 112 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#89) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 111 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#86) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 110 Motion requesting extension of time( No Less Than Two (2) Business days) After the Mediation Report is Filed/ Debtors Motion to Inform Intent to Oppose Request for Stay Pending Appeal at Docket No. 113 and. (related document(s):#93) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 30, 2023 Filing 109 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual with Schedules and, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 30, 2023 Filing 108 Amended Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/6/2023 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 12/5/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 1/4/2024. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/26/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The court will hold in abeyance ruling on the urgent motion for stay pending appeal, and the motion for reconsideration, until a mediation report is filed. (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS). Signed on 8/30/2023. (RE: related document(s)#93, #94, #99, #103).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Signed on 8/30/2023. (RE: related document(s)#100).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 105 Trustee's Objection to Debtors Expedited Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Retention Of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC and (B) Designation of Stephen Marotta as Chief Restructuring Officer, Russell Perry as Restructuring Officer and Robert Weigel as Assistant Treasurer Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date; and (II) Granting Related Relief (RE: related document(s) #12). filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
August 29, 2023 Filing 104 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#92). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 103 Response to (AAFAFS RESPONSE) TO DEBTORS URGENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING DEBTORS DIP FINANCING AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#94). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 29, 2023 Filing 102 INTERIM ORDER (I) APPROVING THE DEBTORS PROPOSED ADEQUATE ASSURANCE DEPOSIT, FOR FUTURE UTILITY SERVICES, (II) PROHIBITING UTILITY PROVIDERS FROM ALTERING, REFUSING, OR DISCONTINUING, (III) APPROVING THE DEBTORS PROPOSED PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING ADEQUATE ASSURANCE REQUESTS, AND (IV) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 8/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#8, #28).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING URGENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (A) PAY PREPETITION EMPLOYEE WAGES, SALARIES, OTHER COMPENSATION, AND REIMBURSABLE EXPENSES AND (B) CONTINUE EMPLOYEE BENEFITS PROGRAMS AND (II) AUTHORIZING BANKS AND FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO PAY ALL CHECKS AND ELECTRONIC PAYMENT REQUESTS RELATING TO THE FOREGOING, (III) SCHEDULE A HEARING AND (IV) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 8/29/2023. (RE: related document(s)#7, #28).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 29, 2023 Filing 100 Motion requesting time ( 1 days) to file schedules and statement of affairs. filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 29, 2023 Filing 99 Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration Filed by FERNANDO VAN DERDYS on behalf of CRIM (RE: related document(s)#94). (VAN DERDYS, FERNANDO)
August 29, 2023 Filing 98 Application to employ Investment Consultant, IEC Consulting, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A lEC_Engagement_Letter #2 Exhibit B Certified Proposed IEC #3 Exhibit C CurriculumVitae) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 29, 2023 Filing 97 AMENDED STANDING MEDIATION ORDER: The mediation will take place on Thursday, August 31, 2023 at 3:00 P.M. at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jose V. Toledo Courthouse, Courtroom 3, 300 Recinto Sur Street, San Juan, Puerto Rico. Signed on 8/29/2023.(Colon, Tatiana)
August 29, 2023 Filing 96 Acknowledgment of Appeal by District Court. . District Court Case No: 23-01439 (RE: related document(s)#89) (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Parties in interest to state their position within 11 days as to Debtor(s) urgent motion for entry of order (I) authorizing the debtors to (a) pay their obligations under insurance policies even for retroactive prepetition coverage, (b) renew, supplement, modify, or purchase insurance coverage, and (II) granting related relief filed on August 28, 2023. Signed on 8/29/2023. Order due by 9/11/2023. (RE: related document(s)#88).