Colon-Marrero v. Conty-Perez et al
Plaintiff: Myrna Colon-Marrero and Josefina Romaguera Agrait
Defendant: Hector Conty-Perez, Edwin Mundo-Rios, Eder E Ortiz-Ortiz, Roberto I Aponte-Berrios, Julio Fontanet-Maldonado, Adrian Diaz-Diaz and Carlos Quiros-Mendez
Intervenor_defendant: Norman Parkhurst
Case Number: 3:2012cv01749
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Carmen C. Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION on 174 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs: GRANTED, as adjusted. An itemized Bill of Costs shall be filed, addressed to the Clerk of Court, for disposition. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 3/22/2017. (mld)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OPINION DECLARING RIGHTS AND GRANTING EQUITABLE RELIEF. Related document: 145 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/4/2015. (mld)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/17/2012. (mld)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon-Marrero v. Conty-Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Colon-Marrero
Represented By: Carlos Del-Valle-Cruz
Represented By: Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Represented By: Carlos M. Hernandez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Romaguera Agrait
Represented By: Carlos Del-Valle-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Conty-Perez
Represented By: Jose L. Nieto-Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Mundo-Rios
Represented By: Seth Erbe
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eder E Ortiz-Ortiz
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto I Aponte-Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Fontanet-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Diaz-Diaz
Represented By: Nelson N. Cordova-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Quiros-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Norman Parkhurst
Represented By: John E. Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?