White et al v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michele White, John Doe 51 to 100, Ashley White, Conjugal Partneship, William White and Conjugal Partnership White-White
Defendant: John Doe 1 to 50
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sunnova Energy Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: David Roldan, John Doe, David Roe and Company X
Material Witness: Maximo Solar Industries, Inc..
Case Number: 3:2018cv01068
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Patillas
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for Reconsideration and Request to Extend for 14 Days the Disclosure or Plaintiffs' Experts Reports re #102 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #102 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge). Added MOTION for extension of time on 9/10/2020 (idg).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. The parties are expected to adhere to the schedule set by Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. A Joint Pretrial Memorandum shall be filed by January 11, 2021. Memorandum Filing due by 1/11/2021. A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The Pretrial Conference will be held using the Jabber System. Proper instructions for counsel to log in will be provided well in advance of the conference by separate email. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/25/2020.(wm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 101 Urgent MOTION for extension of time until December 31, 2020 to Conclude All Discovery filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified title on 8/17/2020 (idg).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER finding as moot #83 Motion for Hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 1, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER finding as moot #68 Motion to Compel. See DE 95. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 1, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER finding as moot #67 Motion to Compel. See DE 95. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 1, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER finding as moot #66 Motion to Compel. See DE 95. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 1, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER noted #95 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on July 1, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
June 16, 2020 Filing 95 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. 94 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 6/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified caps on 6/17/2020 (idg).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #93 Motion In Compliance. This case is over two years old, and although certain extensions to case management orders are justified due to disruptions caused by the COVID-19 crisis, the nearly one-year extension sought by the parties is unwarranted. Accordingly: The parties shall file a further informative motion regarding their disputes over documentary discovery by 6/16/20. Factual depositions and discovery to conclude by 8/31/20. Plaintiffs expert disclosures to be produced by 9/25/20, and defendants by 10/16/20. Plaintiffs rebuttal disclosures due 10/26/20, and defendants due 11/2/20. All discovery to conclude by 11/16/20. Dispositive motions due 12/14/20. Oppositions to dispositive motions to be filed by 12/30/20. No further extensions to be granted. Dates for Pretrial and trial to be set by the presiding district judge. The parties are strongly urged to explore settlement. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on June 2, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
May 18, 2020 Filing 93 Motion In Compliance as to 92 Order on Informative Motion,, filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 92 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER noted #91 INFORMATIVE motion. By not later than May 18, 2020, the parties shall file a further motion informing the dates they propose for completion of all remaining discovery. By the same date, the parties shall inform whether they have resolved the discovery issues raised in the motions filed at Docket Nos. 66, 67, 68, and 83. Needless to say, the parties shall work in good faith to resolve any pending discovery disputes. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 20, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
April 3, 2020 Filing 91 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding unexpected delay in factual discovery depositions filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 4/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified caps lock on 4/6/2020 (idg).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER finding as moot #82 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on March 30, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER noted #88 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on March 30, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
March 10, 2020 Filing 88 Motion In Compliance with order at Docket No. 86 and response to plaintiff's motion at Docket No. 82 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 3/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
March 9, 2020 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #86 Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon, all pending, related, and future discovery issues (except Docket Nos. 66 and 67), are hereby randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin, for disposition as appropriate. Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2020. (gr)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. Plaintiff's motions to compel answers to interrogatories and production of documents, and the first motion requesting a hearing at ECF Nos. 66, 67, 68, are HELD IN ABEYANCE. #76 Motion In Compliance as to #75 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. #77 Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. #75 and Request of Extension of Time Inform Name of Corporate Representative. GRANTED. The parties' joint motion for extension of the discovery deadlines at ECF Nos. 78, 85 are hereby GRANTED. #81 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Sunnova's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the reply as a separate docket entry. Defendant is ordered to file a response to plaintiff's motion to compel at ECF No. 82 within 5 days from the issuance of this order. Failure to comply may entail sanctions. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge With the exception of ECF Nos. 66, 67, which the Court will address in a separate order, all pending, related, and future discovery issues are hereby referred for the appropriate disposition to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and Local Rule 72. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/9/2020.(wm) Modified format on 3/10/2020 (idg).
