Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc. et al v. Ramirez et al
Plaintiff: Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc. and Suiza Dairy, Inc.
Defendant: Luis Rivera-Cubano, Juan R. Pedro-Gordian, Salvador Ramirez, Gabriel Figueroa-Herrera, Javier Rivera-Aquino and Cyndia E. Irrizary
Intervenor_defendant: Indulac, Inc. and Asociacion de Ganaderos Sector de la Leche
Amicus: Ombudsman Office and Ganaderos Unidos de la Industria de Lechera, Inc.
Intervenor: Camara de Mercadeo Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos (MIDA), Empresas A. Cordero Badillo, Inc., Cadena de Supermercados Econo ("Econo") and Cadenas de Supermercados Selectos
Intervenor_plaintiff: Centro Unido de Detallistas Inc.
Consol_plaintiff: Puerto Rico Dairy Farmers Association
Case Number: 3:2004cv01840
Filed: August 13, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Daniel R. Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2015 OMNIBUS ORDER finding as moot 1784 Motion for TRO; finding as moot 1807 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 1810 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot 1811 Motion for Contempt; denying 1857 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 1857 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 1857 Motion to Set Aside. See Omnibus Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/5/2011. (JAM)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1791 . See Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/27/2010.(JAM)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1791 ORDER re 1784 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Puerto Rico Dairy Farmers Association. An Evidentiary Hearing is set for January 12, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Set Hearings Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez.Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/21/2010.(JAM)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 ORDER denying 1722 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/13/2010. (JAM)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1721 ORDER. See Order for further details. The Clerk shall close the following motions: Docket entries No. 1608; 1615; 1704; 1707; 1708; 1709; 1711; 1718. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/8/2010.(JAM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc. et al v. Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc.
Represented By: Maxine M. Brown-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suiza Dairy, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Rivera-Cubano
Represented By: Yassmin Gonzalez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan R. Pedro-Gordian
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Ramirez
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Figueroa-Herrera
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rivera-Aquino
Represented By: Emmet T. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndia E. Irrizary
Represented By: Emmet T. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Indulac, Inc.
Represented By: Maria D. Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Asociacion de Ganaderos Sector de la Leche
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ombudsman Office
Represented By: Rolando Jose Melendez-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ganaderos Unidos de la Industria de Lechera, Inc.
Represented By: Juan M. Frontera-Suau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Camara de Mercadeo Industria y Distribucion de Alimentos (MIDA)
Represented By: Marta L. Rivera-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Empresas A. Cordero Badillo, Inc.
Represented By: Marta L. Rivera-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cadena de Supermercados Econo ("Econo")
Represented By: Marta L. Rivera-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cadenas de Supermercados Selectos
Represented By: Marta L. Rivera-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Centro Unido de Detallistas Inc.
Represented By: Hector Melendez-Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Puerto Rico Dairy Farmers Association
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?