NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P.
Debtor: NEW MEDICAL, EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P. and NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P.
Trustee: ROBERTO SANTOS RAMOS
Us Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Case Number: 3:2023bk02588
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: EDWARD A GODOY
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Bankruptcy Case Closed (ROSADO LOZA, CARMINA)
September 27, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#15) Notice Date 09/27/2023. (Admin.)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 11 CASE UPON VOLUNTARY REQUEST. (RE: related document(s)#12). Signed on 9/25/2023.(ROSADO LOZA, CARMINA)
September 17, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#13) Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF ATTORNEY (RE: related document(s)#6). Signed on 9/15/2023.(ROSADO LOZA, CARMINA)
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 Motion requesting voluntary dismissal filed by GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY on behalf of NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P. [JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY, GLORIA]
September 3, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#10) Notice Date 09/03/2023. (Admin.)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing rescheduled to 11/1/2023 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Pre-Status Report Due By 10/18/2023. (RE: related document(s)#7). Signed on 9/1/2023.(FIGUEROA, CARMEN)
August 26, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#7) Notice Date 08/26/2023. (Admin.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of service (RE: related document(s)#4) Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Hearing scheduled 10/18/2023 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Pre-Status Report Due By 10/4/2023. Signed on 8/23/2023.(ROSADO LOZA, CARMINA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 Application to employ ATTORNEY (with 14 day objection language) filed by GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY on behalf of NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P. [JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY, GLORIA]
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Roberto Santos Ramos (RE: related document(s) #1, #4 ). filed by US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 First Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Sub-Chapter V Trustee: ROBERTO SANTOS RAMOS is appointed trustee to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/29/2023 at 10:30 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/28/2023. Proof of Claims due by 10/31/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 2/20/2024. filed by US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 (LECAROZ ARRIBAS, MONSITA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE RESOLUTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Index) Filed by GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY on behalf of NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P. (JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY, GLORIA)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(# 23-02588-11) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16399242, amount $1738.00. (RE: related document(s) #1) (U.S. Treasury)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Subchapter V Individual WithOUT Schedules, WithOUT Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, WithOUT Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $6000 Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 11/20/2023.. Filed by GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY on behalf of NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P. (JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY, GLORIA)

Search for this case: NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: NEW MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: NEW MEDICAL AND EDUCATION SERVICES INC.C.S.P.
Represented By: GLORIA JUSTINIANO IRIZARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: ROBERTO SANTOS RAMOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?