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 94 Urgent motion (related document(s):#75), in addition to Motion for Reconsideration DEBTORS URGENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER AT DOCKET NO. 91 DENYING DEBTORS DIP AND CASH COLLATERAL MOTION (DKT. 9, 21 & 66) AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING (related document(s):#75) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A CFO Sworn Declaration #2 Exhibit B ASES Preliminary Report #3 Exhibit C Audited Consolidated Financial Statements 2021 #4 Exhibit D Consolidated Financial Statements December 2022 #5 Exhibit E Consolidated Financial Statements June 2023 #6 Exhibit F = Amended Credit Agreement #7 Exhibit G AR Aging July 2023 #8 Exhibit H Real Property) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 28, 2023 Filing 93 Urgent motion for Stay Pending Appeal (related document(s):#76) filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 28, 2023 Filing 92 Motion to inform NOTICE OF (I) POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES AND (II) CURE AMOUNTS (RE: related document(s)#54, #67). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 91 STANDING MEDIATION ORDER. The mediation will take place on Wednesday, August 30, 2023 at 9:00 A.M. at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jose V. Toledo Courthouse, Courtroom 3, 300 Recinto Sur Street, San Juan, Puerto Rico. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#90).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
August 28, 2023 Filing 90 MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#83).(HERNANDEZ ALEJANDRO, CYBELLE)
August 28, 2023 Filing 89 Transmittal Form to District Court (RE: related document(s)#76, #79) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 88 Urgent motion of the Debtors for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Their Obligations Under Insurance Policies Even for Retroactive Prepetition Coverage, (B) Renew, Supplement, Modify, or Purchase Insurance Coverage, and (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s):#76) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 28, 2023 Filing 87 BNC Notice (RE: related document(s)#79) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order Granting Motion to allow Atara Miller to appear pro hac vice. Signed on 8/28/2023. (RE: related document(s)#74).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 27, 2023 Filing 85 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#76) Notice Date 08/27/2023. (Admin.)
August 27, 2023 Filing 84 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#75) Notice Date 08/27/2023. (Admin.)
August 27, 2023 Filing 83 Urgent motion FOR MEDIATION ORDER AS TO DEBTORS REQUEST FOR POST-PETITION FINANCING (related document(s):#9) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 26, 2023 Filing 82 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#67) Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
August 26, 2023 Filing 81 Addendum to Record on Appeal Supplemental Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC (RE: related document(s)#79). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 26, 2023 Filing 80 Receipt of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election(# 23-02521-ESL11) [appeal,ntcaplel] ( 298.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16405636, amount $ 298.00. (RE: related document(s) #79) (U.S. Treasury)
August 26, 2023 Filing 79 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court. Fee Amount $298. Due by 09/11/2023. filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC (RE: related document(s)#76). (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 25, 2023 Filing 78 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#66) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 77 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#61) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 24, 2023 Filing 76 CASH COLLATERAL ORDER. Signed on 8/24/2023. (ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 24, 2023 Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons stated herein, the Debtors DIP and Cash Collateral Motion (dkt. #21), as supplemented and amended (dkt. #66) is hereby denied.Signed on 8/24/2023. (See Order for details) Order due by 9/7/2023. (RE: related document(s)21, 66). (RE: related document(s)#19, #56).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 24, 2023 Filing 74 Motion to allow Atara Miller to appear pro hac vice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 23, 2023 Filing 73 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#51) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 72 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#50) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 71 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#52) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 70 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#49) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 69 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#48) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 68 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/23/2023 02:31:53 PM]. File Size [ 41755 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:59:01 ]. (admin).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER (I) APPROVING (A) ENTRY INTO THE FAJARDO STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS AND (B) BIDDING PROCEDURES AND THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF, (II) SCHEDULING THE SALE HEARING, (III) ESTABLISHING ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT PROCEDURES AND APPROVING THE MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF AND (IV) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF. Signed on 8/23/2023. (RE: related document(s)#54).(Jaime, Wilma)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Signed on 8/23/2023. Hearing scheduled 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. (RE: related document(s)#1).