March 2, 2020 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Conclude Factual Discovery and Submitting a Joint Proposed Amended Discovery Schedule filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation. Responses due by 3/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose). Added MOTION Submitting on 3/3/2020 (idg).
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties may refile a motion to consolidate at a more proper juncture. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/21/2020.(wm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Hearing re #68 MOTION to Compel and Urgent Request for Discovery Hearing filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White, #82 Emergency MOTION to Compel filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White, #66 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White, #76 Motion In Compliance as to #75 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White, #67 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #68 , #82 , #66 , #76 , #67 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
January 9, 2020 Filing 82 Emergency MOTION to Compel filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
December 17, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Sunnova's Oppositoopn to Motion for Reconsideration filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
December 11, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration at Docket NO. #76 filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #76 Motion In Compliance as to #75 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 12/12/2019 to edit capital letters (rom).
December 4, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose MOTION for Reconsideration at Docket No. #76 and Request for Brief Extension of Time by Sunnova Energy Corporation (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 12/6/2019 to edit capital letters (rom).
November 27, 2019 Filing 78 Joint MOTION for extension of time to Discovery Period and Submitting a Joint Proposed Amended Discovery Schedule filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation, Ashley White, Michele White, William White. Responses due by 12/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 12/2/2019 to add filers (rom).
November 22, 2019 Filing 77 Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. #75 and Request of Extension of Time Inform Name of Corporate Representative filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 12/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit capital letters and event (rom).
November 22, 2019 Filing 76 Motion In Compliance as to #75 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of Ms. Zambrana)(Related document(s) #75 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/20/2019. (wm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #73 MOTION for Protective Order Request to Quash Deposition Notices and Request for Order on Factual Depositions filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 11/18/2019 to edit capital letters (rom).
November 14, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash Deposition Notices and Request for Order on Factual Depositions filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit capital letters (rom).
November 14, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion at Docket No. 66 and 67 filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #66 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White, #67 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER noted #65 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019. (wm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. Defendants are granted until November 14, 2019 to file a response to ECF Nos. 66, 67, 68. The depositions scheduled to commence on November 19, 2019 shall remain unaltered and on scheduled. The Court will rule upon all discovery-related motions before 11/19/2019, to allot both parties time to comply with the rulings on or before 11/19/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/12/2019.(wm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motions at Docket No. #66 , #67 and #68 by Sunnova Energy Corporation (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/6/2019 to edit capital letters (rom).
November 5, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel and Urgent Request for Discovery Hearing filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
November 1, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
November 1, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
October 14, 2019 Filing 65 Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket No. 64 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 10/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. HELD IN ABEYANCE; #55 MOTION requesting Order filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; #56 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion Submitting Confidential Agreement filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. GRANTED; #57 MOTION Submitting Motion Submitting Confidential Agreement and Confidential Agreement filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc. NOTED; #58 Motion to allow Parisi Albert to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6575782) filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White. GRANTED; #60 MOTION for Protective Order and to Limit Deposition filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. DENIED; #62 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's Motion at Docket No. 61 filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. DENIED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/30/2019.(wm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's Motion at Docket No. 61 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Replay to Plaintiff's Opposition to Urgent Motion at Docket No. 60)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
September 24, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Urgent Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #60 MOTION for Protective Order and to Limit Deposition filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - email, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amended Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
September 20, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Protective Order and to Limit Deposition filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 10/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
September 13, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #55 MOTION requesting Order filed by Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
September 6, 2019 Filing 58 Motion to allow Parisi Albert to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6575782) filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
September 5, 2019 Filing 57 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION Submitting Motion Submitting Confidential Agreement and Confidential Agreement filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Confidential Agreement)(Vivas, Jose)
September 5, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion Submitting Confidential Agreement filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
September 5, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Enter Special Appearance and Requesting a Protective Order Under FRCP 26(c)(1) filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Maximo Solar Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Vivas, Jose) Modified on 9/6/2019 to edit event (rom).
