Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P. v. Municipality of Barceloneta

Plaintiff: Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P.
Defendant: Municipality of Barceloneta
Case Number: 3:2013cv01264
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A. Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: Upon review of the parties' show cause motions as to the issuance of sanctions, the court hereby imposes onto Plaintiff the monetary sanction described herein, which is payable to Defendant within thirty (30) days as of the date of this order. In addition, the court hereby DENIES 91 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/13/2015. (GDM)
July 9, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denied 102 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/9/2015. (GDM) Modified on 7/9/2015 to add docket text (nat).
March 16, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: The court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment at Docket No. 34 and DENIES in part and GRANTS in part Defendant's Motion for summary judgment at Docket No. 37 . Accordingly, the court DISMISSES Plaintif f's claims. The Clerk of Court shall notify and provide to the Puerto Rico Comptroller a copy of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (GDM) Modified on 3/17/2015 to add the word "Opinion" & to document Type (su).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P. v. Municipality of Barceloneta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P.
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Maria Ligia Giraldez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Barceloneta
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?