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 65 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#45, #49). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 64 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#48, #50, #51, #52, #53). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 63 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#3, #4, #5, #6, #7, #8, #9, #11, #12, #14, #19, #32, #33, #36, #38). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 23, 2023 Filing 62 Motion submitting document(s):Debtors' Supplement to Retention of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#53, 57 ). (Attachments: #1 Annex 1) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 22, 2023 Filing 61 MINUTES AND ORDER OF HEARING HELD ON AUGUST 18, 2023. (PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Re: related document(s)#4, #5, #6, #11).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 60 Notice of appearance and request for notice. Filed by CARMEN D CONDE TORRES on behalf of CONSEJO DE TITULARES TORRE SAN PABLO (CONDE TORRES, CARMEN)
August 22, 2023 Filing 59 Trustee's Objection to Debtors Urgent Motion Requesting an Interim and Final Order: (a) Granting Authorization to Obtain Postpetition Financing; (b) Authorization to Use Cash Collateral; (c) Granting Liens and Providing Super Priority Administrative Expense Claims; (d) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties; (e) Modifying the Automatic Stay; and (f) Scheduling a Final Hearing and Granting Related Relief (RE: related document(s) #9, #19). filed by JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (GUZMAN CARCACHE, JULIO)
August 22, 2023 Filing 58 Motion to inform Reiterating Position of the Government Entities as to Urgent Motion for Entry of Interim Order to Approve Postpetition Debtor in Possession Financing and Related Relief, As Supplemented (RE: related document(s)#29, #49). Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 22, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF does not include motion. Party must re-file correctly. (RE: related document(s)#53) (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Filing 56 Motion submitting document(s):SUPPLEMENT / AMENDMENT TO DIP FINANCING AND CONSENTED USE OF CASH COLLATERAL AT DOCKET NO. 9 & 19 (RE: related document(s)#9, #19). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Interim DIP Order #2 Exhibit B Redlined Proposed Order #3 Exhibit C Real Property and Crim Debt Detail #4 Exhibit D - Accounts Receivable and Aging Report #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Armando Rodrguez) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 21, 2023 Filing 55 Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens(# 23-02521-ESL11) [motion,msell] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16398595, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #54) (U.S. Treasury)
August 21, 2023 Filing 54 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) . Fee Amount $188, in addition to Motion requesting entry of order DEBTORS MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) APPROVING (A) ENTRY INTO THE FAJARDO STALKING HORSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED BID PROTECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Bidding_Procedures_Order #2 Exhibit 1 Bidding Procedures #3 Exhibit 2 Sale Notice #4 Exhibit 3 Fajardo Stalking Horse APA #5 Exhibit 4 Assumption and Assignment Notice #6 Exhibit Assets Purchase Agreement #7 Exhibit Proposed Order Approving Purchase and Sale Agreements) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 21, 2023 Filing 53 Motion submitting document(s):Debtors' Supplement to Retention of Ankura Consulting Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12). (Attachments: #1 Annex 1) Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Authorizing employment and payment of EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC, as notice and claims agent, nunc pro tunc to the petition date. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#11).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Interim Order (I) authorizing the debtors to continue use of its existing bank accounts; (II) waiving compliance with investment guidelines under 11 U.S.C. 345(b); (III) authorizing the use of cash management system; (IV) honor certain prepetition obligations related thereto; (V) maintain existing business forms; (VI) continue performing and granting administrative priority for intercompany transactions, and (VII) granting related relief. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Interim Order Authorizing Debtors to file Consolidated List of Creditors. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Hearing scheduled 8/23/2023 at 02:30 PM at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 2. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice 22-29. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Joint Administration of Chapter 11 cases. Signed on 8/21/2023. (RE: related document(s)#4).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 20, 2023 Filing 47 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#38) Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.)
August 20, 2023 Filing 46 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#35) Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.)