August 27, 2019 Filing 54 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
August 23, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion in opposition to consolidation at Docket No. 48 filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: ECF No #47 MOTION for extension of time, is denied as Moot. ECF No. #48 RESPONSE in Opposition, is Noted. ECF No. #49 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply is hereby Granted. Codefendant Sunnova Energy Corporation shall file its Reply as a separate docket entry. ECF No. #51 Motion for Leave to File Document Sur-reply is hereby Granted. Plaintiffs shall file as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/23/2019. (gmm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-reply)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
August 17, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #50 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply. ***FILED IN ERROR Filed in wrong case.*** (mcm)
August 17, 2019 Filing 50 ***FILED IN ERROR - Filed in Wrong Case.*** MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-reply)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 8/19/2019 (mcm).
August 13, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Motion at Docket No. 48 filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Response in Opposition to Consolidation, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Maximo in Sunnova Case)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
August 6, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
July 9, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for extension of time until August 8, 2019 to Comply with Oerder filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. Plaintiffs are granted 15 days (due July 25, 2019) to respond to the motion for consolidation and show cause as to why both cases are not to be consolidated. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/8/2019.(wm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #44 INFORMATIVE motion. NOTED. However, counsel is responsible for any filings on matters that may arise during their absence. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/8/2019. (wm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 44 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Vacation of Plaintiffs' Attorney filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
May 10, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 5/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint- White v. Maximo)(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
May 10, 2019 Filing 42 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John Doe 1 to 50, filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation.(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The parties' Initial Scheduling Memorandum, ECF No. 37, is NOTED. The Court hereby imposes the following Deadlines: Amend Pleadings or add parties due by 5/30/2019. Conclusion of all Discovery due by 5/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2020. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2020.Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/3/2019.(wm)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/3/2019. (wm)
April 22, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for extension of time until April 26, 2019 to File Third-Party Complaint filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 5/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
April 8, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Defendant Sunnova Energy Corporation.(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
April 5, 2019 Filing 37 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs, Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 4/8/2019 to add filer (rom).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Parties are to submit a Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum, which must include the parties' theories of the case. The parties are granted until April 5, 2019, to comply. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. In addition, the parties are granted until April 5, 2019, to state whether they consent to the trial jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/18/2019.(wm)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The parties are granted until April 5, 2019 to submit a Joint Scheduling Memorandum describing the theory of the case and suggested due dates for conclusion of discovery (factual and experts), filing of dispositive motions, settlement conference and trial. Joint Memorandum Filing due by 4/5/2019.Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/15/2019. (wm)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Sunnova Energy Corporation. Sunnova's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/13/2019.(wm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk of Court shall update the case to reflect Paul Hammer's withdrawal as an attorney of record for defendant Sunnova Energy, Corp. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/4/2019. (wm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Paul James Hammer filed by Paul James Hammer on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 3/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hammer, Paul)
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #29 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose M. Martinez-Chevres. Granted. Clerk is to update docket sheet accordingly. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/2/2018.(wm)
June 29, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose M. Martinez-Chevres filed by Jose M. Martinez-Chevres on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 7/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Chevres, Jose)
June 18, 2018 Filing 28 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs shall file their sur-reply as a separate docket entry within 14 calendar days of the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/7/2018. (wm)
May 28, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-reply)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
May 23, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Hammer, Paul)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Sunnova's request to file a reply is Granted. The reply is due within 15 calendar days of the date of this order. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/9/2018. (wm)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, Plaintiffs' motion and supplemental motion at ECF No. #7 , #11 , are DENIED. The motion at ECF No. #11 is NOTED. The motion at ECF No. #16 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs have moved the Court to compel defendant's deposition under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37, days after the plaintiff filed their complaint and before defendant filed an answer. After reviewing the parties' several filings, the Court is not convinced plaintiffs have "in good faith conferred or attempted to confer" with defendant on this matter pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a)(1). See Aponte-Navedo v. Nalco Chemical Co., 268 F.R.D. 31, 40-41 (D.P.R. May 20, 2010). Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/3/2018.(cm)
