Nicole, Inc. v. VO Distribution, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole, Inc. doing business as Nicole Lee
Defendant: Jane Doe #3 doing business as Dir By Dilaida also known as Oh La La Boutique, Jane Doe, Oh La La Boutique, Jane Doe #1 doing business as Soleil Boutique, Karteras, Inc., Jane Doe #6 doing business as Fashion By W, Koketa, Inc., Jennette Firpi, Jane Doe #4 doing business as Estilo's Glamour, Jane Doe #5 doing business as Jiny's Fashion and More, Jane Doe #2 doing business as Kathy's Jewelry Fashion, Everybody's Fashion, Inc., Ixia Lee Castro, VO Distribution, Inc., Mary Doe, Insurance Companies X, Y, and Z, Marisel Perez-Colon doing business as Accesorios Marie and Companies A, B, and C
Case Number: 3:2015cv02275
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2016 Filing 52 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/16/2016. (DJP)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Noting and Granting #50 "Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction." The consent judgment and permanent injunction will be entered in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/16/2016. (DJP)
March 15, 2016 Filing 50 Joint MOTION Submitting Consent Judgment filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Nicole, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2016 (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Noting #48 "Informative Motion." The parties shall move for dismissal not later than March 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/24/2016. (LMR)
February 23, 2016 Filing 48 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding settlement status filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2016 (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause, not later than February 23, 2016, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution/failure to abide by the order at Docket No. 46. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/16/2016. (DJP)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #45 "Joint Motion for Extension of Time." The parties are granted until January 29, 2016 to comply with the order at Docket No. 40. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/31/2015. (LMR)
December 30, 2015 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 01/29/2015 to Comply with Order (Docket No. 40) filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/19/2016 (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
October 29, 2015 Filing 44 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jane Doe #2 doing business asKathy's Jewelry Fashion, Jane Doe #4doing business asEstilo's Glamour, Marisel Perez-Colon. (mr)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/29/2015. (DJP)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Granting as Requested #34 "Motion Requesting Entry of Default and Issuance of Permanent Injunction was to Three Defendants." The Clerk shall take notice and enter default against Kahty's Jewelry, Accesorios Marie, and Estilo's Glamour (Ms. Nilda Liz Gonzlez). A Permanent Injunction will be issued forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/29/2015. (DJP)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Noting #39 "Notice of Attorney Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/29/2015. (DJP)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Noting and Granting #38 "Joint Informative Motion." By December 30, 2015, the parties shall move for dismissal, or in the alternative, file a litigation work plan as indicated at paragraph 7 of the motion. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/29/2015. (DJP)
October 28, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Victor J. Quinones-Martinez on behalf of VO Distribution, Inc. (Quinones-Martinez, Victor)
October 28, 2015 Filing 38 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Case filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs and VO Distribution, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/16/2015 (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia) Modified on 10/29/2015 to add filer (mr).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: On October 8, 2015, the court ordered the attorneys for plaintiff and VO Distribution to file, not later than October 23, 2015, a joint informative motion letting the court know the status of the case and any suggestions on what to do going forward in respect to this litigation (Docket No. 32). To date, no such motion appears to have been filed. Accordingly, the parties shall comply with the Order at Docket No. 32 not later than October 28, 2015. By that same date, plaintiff shall file a proposed order in connection with its request for Default Entry and Issuance of Permanent Injunction included at Docket No. 34. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2015. (DJP)
October 16, 2015 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Wanda Pares. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/16/2015. (DJP)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Granting as Requested #33 "Motion Requesting Issuance of Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Wanda Pares (Owner of B Fashion by W)." A Preliminary Injunction Order will be entered forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/16/2015. (DJP)
October 15, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Default Entry and Issuance of Permanent Injunction as to Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #4, Marisel Perez-Colon filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
October 15, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (as to Wanda Pares, owner of "Be Fashion by W") filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
October 8, 2015 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Show Cause Hearing held on 10/8/2015. Motion requesting preliminary injunction against Wanda Pares due by 10/15/2015. Joint Informative Motion due by 10/23/2015. (Court Reporter Pam Andasola.) (DJP)
September 25, 2015 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed through USMS upon VO Distribution, Inc. served on 9/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Summons and List of Items Seized) (mr)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 EXTENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See document attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2015. (DJP)
September 25, 2015 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. See Document attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2015. (DJP)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting #24 "Plaintiff's Motion Confirming Posting of Bond." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2015. (DJP)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Noting #23 "Motion Submitting Proposed Orders." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2015. (DJP)
September 25, 2015 Filing 25 Injunction BOND in the amount of $ $20,000.00 posted by Nicole, Inc. Original sent to vault. (mr)
September 24, 2015 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Show Cause Hearing held on September 24, 2015 (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola). Show Cause Hearing October 8, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5. See Minutes attached. (DJP)
September 24, 2015 Filing 24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Posting of Bond filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 24, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION Submitting Proposed Orders filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 24, 2015 Filing 22 ***FILED IN ERROR - MISSING JUDGE'S SIGNATURE*** Injunction BOND in the amount of $20,000.00 posted by Nicole, Inc. Original sent to vault. (nat) Modified on 9/24/2015 (nat).