August 20, 2023 Filing 45 Urgent motion (related document(s):#9, #19, #28), in addition to Motion requesting entry of order URGENT MOTION REQUESTING SCHEDULING ORDER FOR AUGUST 23, 2023 WITH EXPEDITED DEADLINES RELATED TO DIP FINANCING AND USE OF CASH COLLATERAL (related document(s): #9, #19, #28) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 19, 2023 Filing 44 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#30) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 19, 2023 Filing 43 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#28) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 19, 2023 Filing 42 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#24) Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 41 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#20) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 40 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#16) Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 39 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/18/2023 09:50:09 AM]. File Size [ 67148 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:23:28 ]. (admin).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER:Granting Motion for Interim Use of Cash Collateral. Signed on 8/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#36).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 18, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#10, #24, #28). Filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 36 Motion submitting document(s):Supplement to Motion for Interim Use of Cash Collateral Unit August 23, 2023, with Reduced Budget for Immediate Necessary Expenses with Attached Proposed Consent Order Agreed with First Lien Secured Lender with Proposal of Adequate Protection (RE: related document(s)#32, #33). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Interim Order Cash Collateral #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Budget) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Motion to allow Matthew Brod to appear pro hac vice. Signed on 8/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#31).(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 34 Objection to Debtors' Request for the Use of Cash Collateral and Demand for Adequate Protection Filed by GABRIEL MIRANDA RIVERA, HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC (RE: related document(s)#32, #33). (BAUER ALVAREZ, HERMANN)
August 17, 2023 Filing 33 Motion submitting document(s):MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENT TO CASH COLLATERAL MOTION WITH DECLARATION AND BUDGET (RE: related document(s)#32). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DECLARATION OF FINANCIAL CONSULTANT IN SUPPORT OF URGENT MOTION FOR EMERGENCY USE OF CASH COLLATERAL #2 Exhibit C- PROPOSED BUDGET) Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)
August 17, 2023 Filing 32 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (1) ON AN INTERIM BASIS AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN (2) ENTRY OF AN EMERGENCY SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING FOR THE RELATED RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 17, 2023 Filing 31 Motion to allow Matthew Brod to appear pro hac vice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC [ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN]
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: If any of the entities listed below should file a notice of appearance, I disqualify myself from presiding in any contested matter wherein the above referenced entities are a party pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5004(a). Should any contested matter relating to any of these entities become relevant to the outcome of the case, I will disqualify myself from presiding over the case. At this time, there are no pending contested matters concerning the entities referenced herein. Referenced entities: Abbott Laboratories PR Inc, Abbott Medical PR LLC, Abbott Optical, American Paper, Costco Wholesale, Home Depot,Microsoft Licensing GP, United Surety & Indemnity Co.,Chase Visa,Walmart.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 8/17/2023. (RE: related document(s)#1).(ZAYAS BOUJOUEN, DARHMA)
August 17, 2023 Filing 29 Response to and Preliminary Objection to Urgent Motion for Entry of Interim Order to Approve Postpetition Debtor in Possession Financing and Related Relief Filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES, CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO, LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY (RE: related document(s)#9, #19). (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 28 SECOND ORDER AND NOTICE ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Objections, if any, to the First Day Motions listed above shall be filed on or before August 28, 2023 (the Objection Deadline). A hearing on the approval of the First Day Motions listed above and any timely objections filed thereto is scheduled for September 1, 2023, at 10:00 AM (the First Day Motions Hearing) at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice22-29. (Order due by 8/28/2023). (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by IGNACIO LABARCA MORALES on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (LABARCA MORALES, IGNACIO)
August 17, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by CAROLINA VELAZ RIVERO on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (VELAZ RIVERO, CAROLINA)
August 17, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by LUIS C MARINI BIAGGI on behalf of PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY. (MARINI BIAGGI, LUIS)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ESTABLISHING RESPONSE DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING HEARINGS TO CONSIDER FIRST DAY MOTIONS: Objections, if any, to the First Day Motions listed above shall be filed on or before TODAY, August 17, 2023, at 5:00 PM (the Objection deadline). A hearing on the approval of the First Day Motions listed above and any timely objections filed thereto is scheduled for tomorrow, August 18, 2023, at 9:30 AM (the First Day Motions Hearing) at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 2, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. If no objections are timely filed on or before the Objection Deadline, the Court may enter, at its discretion, an interim order granting the pertinent First Day Motions in an interim basis, vacating the First Day Motions Hearing. The Court will allow for parties that are in different jurisdictions to participate via Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing. All parties that wish to appear via Microsoft Teams must familiarize themselves and follow the Procedures for Remote Appearances, found on the homepage of our Website at https:\\www.prb.uscourts.gov. See Notice 22-29. (RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by NAYUAN ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD on behalf of Alter Domus (US) LLC. (ZOUAIRABANI TRINIDAD, NAYUAN)