May 2, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 14, 2018 to File Response/Reply filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 5/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
April 25, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Contarct - Spanish version, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Contract - English version, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - web page, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - letter)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
April 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 4/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II, #3 Exhibit III, #4 Exhibit IV, #5 Exhibit V)(Estrella, Alberto)
April 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Andreu-Fuentes, Jose)
April 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose M. Martinez-Chevres on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Martinez-Chevres, Jose)
March 22, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Conjugal Partnership White-White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White Re: #16 MOTION to Strike Docket No. 15. Re: #15 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Conjugal Partnership White-White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
March 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Docket No. 15. Re: #15 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, Conjugal Partnership White-White filed by Paul James Hammer on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 4/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Hammer, Paul)
March 9, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion in Opposition to Urgent Motion filed by Conjugal Partnership White-White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White Re: #7 MOTION requesting Order REGARDING URGENT MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 30(a)2(A) (iii) AND 30(b)(6) OF THE FED. RULES CIV. PROC. filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White filed by Conjugal Partnership White-White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs shall re-file their reply motion as a separate docket entry. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/8/2018. (wm)
March 7, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Document REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO URGENT MOTION AT DKT. 7" filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Conjugal Partnership White-White, Ashley White, Michele White, William White Responses due by 3/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REPLY, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Reply, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Reply, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Reply, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Reply, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Reply, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Reply)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 28, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #11 Supplemental Motion re: #7 MOTION requesting Order REGARDING URGENT MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 30(a)2(A) (iii) AND 30(b)(6) OF THE FED. RULES CIV. PROC. filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White, #7 MOTION requesting Order REGARDING URGENT MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 30(a)2(A) (iii) AND 30(b)(6) OF THE FED. RULES CIV. PROC. filed by Michele White, William White, Ashley White filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 February 22, 2018 email and attachments)(Hammer, Paul)
February 20, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental Motion re: #7 MOTION requesting Order REGARDING URGENT MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 30(a)2(A) (iii) AND 30(b)(6) OF THE FED. RULES CIV. PROC. filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Ashley White, Michele White, William White Responses due by 3/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter February 15, 2018, #2 Errata Latter February 16, 2018)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Estrella, Alberto)
February 16, 2018 Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding intent to oppose Urgent Motion at Docket No. 7. filed by Paul James Hammer on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 3/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hammer, Paul)
February 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul James Hammer on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Hammer, Paul)
February 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION requesting Order REGARDING URGENT MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 30(a)2(A) (iii) AND 30(b)(6) OF THE FED. RULES CIV. PROC. filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Ashley White, Michele White, William White Responses due by 2/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley White, William White, Michele White. Sunnova Energy Corporation waiver sent on 2/12/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 8, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sunnova Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
February 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Sunnova Energy Corporation filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Ashley White, William White, Michele White Responses due by 2/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Conjugal Partneship, Ashley White, Michele White, William White (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1 to 50, John Doe 51 to 100, Sunnova Energy Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5741286.), filed by Ashley White, William White, Michele White. Service due by 5/8/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Sunnova Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Represented By: Albert Al Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 51 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Represented By: Albert Al Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partneship
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Represented By: Albert Al Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership White-White
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Represented By: Albert Al Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sunnova Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Paul James Hammer
Represented By: Jose M. Martinez-Chevres
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Roldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Company X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Maximo Solar Industries, Inc..
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?