GAFC SERVICES LLC
Debtor: GAFC SERVICES, LLC and GAFC SERVICES LLC
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE
Case Number: 3:2023bk02567
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: MILDRED CABAN FLORES
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 43 Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS OR CONVERT Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES LLC (RE: related document(s)#31). (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
October 12, 2023 Filing 42 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#39). Filed by EMILY DARICE DAVILA RIVERA on behalf of VICTOR MANUEL GARCIA PEREZ (DAVILA RIVERA, EMILY)
October 12, 2023 Filing 41 362 Summons Issued. Respondent must file an answer to the motion within 14 days from service of this notice. (RE: related document(s)#39) (ROMO, JOSE)
October 11, 2023 Filing 40 Receipt of Relief From Stay Under 362(# 23-02567-MCF11) [motion,m362] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16485378, amount $ 188.00. (RE: related document(s) #39) (U.S. Treasury)
October 11, 2023 Filing 39 Motion for Relief From Stay Under 362 [e]. Filing fee: $ 188 Collateral: COMMERCIAL BUILDING. Post Petition Arrears: 1,187791.63. Hearing scheduled 11/7/2023 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE RELIEF FROM STAY) filed by EMILY DARICE DAVILA RIVERA on behalf of VICTOR MANUEL GARCIA PEREZ [DAVILA RIVERA, EMILY]
October 8, 2023 Filing 38 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#34) Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
October 8, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#33) Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
October 7, 2023 Filing 36 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#30) Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 35 Motion to inform (RE: related document(s)#27). Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
October 6, 2023 Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE: On October 5, 2023, VICTOR MANUEL GARCIA PEREZ filed a Motion to Dismiss or Convert Under 11 U.S.C. 1112(b). Objection to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order. Failure to file a timely objection may result in the entering of an order dismissing or converting the case without further notice or hearing. If a timely objection is filed, a hearing will be held on November 1, 2023, at 9:00 AM, at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 1, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. (REFER TO THE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (RE: related document(s)#31, #33). Signed on 10/6/2023.(BUJOSA BERMUDEZ, EDUARDO)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AND NOTICE: On October 5, 2023, Victor Manuel Garcia Perez filed a Motion to Dismiss or Convert Under 11 U.S.C. 1112(b). Objection to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order. Failure to file a timely objection may result in the entering of an order dismissing or converting the case without further notice or hearing. If a timely objection is filed, a hearing will be held on November 2, 2023, at 9:00 AM before the undersigned, at the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Jos V. Toledo Post Office & Courthouse Bldg., Courtroom 1, Floor 2, 300 Recinto Sur, Old San Juan, Puerto Rico. (REFER TO THE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (RE: related document(s)#31). Signed on 10/6/2023.(BUJOSA BERMUDEZ, EDUARDO)
October 5, 2023 Filing 32 Receipt of Dismissal Or Conversion From Chapter 11 To Chapter 7(# 23-02567-MCF11) [motion,dsmcnv11] ( 15.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16477694, amount $ 15.00. (RE: related document(s) #31) (U.S. Treasury)
October 5, 2023 Filing 31 Motion requesting dismissal or conversion from chapter 11 to chapter 7 (30 day objection language), With Declaration Under Servicemember Civil Relief Act of 2003, ( Filing fee: $ 15, ) filed by EMILY DARICE DAVILA RIVERA on behalf of VICTOR MANUEL GARCIA PEREZ [DAVILA RIVERA, EMILY]
October 4, 2023 Filing 30 Minutes of Proceedings. Debtor stands on the status report (Docket No. 25). This is a regular small business case. ORDER: The status report (Docket No. 25) is approved. Consequently, the Debtor is ordered to file the disclosure statement and plan on or before January 19, 2024. Once the disclosure statement and plan are filed, the Clerk will schedule the hearing on final approval of the disclosure statement and confirmation of the plan. The Clerk is to follow. The Debtor is ordered to amend the voluntary petition, within ten (10) days, to specify that this is a regular small business case. Objections to claims must be filed no less than forty-five (45) days prior to the hearing on confirmation. Debtor will include in its objection to claim a notice that if no response to the objection is filed within thirty (30) days, the motion will be considered and decided without the actual hearing. If a written response or opposition to the objection to claim is timely filed, the contested matter will be heard on the date that the hearing on confirmation has been scheduled. (Re: related document(s)#25).(BUJOSA BERMUDEZ, EDUARDO)
October 4, 2023 Filing 29 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [10/04/2023 09:07:26 AM]. File Size [ 1983 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:17 ]. (admin).
