Berrios-Pagan et al v. Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yazmin Berrios-Fuentes, Kristian Castillo-Berrios, The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo-Berrios, Justy Roman-Colon, Eva Alicia Berrios-Pagan and Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios
Defendant: Professional Partnerships A, B and C, Jane Doe, Rene Casas-Benabe, Insurance Companies X, Y and Z, John Doe, Emergency Services Group, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Casas-Doe, Jane Roe, Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe, Richard Roe, Ruben Rubero-Aponte, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Resto, Corporations D, E and F and Keila S Resto-Torres
Case Number: 3:2017cv02387
Filed: December 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Filing 22 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/23/2018. (ebb)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #20 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Due to Settlement." Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with Prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/23/2018. (ebb)
May 22, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice due to settlement by Yazmin Berrios-Fuentes, Eva Alicia Berrios-Pagan, Kristian Castillo-Berrios, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios, Justy Roman-Colon, The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo-Berrios (Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
April 11, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, filed by Rosa L. Irizarry-Millan on behalf of Defendant Mennonite General Hospital, Inc..(Irizarry-Millan, Rosa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #16 "Motion Requesting Partial Stay of Proceedings as to Codefendant Emergency Services Group, Inc." The case is STAYED as to Emergency Services Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/26/2018. (AM)
March 23, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez on behalf of Rene Casas-Benabe Responses due by 4/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De-Corral-Hernandez, Gloria) Modified on 3/27/2018 as to event (mr).
March 23, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay proceedings partially as to codefendant Emergency Services Group, Inc. filed by Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing)(Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
March 21, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018; Ruben Rubero-Aponte served on 3/16/2018, answer due 4/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Summons served on Dr. Rubero, #2 Exhibit 2, Summons served on Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe) (Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
March 21, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justy Roman-Colon, Eva Alicia Berrios-Pagan, The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo-Berrios, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios, Yazmin Berrios-Fuentes, Kristian Castillo-Berrios.(Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 "Motion Requesting Leave to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant Named with Fictitious Name." The Amended Complaint shall be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/21/2018. (ebb)
March 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party Codefendant previously included with fictitious name filed by Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
March 7, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe, Jane Roe, Ruben Rubero-Aponte (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rom)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 "Motion Requesting Issuance of Summons." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/7/2018. (ebb)
March 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe, Jane Roe, Ruben Rubero-Aponte filed by Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form of Proposed Summons re. Dr. Ruben Rubero Aponte, #2 Exhibit Form of Proposed Summons re. Jane Roe, spouse of Dr. Rubero, #3 Exhibit Form of Proposed Summons re. Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe)(Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)
March 2, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Defendant Keila S Resto-Torres.(Vivas, Jose)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #4 "Request for Leave to Appear." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/22/2018. (ebb)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Plead." Dr. Rene Casas-Benabe shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/22/2018. (ebb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 21, 2018 to File Answer To The Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo-Berrios, Kristian Castillo-Berrios, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios, Eva Alicia Berrios-Pagan, Yazmin Berrios-Fuentes, Justy Roman-Colon filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Rene Casas-Benabe Responses due by 3/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito)
February 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso on behalf of Rene Casas-Benabe Responses due by 3/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Masso, Benito)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Plead." Defendant Dr. Keila Resto-Torres shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/16/2018. (ebb)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until March to File Answer filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Keila S Resto-Torres Responses due by 2/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
January 2, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (ad)
December 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5697667.), filed by Justy Roman Colon, Eva A Berrios Pagan, The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo Berrios, Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios, Yazmin Berrios Fuentes, Kristian J Castillo Berrios. Service due by 4/2/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Torrech-Cabrero, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrios-Pagan et al v. Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Partnerships A, B and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Casas-Benabe
Represented By: Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso
Represented By: Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies X, Y and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mennonite General Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Rosa L. Irizarry-Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Casas-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rubero-Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Rubero-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Resto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations D, E and F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keila S Resto-Torres
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yazmin Berrios-Fuentes
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian Castillo-Berrios
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Luis Manuel Castillo-Berrios
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justy Roman-Colon
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Alicia Berrios-Pagan
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Roman-Berrios
Represented By: Carmen G. Torrech-Cabrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?