Cruz-Rodriguez et al v. Molina-Rodriguez et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Cruz-Rodriguez, Maria de Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz and Natalia Cruz-Rodriguez
Defendant: Carlos Molina-Rodriguez, Jesus Gonzalez-Cruz, Maria Lugardo, David Aguila and Hector Acosta-Zambrana
Case Number: 3:2012cv01189
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: Rio Grande
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 motion for summary judgment. Status Conference set for 4/18/2017 02:00 PM in PG's Chambers before Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 03/28/2017. (NNR)
September 8, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 9/8/2014. (VCC)
January 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Strike. The Motion to Dismiss is deemed as unopposed. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/14/2014. (VCC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz-Rodriguez et al v. Molina-Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cruz-Rodriguez
Represented By: Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de Lourdes Rodriguez-Ruiz
Represented By: Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Cruz-Rodriguez
Represented By: Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Molina-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gonzalez-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lugardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Aguila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Acosta-Zambrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?