September 24, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION for Bond filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Copy of Bond)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Motions filed at Docket Nos. #14 and #19 will be discussed during the Show Cause Hearing set for TODAY at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2015. (DJP)
September 24, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION to Unseal Case filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jane Doe #1 served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Koketa, Inc. served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Karteras, Inc. served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Everybody's Fashion, Inc. served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Ixia Lee Castro, Jennette Firpi, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6 filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 9/24/2015 to delete repeated relief as to issuance (mr).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting as Requested #12 "Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve some Defendants by Publication and Through Alternative Means." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2015. (DJP)
September 21, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Serve Some Defendants by Publication and Through Alternative Means filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 9/22/2015 as to relief(mr). Modified on 9/28/2015 to remove restriction as case was unsealed (mr).
September 18, 2015 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Ixia Lee Castro, Everybody's Fashion, Inc., Jennette Firpi, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, Karteras, Inc., Koketa, Inc., Marisel Perez-Colon, VO Distribution, Inc. (mr)
September 17, 2015 Filing 10 Amended Writ to seize and impound infringing articles Issued as to USM. (mr)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 "Motion Requesting Issuance of Amended Show Cause Order, Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order, and Bond Order, and Amended Writ." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/17/2015. (DJP)
September 17, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION requesting Order filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Nicole, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Amended Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Proposed Amended Writ)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 9/28/2015 to remove restriction as case was unsealed(mr).
September 17, 2015 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicole, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 9/28/2015 to remove restriction as case was unsealed(mr).
September 16, 2015 Filing 6 Writ to seize and impound infringing articles Issued as to USM. (mr)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #1 "Motion to Seal;" and Granting #4 "Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order, and Order to Show Cause." Show Cause Hearing set for September 24, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5. See Order attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/14/2015. (DJP)
September 14, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to All Defendants filed by Nicole, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order for TRO, #3 Proposed Writ)(mr) Modified on 9/28/2015 to remove restriction as case was unsealed (mr).
September 14, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 1- 22 re #2 Complaint filed by Nicole, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-15, #2 Exhibit 16-22) (mr)
September 14, 2015 Filing 2 Verified COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicole, Inc.. Service due by 1/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Notices of Appearance, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(mr) Modified on 9/28/2015 to remove restriction as case was unsealed (mr).
September 14, 2015 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez, Isabel Torres-Sastre, Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of Nicole, Inc. (np)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicole, Inc. v. VO Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #3 doing business as Dir By Dilaida also known as Oh La La Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oh La La Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1 doing business as Soleil Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karteras, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #6 doing business as Fashion By W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koketa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennette Firpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #4 doing business as Estilo's Glamour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #5 doing business as Jiny's Fashion and More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #2 doing business as Kathy's Jewelry Fashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everybody's Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ixia Lee Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VO Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Victor J. Quinones-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies X, Y, and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisel Perez-Colon doing business as Accesorios Marie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies A, B, and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole, Inc. doing business as Nicole Lee
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Represented By: Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?