August 17, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by GABRIEL MIRANDA RIVERA on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC. (MIRANDA RIVERA, GABRIEL)
August 17, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by HERMANN D BAUER ALVAREZ on behalf of Island Healthcare, LLC. (BAUER ALVAREZ, HERMANN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 20 Notice Reassigning Case to Judge Enrique S. Lamoutte (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 19 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Amended), Motion for Post Petition Credit To Obtain Postpetition Financing Authorizing the Debtors, Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Other Remedies Related Docket No. 9 filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: I hereby disqualify myself from this case. The Clerk shall reassign this case to another judge. Signed on 8/16/2023.(FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Docket entry does not include pdf document. (RE: related document(s) 15 ) (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 16 Amended Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/22/2023 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/21/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 12/21/2023. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/12/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/22/2023 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/21/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 12/21/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 2/12/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 Application to employ SPECIAL COUNSEL, PIETRANTONI MNDEZ & ALVAREZ LLC Docket 14-Application to employ SPECIAL COUNSEL, PIETRANTONI MNDEZ & ALVAREZ LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Statement Special Counsel #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae #3 Exhibit C - PMA Bankruptcy Engagement (Final)) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 Application to employ FINANCIAL CONSULTANT CPA, Luis R. Carrasquillo & Co., P.S.C. (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Financial Consultant #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 Application to employ CHIEF RESTRUCTURING OFFICERS AND OTHERS, ANKURA CONSULTING GROUP, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Engagement #2 Exhibit B - Marotta Declaration #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Retention_Order) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 Application to employ Notice Agent, EPIQ Corporate Restructuring LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Epiq Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Epiq Engagement Service signed #3 Exhibit C - Services and Declaration) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 Urgent motion Requesting Scheduling Order with Expedite Deadlines Related to First Day Motions (related document(s):#1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion for Post Petition Credit To Obtain Postpetition Financing Authorizing the Debtors,, Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Other Remedies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interim DIP Order #2 Schedule 1 - DIP Credit Agreement #3 Schedule 1.2 - Annex 1-2 #4 Schedule 1.3 - Schedules 6.2 -6.17- #5 Schedule 1.4 - DIP Credit Agreement - Exhibits #6 Schedule 2 Initial DIP Budget_20230815_Filing #7 Exhibit B - Intercreditor_Agreement to file #8 Exhibit C - 08-14-2023 Adequate Protection Analysis for DIP #9 Exhibit D - First Day Declaration Armando Rodriguez #10 Exhibit E - Marotta Declaration FINAL WITH MMM Funding) filed by ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [BETANCOURT VINCENTY, ALEXIS]
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Prohibiting Discontinuing Utilities, Deeming Utilities to Have Adequate Assurance and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Utilities_Interim_Order #2 Exhibit B -Utility_Avareage) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 7 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interim Order Prepetition Wages #2 Exhibit B Final Order Prepetition Wages #3 Exhibit C - Salaries Adjusted - Total) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 6 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Continue Using Existing Bank Accounts, Cash Management System and Other Remedies (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Interim Order on Cash management- Interim #2 Exhibit I Cash Accounts #3 Exhibit II Cash Accounts) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting entry of order Authorizing the Debtors to File Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor (related document(s): #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order Consolidated Matrix) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions , Motion requesting administrative consolidation with case no as detailed in motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order Joint Administration) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 Application to employ Attorney for Debtor, Lugo Mender Group, LLC (with 14 day objection language) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Verified_Statement_of_Proposed_Attorney_LMG #2 Exhibit B CV Wigberto Lugo Mender #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order for App Employment LMG) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. [LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO]
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02521-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16389386, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 plan due by 12/13/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2023.. Filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC. (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO)

Search for this case: JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: JOCAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY
Represented By: WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: JOCAR ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: ALEXIS A BETANCOURT VINCENTY
Represented By: WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JULIO GUZMAN CARCACHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Epiq Corporate Restructuring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: FRANCISCO E COLON RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?