October 4, 2023 Filing 28 Amended Voluntary Petition To CLARIFY THAT DEBTOR IS A SMALL BUSINESS DEBTOR. Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
October 3, 2023 Filing 27 Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
September 23, 2023 Filing 26 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#24) Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
September 23, 2023 Filing 25 Status Report on Chapter 11 Case (RE: related document(s)#4). Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Debtor is ordered to comply on or before September 26, 2023, with the court's order at Docket No. 4. Order due by 9/26/2023. (RE: related document(s)#4). Signed on 9/21/2023.(AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
September 20, 2023 Filing 23 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#18) Notice Date 09/20/2023. (Admin.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 22 Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual . Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
September 20, 2023 Filing 21 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2023. Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
September 19, 2023 Filing 20 Minutes of 341 meeting continued: (Rescheduled per Debtor's unavailability/request) 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/3/2023 at 01:30 PM via 341 MEETING ROOM, OCHOA BUILDING, 500 TANCA STREET, FIRST FLOOR, SAN JUAN. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
September 18, 2023 Filing 19 Minutes of 341 meeting continued: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/25/2023 at 01:30 PM via 341 MEETING ROOM, OCHOA BUILDING, 500 TANCA STREET, FIRST FLOOR, SAN JUAN. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF FINANCIAL ADVISOR (CPA, CATHERINE RODRIGUEZ ROMAN) (RE: related document(s)#13). Signed on 9/18/2023.(AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
September 15, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#16) Notice Date 09/15/2023. (Admin.)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF ATTORNEY (JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO) (RE: related document(s)#9). Signed on 9/13/2023.(AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
September 12, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by EMILY DARICE DAVILA RIVERA on behalf of VICTOR MANUEL GARCIA PEREZ. (DAVILA RIVERA, EMILY)
August 31, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#12) Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 Application to employ CPA, CATHERINE RODRIGUEZ ROMAN (with 14 day objection language) filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC [HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING (RE: related document(s)#11). Signed on 8/29/2023.(AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA)
August 25, 2023 Filing 11 Motion requesting entry of order FOR THE USE OF WEB CASH, ATM CARD, AND ACH TRANSACTIONS filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC [HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE]
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 Motion to withdraw MOTION TO EMPLOYMENT, DOCKET # 8 (related document(s): #8) filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC [HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE] Modified on 8/28/2023 (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA).
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 Application to employ ATTORNEY, JACQUELINE HERNNADEZ SANTIAGO (with 14 day objection language) filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC [HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE]
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 Application to employ ATTORNEY, JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO (with 14 day objection language) filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC [HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE]
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#4) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#3) Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
August 21, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE RESOLUTION. Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled for 10/4/2023 at 09:00 AM, at JOSE V TOLEDO FED BLDG & US COURTHOUSE, 300 RECINTO SUR, 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM 1. Pre-Status Report Due By 9/20/2023. (REFER TO THE PDF FOR DETAILS). Signed on 8/21/2023.(BUJOSA BERMUDEZ, EDUARDO)
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/18/2023 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/17/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 12/18/2023. Government Proofs of Claim due by 2/20/2024. (REYES TORO, WILLIAM)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02567-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16395640, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual with Schedules, with Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, with Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $275 Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 plan due by 12/18/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2023.. Filed by JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO on behalf of GAFC SERVICES, LLC (HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO, JACQUELINE)

Search for this case: GAFC SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: GAFC SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: GAFC SERVICES LLC
Represented By: JACQUELINE HERNANDEZ SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?