Grasis et al v. Win Access Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lindsey Grasis, Dorothy Grasis and Michael Grasis
Defendant: Win Access Inc., Consejo Titulares Ashford Imperial, Sea Breeze Apt Rentals Inc. and ABC Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01226
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Salvador E Casellas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 413 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Adopting 402 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, the Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket No. 329 is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (LMR)
April 7, 2017 408 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING 396 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, Sea Breeze's Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket No. 338 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/30/2017.(LMR)
March 30, 2017 404 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Adopting in part 387 Report and Recommendation re 306 Worcester Polytechnic Institute's "Motion for Summary Judgment" and 121 , 146 , 216 and 293 MAPFRE's "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings" (Docket Nos. 121, 146, 216 and 293). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/30/2017.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grasis et al v. Win Access Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Grasis
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Ana C. Rivera-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Grasis
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Ana C. Rivera-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grasis
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Ana C. Rivera-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Win Access Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consejo Titulares Ashford Imperial
Represented By: Israel Melendez-Torres
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Breeze Apt Rentals Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo San Antonio-Acha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?